The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company v. Cox et al
Plaintiff: The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Barbara Cox
Case Number: 5:2011cv00334
Filed: October 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Lexington Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Jennifer B Coffman
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 178 JUDGMENT: JUDGMENT is entered in favor of the Plaintiff against dft Barbara Cox, individually and as Administratrix in the amount of$759,997.44 in losses and $ 100,000.00 in expenses and costs, for a total award of $ 859,997.44. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter be DISMISSED and stricken from the active docket of this Court. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 3/14/2016.(LC)cc: COR
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER: (1) APPROVING & ADOPTING the 133 Report and Recommendations; (2) SUSTAINING pla's 120 121 Motions for Summary Judgment; (3) SUSTAINING 3rd-Pty Dfts' 122 Motion for Summary Judgment; (4) OVERRULING Dft Cox's 125 Motion to Dismiss; (5) pursuant to the court's 9/25/14 Order, Dft Barbara Cox pay to the 3rd-Pty Dfts the amt of $17,212.50 due immediately. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 9/22/15. (KJR)cc: COR
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Report and Recommendations 102 is APPROVED and ADOPTED; 2. Third Party's Motion for Rule 37 Sanctions 78 and Plaintiff's Motion for Rule 37 Sanctions 80 be SUSTAINED as set forth in the R&R. IT IS FURT HER ORDERED that the Plaintiff and Third Party Defendant file a detailed fee request and supporting affidavits on or before October 14, 2014. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 09/25/2014.(lc)cc: COR, Barbara Cox via US mail Modified on 9/25/2014 (lc).
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 49 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Barbara Cox is OVERRULED, and 50 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company is OVERRULED. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr.(STC)cc: COR
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the third-party dfts' 10 MOTION to Dismiss is DENIED without prejudice; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that pla's 14 MOTION for telephonic sched conference is DENIED without prejudice as premature; third-party dfts shall file answers to third party complaint w/in 20 days of entry of this order. Signed by Judge Jennifer B Coffman on 4/18/2012.(GLD)cc: COR
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company v. Cox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Benjamin A. Bellamy
Represented By: Timothy D. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?