Robinson-Hill et al v. Nurses Registry and Home Health Corporation
Plaintiff: |
Alisia Robinson-Hill and David A. Price |
Defendant: |
Nurses Registry and Home Health Corporation, Lennie G. House and Vicki S. House |
Intervenor: |
USA |
Case Number: |
5:2008cv00145 |
Filed: |
March 18, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky |
Office: |
Lexington Office |
County: |
Fayette |
Presiding Judge: |
Karen K. Caldwell |
Nature of Suit: |
Medicare Act |
Cause of Action: |
31 U.S.C. § 3729 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 15, 2015 |
Filing
301
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: Dfts' 267 JOINT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Volume or Value of Referrals is DENIED. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 7/15/2015.(STC)cc: COR
|
May 27, 2015 |
Filing
273
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: The US's motion 248 to Substitute is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to substitute the Estate of Lennie G. House for individual defendant Lennie G. House and to terminate Lennie G. House as a defendant in this matter. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 05/27/2015.(LC)cc: COR
|
May 12, 2015 |
Filing
254
OPINION AND ORDER: Defendants' 202 JOINT Motion to Strike is DENIED. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/12/2015. (STC)cc: COR
|
June 7, 2013 |
Filing
126
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. 114 MOTION to Compel by USA GRANTED IN PART as follows: No docs duplicative of Central Bank records need be produced; info on American Express statements revealing how Lennie and Vicki House spendy any funds p rovided by Nurses' Registry may be redacted; agreed protective order governing use of responsive records may be filed. 2. Dft Nurses' Registry shall begin producing docs responsive to Req. No. 7 of USA's 9th RPOD w/in 14 days, and that all docs responsive to that request shall be produced w/in 60 days. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 6/7/2013.(STB)cc: COR
|
March 20, 2013 |
Filing
108
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: (1) USA's 97 Motion to Strike GRANTED; (2) the following defenses are STRICKEN from dfts' 91 Answer to Intervenor Complaint, 93 Answer to Intervenor Complaint: a. Second Defense, to extent it pleads t hat governments claims are entirely timebarred; b. Third Defense; c. Seventh Defense; d. Ninth Defense, to extent it pleads that governments claims are entirely timebarred; e. Thirteenth Defense; f. Fifteenth Defense;g. Sixteenth Defense; h. Seventeenth Defense; i. Eighteenth Defense; and j. Twenty-Third Defense. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 3/20/2013. (STB)cc: COR
|
October 2, 2012 |
Filing
87
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1) Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint in Intervention 50 is GRANTED in part & DENIED in part; 2) Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the qui tam Complaint 59 is GRANTED in part & DENIED in part; 3) Relators' Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint 63 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 10/2/2012.(STB)cc: COR
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?