iLOR, LLC v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff iLOR, LLC alleges that Google, Inc. infringed on U.S. Patent No. 7,206,839 entitled "Method for Adding a User Selected Function to a Hyperlink."

Plaintiff: iLOR, LLC
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Google, Inc.
Counter_defendant: iLOR, LLC
Case Number: 5:2007cv00109
Filed: April 17, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Lexington Office
County: Fayette
Presiding Judge: Joseph M. Hood
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit Case Number 2010-1172 for 101 Notice of Appeal filed by iLOR, LLC. (KJR)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit Case Number 2010-1117 for 97 Notice of Appeal filed by iLOR, LLC. (KJR)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE from the US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re 101 Notice of Appeal; Case No. is 2010-1172. (KJR)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Clerk's Note: re 101 Notice of Appeal: clerk has forwarded a certified copy of the docket sheet, Notice of Appeal & 99 Memo Opinion & Order to the Court of Appeals of the Federal Circuit Court. (KJR)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 101 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to 99 Memorandum Opinion & Order,, by iLOR, LLC. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 1668142. (Schmit, David) Modified to add "Federal Circuit" to text on 1/22/2010 (KJR).
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 100 JUDGMENT: (1) pla shall pay $627,039.25 in atty fees & $33,312.68 in costs & expenses to dft; (2) order is final & appeal; (3) matter is STRICKEN from the active docket. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 12/23/09.(KJR)cc: COR
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: that having considered the $511 in fees charged by Hon. Higgins w/re to the filing of Google's Motion for atty fees & costs, the court concludes that they represent a reasonable number of hours of service at a reasonable rate & should be included in the lodestar described in the court's 10/15/09 Memo Opinion & Order for a total of $627,039.25 awarded in this matter; Google has requested no further costs & expenses associated w/filing its motion & the court shall award the $33,312.68 in costs & expenses. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 12/23/09.(KJR)cc: COR
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Notice from the US Court of Appeal for the Federal Circuit re 97 Notice of Appeal: case No. is 2010-1117. (KJR) Modified to add a link on 2/3/2010 (Reynolds, Kolleen).
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Clerk's Note: re 97 Notice of Appeal: clerk has forwarded a certified copy of the docket sheet, Notice of Appeal & Memo Opinion & Order to the Court of Appeals of the Federal Circuit Court. (KJR)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to 93 Memorandum Opinion & Order, Terminate Motions by iLOR, LLC. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 1621008. (Schmit, David) Modified to add "Federal Circuit" to text on 12/1/2009 (KJR).
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: 95 Notice, 96 Objections, 93 Memorandum Opinion & Order, (KJR)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 96 OBJECTIONS to 95 iLOR's OBJECTIONS TO GOOGLE'S ITEMIZATION OF COSTS, ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES filed by iLOR, LLC. (Schmit, David)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: 95 Notice, (KJR)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO James Higgins re 95 Notice, ; Error: exhibits were insufficiently described; Entry by atty; Correction: the clerk has renamed the attachments; it is necessary that all attachments are adequately described (example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct)); NO further action required by counsel. cc: COR (KJR)
October 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE by Google, Inc. re 93 Memorandum Opinion & Order, Terminate Motions,,,, Google's Itemization of Costs, Attorneys' Fees and Expenses (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shelley Mack, # 2 Exhibit A - Mack Dec, # 3 Exhibit B - Mack Dec, # 4 Exhibit C - Mack Dec, # 5 Exhibit D - Mack Dec, # 6 Exhibit E - Mack Dec, # 7 Exhibit F - Mack Dec, # 8 Exhibit G - Mack Dec, # 9 Exhibit H - Mack Dec, # 10 Exhibit I - Mack Dec)(Higgins, James)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 94 SUR REPLY re 88 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Google, Inc. (filed pursuant court's 93 order). (Attachments: # 1 unpublished cases)(KJR)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) GRANTING Google's 88 MOTION for Attorney Fees; (2) GRANTING iLOR's 92 MOTION for Leave to File SUR-REPLY TO GOOGLE'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES; (3) clerk shall FILE iLOR's tendered Surreply; (4) Google has 10 days to submit counsel's detailed billing records & itemization of costs & expenses in support of its request for fees & expenses associated w/filing its motion to find this case exceptional & to award attys' fees & costs; iLOR shall have 10 days thereafter to file any objections. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 10/15/09.(KJR)cc: COR
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: 92 MOTION for Leave to File by iLOR, LLC SUR-REPLY TO GOOGLE'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES (KJR)
February 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MOTION for Leave to File by iLOR, LLC SUR-REPLY TO GOOGLE'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Sur-Reply to Google's Motion for Attorney Fees, # 2 Unpublished Cases, # 3 Proposed Order)(Schmit, David)
February 11, 2009 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Brian McGraw re 91 REPLY; Error: (1) attachment was insufficiently described; Entry by atty; Correction: clerk has renamed the attachment; it is necessary that all attachments are adequately described; (example: Exhibit A (incorrect; Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct); (2) atty failed to create a link to the motion; clerk has modified text to create the link to the motion; in the future, atty advised to create a link to the related documents; NO further action required by counsel. cc: COR (KJR)
February 11, 2009 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: 88 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Google, Inc. (KJR)
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 91 REPLY to response to motion re 88 motion to find case exceptional to award atty fees & 89 response filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Shelley Mack, # 2 Exhibit A Filed Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit B Filed Under Seal, # 4 Exhibit C Part 1 of 3, # 5 Exhibit C Part 2 of 3, # 6 Exhibit C Part 3 of 3)(McGraw, Brian) Modified to add a link on 2/11/2009 (Reynolds, Kolleen). Modified on 2/13/2009 (KJR). (2/13/09 clerk received the sealed exhibits & they will be maintained in the clerk's office)
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 90 NOTICE OF FILING by iLOR, LLC re 89 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, OF PROPOSED ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Schmit, David)
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO David Schmit re 89 Response in Opposition to Motion; atty failed to submit a proposed order as an electronic attachment to the Response in Opposition; atty shall prepare a pleading entitled "Notice of Filing" (with a certificate of service), file the Notice using the event "Notice of Filing," attach the proposed order & create a link to the related docket entry within 3 business days. cc: COR (KJR)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 RESPONSE in Opposition re 88 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Google, Inc. filed by iLOR, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - E-mail of 1-12-09 from D. Schmit, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of David Schmit, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpts of Appellate Brief - Responsive Brief of Defendant-Appellee, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Jimmy Hamilton, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Letter of 9-14-07 from D. Schmit, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Letter of 7-31-07 from D.Schmit, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Letter of 8-21-07 from D. Schmit, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Letter of 8-23-07 from F. Scherkenbach, # 9 Exhibit 9 - E-mail of 8-24-07 from D. Schmit, # 10 Exhibit 10 - E-mail of 8-24-07 from F. Scherkenbach, # 11 Exhibit 11 - E-mail of 8-20-07 from K. Glitzenstein, # 12 Exhibit 12 - Excerpts of Appellate Brief - Reply Brief for Plaintiff-Appellant)(Schmit, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2009: # 13 Proposed Order) (KJR).
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MOTION TO FIND THIS CASE EXCEPTIONAL PURSUANT TO 35 U.S.C. § 285 to award Attorney Fees by Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion for Attorneys Fees, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Bill of Costs, # 4 Declaration of Mack, # 5 Declaration of Higgins)(Higgins, James) Modified to add additional text on 1/13/2009 (KJR).
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MANDATE FEDERAL CIRCUIT APPEALS JUDGMENT as to 72 Notice of Appeal, filed by iLOR, LLC (Attachments: # 1 order)(KJR) Modified to add the word Mandate to text on 1/9/2009 (KJR).
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER of Federal Circuit Court of Appeal as to 72 Notice of Appeal, filed by iLOR, LLC Appeal AFFIRMING the district court's denial of preliminary injunctive relief & DISMISSING the remaining issues raised in this appeal which relate to matters that remain before the district court. (Attachments: # 1 Errata sheet, # 2 cover ltr)(KJR) Modified correcting typo on 12/18/2008 (KJR).
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 85 SURREPLY to 74 Motion to Dismiss filed by iLOR, LLC. (SCD) (Filed per DE 83 )
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 84 JUDGMENT: 1) Google's "Google Notebook" has not infringed and does not infringe any claim of US Patent No. 7,206,839 either directly,contributorily, or by inducement and Google, Inc., has not infringed and does not infringe any claim of United States Patent No. 7,206,839, either directly, contributorily, or by inducement ; 2) Pla's claims are DISMISSED W/ PREJUDICE; 3) Counterplaintiff's claims are DISMISSED W/OUT PREJUDICE; 4) All scheduled proceedings are CONTINUED GENERALLY; 5) All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT; 6) This order is FINAL AND APPEALABLE and THERE IS NO JUST CAUSE FOR DELAY; 7) This action is STRICKEN FROM THE ACTIVE DOCKET. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 12/12/2008.(SCD)cc: COR
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1) Pla's 82 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply is GRANTED; 2) Clerk shall file a copy of the surreply in the record; 3) Dft's 74 MOTION to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED AS MOOT IN PART; 4) Pla's request for an award of its fees, expenses and costs shall be DENIED; 5) The Court's Judgment dated 10/31/2008 is STRICKEN AND HELD FOR NAUGHT. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 12/12/2008.(SCD)cc: COR
February 8, 2008 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: 82 MOTION for Leave to File by iLOR, LLC Sur-Reply in Response to Defendant's Reply in Support of it's Motion to Dismiss Remaining Claims (KJR)
February 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MOTION for Leave to File by iLOR, LLC Sur-Reply in Response to Defendant's Reply in Support of it's Motion to Dismiss Remaining Claims (Attachments: # 1 iLOR's Sur-Reply Memorandum, # 2 Proposed Order)(Schmit, David)
February 7, 2008 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: 74 MOTION to Dismiss by Google, Inc. Remaining Claims (KJR)
February 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 81 REPLY to Response to Motion re 74 MOTION to Dismiss by Google, Inc. Remaining Claims filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Sample Stipulated Dismissal, # 3 Exhibit Sample Joint Motion to Dismiss, # 4 Exhibit Sample Stipulation)(McGraw, Brian)
February 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Federal Circuit Appeal Info Sheet received by the court; Case No. 2008-1178 re 72 Notice of Appeal (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Docketing)(KJR)
January 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 79 RESPONSE in Opposition re 74 MOTION to Dismiss by Google, Inc. Remaining Claims filed by iLOR, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Schmit, David)
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to Federal Court of Appeals re 72 Notice of Appeal; transmitted to Federal Court of Appeals via US Mail. (KJR)
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER of USCA as to 72 Notice of Appeal filed by iLOR, LLC; Appeal DISMISSED because it is to be appealed to the Federal Circuit Court. (KJR)
January 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 76 TRANSCRIPT of Official Proceedings: Preliminary Injunction held on 11/19/07 before Judge Hood. Court Reporter: ANN BANTA. (KJR)
January 14, 2008 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 08-5050 Case Manager Linda M. Niesen for 72 Notice of Appeal filed by iLOR, LLC. (KJR)
January 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE OF FILING by Google, Inc. re 74 MOTION to Dismiss by Google, Inc. Remaining Claims (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Mot to Dismiss Remaining Claims)(Higgins, James)
January 10, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO James Higgins re 74 MOTION to Dismiss by Google, Inc. Remaining Claims; atty failed to submit a proposed order as an electronic attachment to the motion; atty shall prepare a pleading entitlted "Notice of Filing" (with a certificate of service), file the Notice using the event "Notice of Filing," attach the proposed order, & create a link to the related docket entry; atty has 3 days to cure the deficiency. cc: COR (KJR)
January 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MOTION to Dismiss by Google, Inc. Remaining Claims (Higgins, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2008: # 1 Proposed Order) (KJR).
January 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 73 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by iLOR, LLC for proceedings held on 11/19/2007 before Judge Joseph M. Hood, (Schmit, David)
December 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 70 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, 71 Judgment, by iLOR, LLC. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 1098080. (Schmit, David) Modified by taking out termination date on 2/4/2008 (KJR).
December 3, 2007 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: 52 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment by Google, Inc., Google, Inc. (KJR)
November 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 71 JUDGMENT (1) matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE & STRICKEN from the docket; (2) DENYING AS MOOT all pending motions; (3) CONTINUING GENERALLY all scheduled proceedings; (4) this order is final & appealable. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 11/30/07.(KJR)cc: COR,JC,D
November 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER (1) DENYING pla's 12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; (2) GRANTING dft's 52 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; (3) DENYING WITH PREJUDICE pla's pending claims. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 11/30/07. (KJR)cc: COR
November 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 69 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kirk, Peter)
November 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 68 SUPPLEMENTAL FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO ORDER OF OCTOBER 9, 2007 by Google, Inc.. (McGraw, Brian)
November 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MINUTE ENTRY FOR HEARING ON PLA'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION held on 11/19/07 before Judge Joseph M. Hood : matter is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT; the court will enter a written opinion. (COURT REPORTER: ANN BANTA) (KJR)cc: COR
November 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Update Attorney. Attorney Charles G. Middleton, III for Google, Inc. added. (KJR)
November 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE OF APPEARANCEof Charles G. Middleton III as Counsel for Defendant, Google Inc. by Google, Inc., Google, Inc..(McGraw, Brian)
November 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 65 REPLY to 60 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Google, Inc., Google, Inc.. (McGraw, Brian)
November 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER (1) the parties'motion for an extention of the deadline by which to file their joint status report and discovery plan 62 is GRANTED; and (2) the time for parties to file their joint status report and discovery plan is extended until and through 11/29/07. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood. (JMW)cc: COR
November 9, 2007 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: 62 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Google, Inc., iLOR, LLC, iLOR, LLC, Google, Inc. (JMW)
November 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE OF FILING by Google, Inc., Google, Inc. re 62 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Google, Inc., iLOR, LLC, iLOR, LLC, Google, Inc. CORRECTED Document (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Joint Motion (See DE 62))(McGraw, Brian)
November 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 62 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Google, Inc., iLOR, LLC, iLOR, LLC, Google, Inc. For Enlargement of Time to File Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McGraw, Brian) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/9/2007 (Wells, J. Michelle).
November 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ***SEALED*** REPLY to Response to Motion re 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by iLOR, LLC filed by iLOR, LLC. (maintained in the clerk's office) (KJR)
November 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 60 RESPONSE in Opposition re 52 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment by Google, Inc., Google, Inc. filed by iLOR, LLC, iLOR, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit VV - US Patent 6178419# 2 Exhibit WW - Google Privacy Policy# 3 Exhibit XX - Google Terms of Service# 4 Exhibit YY - Google Reviewer's Guide# 5 Exhibit ZZ - Method of creating a bookmark in Navigator# 6 Exhibit AAA - 8-15-02 Office Action)(Schmit, David)
November 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE OF FILING by iLOR, LLC, iLOR, LLC Document Under Seal - Pursuant to Protective Order (Schmit, David) Modified on 11/5/2007 (Reynolds, Kolleen). (this document was received in the Clerk's office on 11/2/07; the SEALED document is maintained in the clerk's office)
November 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING pla's 57 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memo Exceeding 15 Pages. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood. (KJR)cc: COR
November 2, 2007 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: 57 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by iLOR, LLC, iLOR, LLC (KJR)
November 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by iLOR, LLC, iLOR, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Schmit, David)
October 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER that iLOR has until 11/2/07 to file a reply to it's 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and a response to Google' 52 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood. (KJR)cc: COR
October 29, 2007 Opinion or Order ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: 55 Stipulation, (KJR)
October 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION re 54 Response in Opposition to Motion, 52 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment by Google, Inc., Google, Inc. for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to File Opposition and Reply by Google, Inc., iLOR, LLC, iLOR, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Schmit, David)
October 22, 2007 Opinion or Order ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: 53 REPLY (KJR)
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 53 REPLY to 47 TO COUNTERCLAIM filed by iLOR, LLC, iLOR, LLC. (Schmit, David)
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ***SEALED*** RESPONSE in Opposition iLOR's 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction & Memo in support of their (Google's) 52 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Google, Inc. (filed pursuant to DE 51 ). (KJR)
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 52 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment by Google, Inc., Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Peter Kirk# 2 Proposed Order)(McGraw, Brian)
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE OF FILING by Google, Inc., Google, Inc. Documents Under Seal (McGraw, Brian)
October 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER that dft has until 10/17/07 to file its response in opposition to pla's 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood. (KJR)cc: COR
October 16, 2007 Opinion or Order ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: 49 Stipulation (KJR)
October 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE OPPOSITION by Google, Inc., iLOR, LLC, iLOR, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McGraw, Brian)
October 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (1) parties meet within 21 days & exchange disclosures; (3) Rule 26 Meeting Report due within 10 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood (KJR)cc: COR
October 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ANSWER to Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against iLOR, LLC by Google, Inc..(McGraw, Brian)
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER (1) Google will take the depo of Stephen Mansfield on 10/9; (2) Google's response to iLOR's 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is due by 10/15/07; (3) iLOR's reply is due by 10/29/2007. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood. (KJR)cc: COR
October 1, 2007 Opinion or Order ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Hood for review: 45 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation (KJR)
October 1, 2007 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO David Schmit re 44 Response to Motion; Error & 45 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation: (1) atty incorrectly filed the Stipulation as a response to motion; Entry by atty; Correction: clerk has modified the docket text of 44 to state this was incorrectly filed; clerk has filed the stipulation as DE 45 ; in the future, atty advised to contact the ECF help desk if assistance is needed in choosing the correct event for filing; (2) the proposed order was filed together with the stipulation instead of as a separate attachment; clerk has added the proposed order as a separate attachment; in future e-filings, atty shall file each exhibit separately from one another & separate from the main document; (3) atty linked the response/stipulation the wrong document; clerk has modified text to create the correct link; no further action required by counsel. cc: COR (KJR)
October 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by iLOR, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(KJR) (Filed pursuant to QC 44 ).
September 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 44 INCORRECTLY FILED AS RESPONSE to Motion re 26 MOTION (1) EXPEDITED DISCOVERY; (2) EXTENSION OF TIME TO OPPOSE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; (3) STAY OF PENDING RESPONSE TIME(S); AND (4) TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE by Google, Inc. Stipulation for Depo/Response-Reply to Motion for Prelim. Injunction filed by iLOR, LLC. (Schmit, David) Modified by correcting the link - took out DE 25 & added DE 26 on 10/1/2007 (Reynolds, Kolleen). Modified on 10/1/2007 (Reynolds, Kolleen). (PLEASE SEE DE 45 FOR CORRECT ENTRY FOR THIS PLEADING)
September 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 43 INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER - GRANTING parties' 41 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order . Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood. (Attachments: # 1 Acknowledgement# 2 2nd Acknowledgement)(KJR)cc: COR
September 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER that pla's 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction shall come on for hearing on 11/19/2007 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood. (KJR)cc: COR,D
September 26, 2007 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO David Schmit re 41 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order by iLOR, LLC ; Error: atty failed to choose the correct filers; Entry by atty; Correction: clerk has added Google, Inc. as a filer to the document; in the future, atty should hold the ctrl key on the keyboard & click on each party filing the pleading; no further action required by counsel. cc: COR (KJR)
September 26, 2007 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Hood for review: 41 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order by iLOR, LLC (KJR)
September 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 41 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order by iLOR, LLC & Google, Inc.- INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Interim Protective Order)(Schmit, David) Modified by adding Google, Inc. as a filer on 9/26/2007 (Reynolds, Kolleen).
September 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER atty Eleanor Maria Farrell Schalnat's 34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for pla. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood. (KJR)cc: COR
September 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING atty William S. Morris' 33 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for pla . Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood. (KJR)cc: COR
September 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING atty Kurt L. Glitzenstein's 23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for dft. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood. (KJR)cc: COR Modified by adding the word "GRANTING" to text on 9/24/2007 (Reynolds, Kolleen).
September 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 37 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENTOF DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC. by Google, Inc.. (McGraw, Brian)
September 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, James Higgins. 14 Stipulation has been filed by Google, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within ten (10) days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (KJR)
September 21, 2007 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Hood for review: 33 MOTION for William S. Morriss to Appear Pro Hac Vice by iLOR, LLC ( Filing fee $65; receipt number 1034609), 34 MOTION for Eleanor Faller Schalnat to Appear Pro Hac Vice by iLOR, LLC ( Filing fee $65; receipt number 1034615) (KJR)
September 21, 2007 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Hood for review: 23 MOTION for Kurt L. Glitzenstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Google, Inc. ( Filing fee $65; receipt number 1029126) (KJR)
September 21, 2007 Opinion or Order ***Attorney William S. Morriss for iLOR, LLC, Eleanor Maria Farrell Schalnat for iLOR, LLC added. (KJR)
September 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION for Eleanor Faller Schalnat to Appear Pro Hac Vice by iLOR, LLC ( Filing fee $65; receipt number 1034615) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Eleanor Farrell Schalnat# 2 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Thomas)
September 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION for William S. Morriss to Appear Pro Hac Vice by iLOR, LLC ( Filing fee $65; receipt number 1034609) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of William Morriss# 2 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Thomas)
September 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE by iLOR, LLC of Substitution of Attorney (O'Brien, Thomas)
September 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER (1) iLor will respond to Google's 1st set of requests for production of docs & things 1-17 by 9/24/07; (2) Mr.Mansfield will be produced for depo on an agreeable date following production of iLOR's docs & in sufficient time for Google to respond to iLOR's preliminary inj motion; (3) Google's response to iLOR's 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by 10/3/07; (4) pending deadlines for Google's response to iLOR's preliminary inj motion will be stayed; (5) the date for the preliminary inj mot will be continued as the ct's calendar permits; (6) Google will withdraw it's motions filed Sept 13 & 14. . Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood. (KJR)cc: COR,D
September 19, 2007 Opinion or Order ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Hood for review: 31 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation (KJR)
September 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by iLOR, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Regarding Stipulation)(McGraw, Brian)
September 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE OF FILING by Google, Inc. re 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Brian P. McGraw (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service for Entry of Appearance)(McGraw, Brian)
September 17, 2007 Opinion or Order *** Attorney Susan Grogan Faller terminated. (KJR)
September 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING atty Susan Grogan Faller's 27 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for pla. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood. (KJR)cc: COR; atty Faller
September 17, 2007 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Hood for review: 27 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by iLOR, LLC (KJR)
September 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Plt iLOR, LLC to file its response to 26 MOTION to Expedite, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION to Continue, MOTION to Stay by 9:00 a.m. on 9/19/2007. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood. (STB)cc: COR
September 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by iLOR, LLC of Susan Grogan Faller (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Consent to Withdraw of Counsel# 2 Proposed Order)(Schmit, David)
September 14, 2007 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO James Higgins re 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, 25 MOTION (1) EXPEDITED DISCOVERY; (2) EXTENSION OF TIME TO OPPOSE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; (3) STAY OF PENDING RESPONSE TIME(S); AND (4) TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE by Google, Inc.; (1) atty failed to provide a certificate of service with the Notice of Appearance; atty advised that each pleading must have a certificate of service; within 3 business days atty shall file a document entitled Notice of Filing with a certificate of service as the main pleading & the certificate of service as an attachment to the Notice of Filing; (2) the attachments to the emergency motion were insufficiently described as "Exhibit D-1, etc" the clerk has renamed the attachments; it is necessary that all attachments are adequately described; (example "Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct)); no further action required by counsel; (3) the emergency motion requests 4 forms of relief; the atty has only filed the pleading as 1 motion; clerk has re-filed the pleading choosing 4 forms of relief requested at DE 26 ; in the future, when filing a motion with multiple reliefs, atty should hold down the ctrl key on the keyboard & click on each relief requested in the motion so each motion appears on the motion report; no further action required by counsel. cc: COR (KJR)
September 14, 2007 Opinion or Order ***Attorney Brian P. McGraw for Google, Inc. added. (KJR)
September 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 26 EMERGENCY MOTION to Expedite discovery; MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to iLOR's 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction; MOTION to Stay Pending Response Time; MOTION to Continue date for the hearing on pla's motion for preliminary injunction by Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 1st Set of Doc Reqs# 2 Exhibit B - Depo Notice to Mansfield# 3 Exhibit C - ltr FES to Schmidt# 4 Exhibit D-1 - 9/4/07 email to David Schmit# 5 Exhibit D-2 - 9/11/07 email to David Schmit# 6 Exhibit D-3 - 9/12/07 email to David Schmit# 7 Exhibit D-4 - 9/12/07 email to Susan Faller# 8 Exhibit D-5 - email to Kurt Glitzenstein# 9 Proposed Order)(filed pursuant to QC re DE 25 )(KJR)
September 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 25 INCORRECTLY FILED ---- MOTION (1) EXPEDITED DISCOVERY; (2) EXTENSION OF TIME TO OPPOSE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; (3) STAY OF PENDING RESPONSE TIME(S); AND (4) TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE by Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A 1st Set of Doc Reqs# 2 Exhibit B Depo Notice to Mansfield# 3 Exhibit C Ltr FES to Schmidt# 4 Exhibit D-1# 5 Exhibit D-2# 6 Exhibit D-3# 7 Exhibit D-4# 8 Exhibit D-5# 9 Proposed Order Emergency Motion)(Higgins, James) Modified by adding the words "INCORRECTLY FILED" to text on 9/14/2007 (Reynolds, Kolleen). (See docket entry 26 for correct filing.)
September 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCEfor Brian P McGraw by Google, Inc..(Higgins, James) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2007 (Reynolds, Kolleen).
September 12, 2007 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Joseph M. Hood for review: 23 MOTION for Kurt L. Glitzenstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Google, Inc. ( Filing fee $65; receipt number 1029126) (LKM)
September 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Kurt L. Glitzenstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Google, Inc. ( Filing fee $65; receipt number 1029126) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Kurt L. Glitzenstein# 2 Proposed Order Admitting Kurt L. Glitzenstein Pro Hac Vice)(Higgins, James)
September 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Kurt L. Glitzenstein by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (KJR)
September 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING atty Matthew J. Leary's 18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for dft. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood. (KJR)cc: COR
September 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING atty Peter J. Kirk's 17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for dft. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood. (KJR)cc: COR
September 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING atty Frank E. Scherkenbach's 16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for dft. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood. (KJR)cc: COR
September 6, 2007 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO James Higgins re 17 MOTION for Peter Kirk to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Google, Inc. & 18 MOTION for Matthew Leary to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Google, Inc.; (1) a certificate of service was not filed with the Motions; & (2) the Affidavits of attys Peter Kirk & Matthew Leary were not signed or notarized; atty shall file a document entitled Notice of Filing with a certificate of service as the main pleading with an additional certificate of service & executed affidavits as attachments; atty has 3 days to cure the deficiency. cc: COR (KJR)
September 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Matthew Leary to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Google, Inc. ( Filing fee $65; receipt number 1025403) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Matthew Leary# 2 Proposed Order Admitting Matthew Leary Pro Hac Vice)(Higgins, James)
September 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Peter Kirk to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Google, Inc. ( Filing fee $65; receipt number 1025393) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Peter Kirk# 2 Proposed Order Admitting Peter Kirk Pro Hac Vice)(Higgins, James)
September 5, 2007 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Hood for review: 16 MOTION for Frank Scherkenbach to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Google, Inc. ( Filing fee $65; receipt number 1024762) (KJR)
September 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Frank Scherkenbach to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Google, Inc. ( Filing fee $65; receipt number 1024762) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Frank Scherkenbach# 2 Proposed Order Admitting Scherkenbach Pro Hac Vice)(Higgins, James)
August 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that Google's answer to pla's Amended Complaint is due by 10/5/2007. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood. (KJR)cc: COR
August 30, 2007 Opinion or Order ***Attorney James R. Higgins, Jr for Google, Inc., Frank E. Scherkenbach for Google, Inc., Kurt L. Glitzenstein for Google, Inc., Peter J. Kirk for Google, Inc., Matthew J. Leary for Google, Inc. added. (KJR)
August 30, 2007 Opinion or Order ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Hood for review: 14 Stipulation (KJR)
August 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION For Enlargment of Time by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order to Stipulation)(Higgins, James)
August 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - MOTION HEARING set for 10/1/2007 01:30 PM re pla's 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood. (KJR)cc: COR,D
August 28, 2007 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Hood for review: 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by iLOR, LLC (KJR)
August 28, 2007 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Susan Faller re 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by iLOR, LLC ; Error: attachments were insufficiently described as "Exhibit A", "Exhibit B", etc.; Entry by atty; Correction: clerk has renamed the attachments; it is necessary that all attachments are adequately described; (Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct)); no further action required by counsel. cc: COR (KJR)
August 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by iLOR, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Part 1# 2 Memorandum in Support Part 2# 3 Proposed Order # 4 Exhibit A# 5 Exhibit B# 6 Exhibit C# 7 Exhibit D# 8 Exhibit E# 9 Exhibit F# 10 Exhibit G# 11 Exhibit H# 12 Exhibit I# 13 Exhibit J# 14 Exhibit K# 15 Exhibit L# 16 Exhibit M# 17 Exhibit N# 18 Exhibit O# 19 Exhibit P# 20 Exhibit Q# 21 Exhibit R# 22 Exhibit S# 23 Exhibit T# 24 Exhibit U# 25 Exhibit V# 26 Exhibit W# 27 Exhibit X# 28 Exhibit Y# 29 Exhibit Z# 30 Exhibit AA# 31 Exhibit BB# 32 Exhibit CC# 33 Exhibit DD# 34 Exhibit EE# 35 Exhibit FF# 36 Exhibit GG# 37 Exhibit HH# 38 Exhibit II# 39 Exhibit JJ# 40 Exhibit KK# 41 Exhibit LL# 42 Exhibit MM# 43 Exhibit NN# 44 Exhibit OO# 45 Exhibit PP# 46 Exhibit QQ# 47 Exhibit RR# 48 Exhibit SS# 49 Exhibit TT# 50 Exhibit UU)(Faller, Susan)
August 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT /Supplemental Complaint with Jury Demand against Google, Inc., filed by iLOR, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Faller, Susan)
August 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by iLOR, LLC; via e-mail and UPS Next Day Air per agreement to Google, Inc.; answer due 9/4/2007. (Faller, Susan) Modified by adding "Google, Inc.; answer due 9/4/2007" to text on 8/22/2007 (Reynolds, Kolleen).
August 21, 2007 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ACTION BY CLERK STRIKING A DOCUMENT FROM THE RECORD re 9 Summons Returned Executed was an INCOMPLETE PDF document filed as main document; Attorney shall re-file the summons & include both pages within three (3) business days. *MRS* cc: COR (KJR)
August 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO Notice of Action Striking Document filed on 8/21/07.
April 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING atty David E. Schmit's 7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for plaintiff. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood. (KJR)cc: COR
April 23, 2007 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Hood for review: 7 MOTION for David E. Schmit to Appear Pro Hac Vice by iLOR, LLC ( Filing fee $65; receipt number 947358) (KJR)
April 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for David E. Schmit to Appear Pro Hac Vice by iLOR, LLC ( Filing fee $65; receipt number 947358) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit and Written Consent of David Schmit# 2 Proposed Order)(Faller, Susan)
April 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CORPORATE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by iLOR, LLC. (Faller, Susan)
April 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding iLOR Patent; (cc: form mailed to register). (KJR)
April 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY David E. Schmit by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (KJR)
April 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Susan Grogan Faller & David E. Schmit. 1 Complaint has been filed by iLOR, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within ten (10) days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (KJR)
April 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Conflict Check run. (KJR)
April 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Google, Inc.; issued summons returned to counsel via mail (KJR)
April 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $350; receipt number 944838), filed by iLOR, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - US Patent# 2 Civil Cover Sheet # 3 TENDERED Summons# 4 ca sheet)(KJR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: iLOR, LLC v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: iLOR, LLC
Represented By: William S. Morriss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Kurt L. Glitzenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: James R. Higgins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: iLOR, LLC
Represented By: David E. Schmit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?