LM Insurance Corporation et al v. Canal Insurance Company
Plaintiff: LM Insurance Corporation and Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Canal Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2011cv00081
Filed: February 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Lexington Office
County: Bourbon
Presiding Judge: Karl S. Forester
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 OPINION & ORDER: Court ORDERS that 36 Motion to Amend/Correct is DENIED. Liberty Mutual's 35 Bill of Costs REMAINS REFERRED to the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge Karl S. Forester on 6/28/2012. (SCD)cc: COR
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 OPINION & ORDER: 1) Plas' 33 and 34 Motions for Judgment are GRANTED to the extent that judgment in the amt of $421,925.51, plus prejudgment interest in the amt of $48,554.90 for a total of $470,480.41, but DENIED as premature with respect to the requested costs. 2) Pla's Bill of Costs is REFERRED to the Clerk pursuant to Rule 54(d) of the Fed Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Karl S. Forester on 4/19/2012.(SCD)cc: COR
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 OPINION & ORDER: 1) 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and summary judgment will be entered in favor of Liberty Mutual for the amt of $421,925.51 plus prejudgment interest. 2) 21 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. 3 ) 31 JOINT MOTION to Amend/Correct 14 Scheduling Order is DENIED AS MOOT. 4) PTC currently set for 4/19/2012 and bench trial currently set for 5/15/2012 are SET ASIDE. 5) WITHIN 10 DAYS OF ENTRY OF THIS ORDER, Liberty Mutual shall submit a proposed Judgment, including amounts for prejudgment interest. Signed by Judge Karl S. Forester on 3/22/2012.(SCD)cc: COR,D
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LM Insurance Corporation et al v. Canal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LM Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer Kaelin Luhrs
Represented By: Charles H. Cassis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles H. Cassis
Represented By: Jennifer Kaelin Luhrs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canal Insurance Company
Represented By: R. William Tooms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?