Espinosa v. Louisville Metro Government et al
Plaintiff: Manuel E. Espinosa
Defendant: Louisville Metro Government and Commonwealth of Kentucky
Case Number: 5:2010cv00354
Filed: October 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Lexington Office
County: Fayette
Presiding Judge: Jennifer B Coffman
Presiding Judge: Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the motions for reconsideration 14 19 are DENIED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all remaining motions 10 11 28 are DENIED AS MOOT; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED as all claims against both dfts have been dismissed, that this action is DISMISSED AND STRICKEN from active docket. A judgment shall be filed separately. Signed by Judge Jennifer B Coffman on 7/31/2011.(GLD)cc: COR, Manuel E. Epinosa, pro se
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the dft's 16 MOTION to Dismiss is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Jennifer B Coffman on 6/10/2011.(GLD)cc: COR, Mailed to pro se plaintiff
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: Pla's Motion for removal 3 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Jennifer B Coffman on 2/28/2011.(GLD)cc: COR AND Manuel E. Espinosa, pro se
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Dft Louisville Metro Government's Motion to Dismiss 5 is GRANTED; Commonwealth's 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to file answer is GRANTED and answer due 2/28/2011. Signed by Judge Jennifer B Coffman on 2/10/2011.(GLD)cc: COR and pro se plaintiff
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Espinosa v. Louisville Metro Government et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel E. Espinosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisville Metro Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Kentucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?