Options Home Health of North Florida, Inc. et al v. Nurses Registy and Home Health Corporation et al
Plaintiff: |
Options Home Health of North Florida, Inc., Brian Virgo and Josh Goode |
Defendant: |
Nurses Registy and Home Health Corporation and Lennie G. House |
Case Number: |
5:2011cv00166 |
Filed: |
May 17, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky |
Office: |
Lexington Office |
County: |
Fayette |
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph M. Hood |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 24, 2013 |
Filing
125
AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND OPINION: (1) Dft's 82 Motion to Amend the Counterclaim is DENIED. (2) Dft's 78 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. (3) Pla's 80 Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts II and III of Dft's Counterclaim is GRANTED and those claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (4) Plas' 81 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Count 1 and 79 Counts II and VI as they relate to Claims made by Medicare for Reimbursement are GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. (5) This matter remains set for a final PTC on 5/20/2013 and trial on 6/11/2013. The Court further notes that this matter is set for a preliminary PTC before Judge Wier on 5/10/2013. The parties are encouraged to engage in settlement negotiations before that time. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on May 24, 2013. (AWD) cc: COR,D
|
May 20, 2013 |
Filing
116
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Plas' 93 Motion in Limine to exclude Craig Carter, an attorney and accountant, from testifying as an expert witness at trial is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on May 20, 2013. (AWD) cc: COR
|
May 6, 2013 |
Filing
111
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: (1) Dft's 82 Motion to Amend the Counterclaim is DENIED. (2) Dft's 78 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. (3) Pla's 80 Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts II and III of Dft's Counterclai m is GRANTED and those claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (4) Plas' 81 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Count 1 and 79 Counts II and VI as they relate to Claims made by Medicare for Reimbursement are GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. ( 5) This matter remains set for a final PTC on 5/20/2013 and trial on 6/11/2013. The Court further notes that this matter is set for a preliminary PTC before Judge Wier on 5/10/2013. The parties are encouraged to engage in settlement negotiations before that time. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on May 6, 2013. (AWD) cc: COR,D
|
February 9, 2012 |
Filing
50
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Nurses Registy and Home Health Corporation DENIED; 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Lennie G. House DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 2/9/2012.(STB)cc: COR Modified on 2/10/2012 (STB).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?