In Re: ClassicStar Mare Lease Litigation MDL No. 1877
Plaintiff: West Hills Farms, LLC, Arbor Farms, LLC, Nelson Breeders, LLC, MacDonald Stables LLC, Beechglen Farms, John Hales, J & L Canterbury Farms, LLC, Leo Hertzog, Jean Hertzog, Gregory R. Raifman, Susan Raifman, Gekko Holdings, LLC, Bissmeyer Properties, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor, Spencer D. Plummer, III, Jaswinder Grover and Monica Grover
Defendant: Buffalo Ranch., GeoStar Corporation, Spencer D. Plummer, III, Tony P. Ferguson, John W. Parrott, S. David Plummer, ClassicStar Thoroughbreds, LLC, First Equine Energy Partners, LLC, Geostar Equine Energy, Inc., Karren Hendrix Stagg Allen & Co., John Parrot, Spencer Plummer, Thom Robinson, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, Classicstar, ClassicStar, LLC, ClassicStar Farms, LLC, National Equine Lending Co., LLC, Geostar Corp., Tony Ferguson, David Plummer, Does 1-3, ClassicStar 2004, LLC, Private Consulting Group, Inc., Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, David S. Forman, Thomas Robinson, Handler, Thayer & Duggan, LLC, Thomas J. Handler, Terry L. Green, Dwayne Schiellack, Schiellack & Associates, Gastar Exploration Limited, Thomas E. Robinson, ClassicStar 2005 Powerfoal Stables, LLC and GeoStar Financial Financial Services Corp.
Counter Claimant: Classicstar and Geostar
Counter Defendant: Spencer D. Plummer, III
ThirdParty Plaintiff: ClassicStar, LLC, ClassicStar Farms, Inc. and Geostar Corp.
ThirdParty Defendant: Spencer D. Plummer, III, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, Zeus Investments, LLC and New NEL, LLC
Cross Claimant: ClassicStar Farms, Inc., ClassicStar, LLC and Geostar Corp.
Cross Defendant: S. David Plummer, II and National Equine Lending Co., LLC
Intervenor Plaintiff: ClassicStar Farms, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2007cv00353
Filed: October 19, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Lexington Office
County: Fayette
Presiding Judge: Joseph M. Hood
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2574 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) (90 in 5:08-cv-00017-JMH-REW, 1627 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW) MOTION to Withdraw by GeoStar Corporation, Geostar Equine Energy, Inc. Motion to Withdraw Deemed Admissions GRANTED; (2) (1605 in 5:07-cv-00353- JMH-REW, 80 in 5:08-cv-00017-JMH-REW) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Dumar Horses, L.C. DENIED; (3) (1626 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 89 in 5:08-cv-00017-JMH-REW) MOTION to Strike (1607 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT) Affidavit in Support of Motion, by GeoStar Corporation, Geostar Equine Energy, Inc. DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 4/11/2014.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:08-cv-00017-JMH-REW(STC)cc: COR
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2478 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: ( 77 in 5:08-cv-00074-JMH-REW, 1611 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as set forth above. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 4/11/2012.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:08-cv-00074-JMH-REW(SCD)cc: COR
April 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2458 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) Plts' (142 in 5:08-cv-00496-JMH-REW, 1696 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW) MOTION for Summary Judgment GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; (2) Plts shall have 10 DAYS to show cause why Sixth Cause of Action for Unjust Enrichment against CFSI should not be dismissed w/ predjudice. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 4/6/2012.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:08-cv-00496-JMH-REW(STB)cc: COR
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1021 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1) Clerk shall ENTER A DEFAULT as to Dft Privating Consulting Group, Inc.; 2) 861 in 07-353 and 62 in 08-496 Motion to Compel Mediation/Arbitration is DENIED AS MOOT; 3) Clerk shall send a copy of this Memorandum Opinion and Order to Bob Keys. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 5/13/2009.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:08-cv-00496-JMH(SCD)cc: COR,MDL,Bob Keys
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 774 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) 642 MOTION for Protective Order by GeoStar Corporation is DENIED; (2) West Hills Plts shall bear reasonable cost to GeoStar of copying & delivering data to counsel for West Hills; (3) By 2/12/2009, GeoStar shall prov ide West Hills good-faith estimate of reasonable cost of copying & delivering data; (4) By 2/17/2009, West Hills shall notify GeoStar whether it wishes GeoStar to proceed to produce data based on estimate; (5) GeoStar shall PRODUCE requested financia l data in native format to West Hills by 3/4/2009; (6) GeoStar shall be relieved of obligation to timely produce data only if West Hills advise GeoStar they do not wish to proceed w/ production as set forth above. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B Todd on 2/2/2009.(STB)cc: COR,MDL
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 751 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER, (1) 553 MOTION to Intervene by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America and Complaint for Interpleader is DENIED; (2) 557 MOTION to Deposit Funds by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America pursuant to Proposed Complaint for Interpleader is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 1/22/2009.(STB)cc: COR,MDL Modified to remove extra text on 1/23/2009 (STB).
December 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 719 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) Clerk shall file Mtn for Reconsideration in 08-17, 08-18, 08-60, 08-74, 08-79, 08-104, 08-373, 08-418, 08-487 & 08-496; (2) 718 MOTION for Reconsideration re 689 Order is DENIED. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 12/23/2008.(STB)cc: COR,MDL
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 594 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) Request by Plts Goyak to strike certain proposed orders is DENIED: (2) Plt West Hills' 484 Mtn for Status Conference is DENIED AS MOOT; (3) Geostar's 492 Mtn for Protective Order is GRANTED IN PART and DE NIED AS MOOT IN PART; (4) depos of Dfts Ferguson, Parrott & Robinson not scheduled prior to 12/1/2008; (5) Dfts Ferguson, Parrott & Robinson not required to respond to interrogatories or requests for admission prior to 12/1/2008, but shall serve responses to all timely served discovery requests by 12/1/2008; (6) that all other permitted discovery shall proceed unless otherwise made subject of an order of this Court. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 10/28/2008.(STB)cc: COR,MDL
October 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED PRACTICE & PROCEDURE ORDER - (1) para 14 of the 2 Interim Practice & Procedure Order is AMENDED to reflect that the court will be guided by the Manual for Complex Litigation, Fourth approved by the Judicial Conf of US & that counsel are directed to familiarize themselves w/that publication; (2) clerk is directed to serve this order to COR & counsel in any addt'l cases transferred hereto. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood. (KJR)cc: COR
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: ClassicStar Mare Lease Litigation MDL No. 1877
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Classicstar
Represented By: Brian M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Geostar
Represented By: Brian M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Spencer D. Plummer, III
Represented By: Jeffrey Weston Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalo Ranch.
Represented By: Vanessa Avril Imberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GeoStar Corporation
Represented By: Brian M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer D. Plummer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony P. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Parrott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. David Plummer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ClassicStar Thoroughbreds, LLC
Represented By: Brian M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Equine Energy Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geostar Equine Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karren Hendrix Stagg Allen & Co.
Represented By: David W. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Parrot
Represented By: Brian M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer Plummer
Represented By: J. Ronald Sim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thom Robinson
Represented By: Brian M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC
Represented By: J. Ronald Sim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Classicstar
Represented By: Matthew A. Stinnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ClassicStar, LLC
Represented By: Matthew A. Stinnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ClassicStar Farms, LLC
Represented By: David Andrew Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Equine Lending Co., LLC
Represented By: Rodney G. Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geostar Corp.
Represented By: Matthew A. Stinnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Ferguson
Represented By: David Andrew Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Plummer
Represented By: J. Ronald Sim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ClassicStar 2004, LLC
Represented By: Brian M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Private Consulting Group, Inc.
Represented By: Janet Knauss Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Eric D. Freed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David S. Forman
Represented By: Nicholas Deenis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Robinson
Represented By: Brian M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Handler, Thayer & Duggan, LLC
Represented By: Howard L. Lieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Handler
Represented By: Howard L. Lieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry L. Green
Represented By: John G. Irvin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwayne Schiellack
Represented By: Sherryll M. Dunaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schiellack & Associates
Represented By: Sherryll M. Dunaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gastar Exploration Limited
Represented By: Robert M. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas E. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ClassicStar 2005 Powerfoal Stables, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GeoStar Financial Financial Services Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty plaintiff: ClassicStar, LLC
Represented By: Brian M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty plaintiff: ClassicStar Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty plaintiff: Geostar Corp.
Represented By: Brian M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Spencer D. Plummer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Zeus Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: New NEL, LLC
Represented By: Walter A. Romney, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: ClassicStar Farms, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: ClassicStar, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Geostar Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: S. David Plummer, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: National Equine Lending Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Hills Farms, LLC
Represented By: Robert C. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arbor Farms, LLC
Represented By: Robert C. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Breeders, LLC
Represented By: Robert C. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MacDonald Stables LLC
Represented By: Robert C. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beechglen Farms
Represented By: T. Parker Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hales
Represented By: T. Parker Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & L Canterbury Farms, LLC
Represented By: Brian P. Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo Hertzog
Represented By: Brian P. Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Hertzog
Represented By: Brian P. Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory R. Raifman
Represented By: Richard J. Idell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Raifman
Represented By: Richard J. Idell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gekko Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Richard J. Idell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bissmeyer Properties
Represented By: Romaine C. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC
Represented By: Niels P. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Minor
Represented By: Niels P. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Minor
Represented By: Niels P. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spencer D. Plummer, III
Represented By: Jeffrey Weston Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaswinder Grover
Represented By: Robert C. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Grover
Represented By: Robert C. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: ClassicStar Farms, Inc.
Represented By: David Andrew Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?