TS et al v. Doe et al
Plaintiff: TS and T.S.
Defendant: John Doe, Jane Doe, Jay Ronald Haws and A. Hasan Davis
Case Number: 5:2010cv00217
Filed: June 30, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Lexington Office
County: Breathitt
Presiding Judge: Karl S. Forester
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Plas' 92 Motion for Fees is DENIED. Signed by Judge Amul R. Thapar on June 27, 2014. (AWD) cc: COR
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 OPINION & ORDER: (1) Plas' federal claims against the Dfts are hereby DISMISSED based on qualified immunity. (2) Plas' state law claims against the Dfts are REMANDED to Breathitt Circuit Court. (3) Clerk shall mail a certified copy of this Order to the Breathitt Circuit Court Clerk. (4) This matter is DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell for Judge Karl S. Forester on March 26, 2014. (AWD) cc: COR,certified copy to Breathitt Circuit Court Clerk
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 OPINION & ORDER: (1) Defendants' 73 Motion for Leave to File an Additional Exhibit to Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to FILE the tendered exhibit. (2) Defendants' 27 and 67 Motions for Summary Judgment are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, and the Plaintiffs' 34 and 72 Motions for Summary Judgment are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows: (a) Plaintiffs' constitutional claims based on the 14th Amendment and deliberate indifference to the Plaintiffs' constitutional rights are DISMISSED as to all Defendants; (b) Plaintiffs' constitutional claims based on the 4th Amendment as to Defendants Gabbard, Harvey, Haws, Davis, Sewell, Drake and Voyles R EMAIN PENDING; (c) Plaintiffs' state law claims for false imprisonment, negligence and grossly negligent infliction of emotional distress against Defendants Gabbard and Harvey are DISMISSED; (d) Plaintiffs' state law claims based on invasio n of privacy and assault against Defendants Gabbard and Harvey REMAIN PENDING; (e) Plaintiffs' claim for Declaratory Judgment is DISMISSED; and (f) Plaintiffs' claim for Injunctive Relief is PASSED. Signed by Judge Karl S. Forester on June 14, 2012.(AWD) cc: COR
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 OPINION & ORDER: (1) Dfts' 73 Motion for Leave to file an add'l exhibit to supplemental motion for summary judgment is GRANTED, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to FILE the tendered exhibit. (2) Dfts' 27 and 67 Motions for Summary Judg ment are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, and the Plaintiffs' 34 and 72 Motions for Summary Judgment are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows: (a) Plaintiffs' constitutional claims based on the 14th Amendment and deliberate indifference to the Plaintiffs' constitutional rights are DISMISSED as to all Dfts; (b) the Plaintiffs' constitutional claims based on the 4th Amendment against Dfts Haws, Davis, Sewell, Drake and Voyles are DISMISSED, based on qualified im munity; (c) Plaintiffs' constitutional claims based on the 4th Amendment as to Dfts Gabbard and Harvey REMAIN PENDING; (d) Plaintiffs' state law claims for false imprisonment, negligence, and grossly negligent infliction of emotional distre ss are DISMISSED; (e) Plaintiffs' state law claims based on invasion of privacy and assault against Dfts Gabbard and Harvey REMAIN PENDING; (f) Plaintiffs' claim for Declaratory Judgment is DISMISSED; and (g) Plaintiffs' claim for Injunctive Relief is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Karl S. Forester on May 9, 2012. (AWD) cc: COR
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 OPINION & ORDER: (1) Plaintiffs' 63 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery is DENIED. (2) Plaintiffs' 63 Motion for an extension of time to supplement pending dispositive motions is GRANTED only to the extent that the parties may file any necessary amendments to their respective pending summary judgment motions NO LATER THAN APRIL 27, 2012. Signed by Judge Karl S. Forester on April 17, 2012. (AWD) cc: COR
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 OPINION & ORDER: GRANTING IN PART & DENYING IN PART dft Gabbard & Harvey's 11 MOTION to Dismiss; the motion to dismiss is GRANTED for (1) all claims against Gabbard & Harvey in their official capacity; (2) pla's claims for money damages under the KY Constitution; & (3) pla's claim of intentional inflection of emotion distress; all other claims are DENIED. Signed by Judge Karl S. Forester on 10/6/10.(KJR)cc: COR
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TS et al v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TS
Represented By: Joe F. Childers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.S.
Represented By: Joe F. Childers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Represented By: Patrick E. O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Represented By: Patrick E. O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Ronald Haws
Represented By: Roger G. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Hasan Davis
Represented By: Roger G. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?