Gay et al v. Martin et al
Plaintiff: James V. Gay and Earl Gay
Defendant: Teddy E. Martin and Montgomery County Sheriff's Office
Case Number: 5:2009cv00026
Filed: January 23, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Lexington Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Jennifer B Coffman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: that this matter is returned to the court's active docket; (2) GRANTING atty Caldwell's 24 amended motion to substitute counsel; the prior 23 motion to substitute counsel is DENIED AS MOOT; (3) that the cour t AMENDS it's prior 25 order re dft Shortridge's 22 motion to dismiss; the motion is GRANTED; the equal protection claim against dft Shortridge is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; (4) that the remaining state law claims against Ted Martin will be discussed at the TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE set for 2/24/2010 at 02:00 PM before Judge Jennifer B Coffman; (5) by 2/19/10, parties are directed to FILE a written proposal for a schedule to resolve these claims and/or a without-prejudice dismissal would be appropriate. Signed by Judge Jennifer B Coffman on 2/3/10.(KJR)cc: COR,D
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: The 22 MOTION to Dismiss is GRANTED. The case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the matter shall be STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Jennifer B Coffman on January 29, 2010. (AWD) cc: COR
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Montgomery County Sheriff's Office Fred Shortridge in his Official Capacity as Montgomery Co Sheriff is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. All claims against Sh ortridge relating to the Due Process Clause, failure to investigate or prosecute, and failure to protect are dismissed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Plaintiff's may amend their Complaint within 15 days in order to plead sufficient facts to support their claim under the Equal Protection Clause. Failure to do so will result in the dismissal of the remaining claim against Shortridge. Signed by Judge Jennifer B Coffman on July 9, 2009. (AWD) cc: COR
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gay et al v. Martin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James V. Gay
Represented By: Walter Bedford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Gay
Represented By: Walter Bedford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teddy E. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?