Basic v. Carl
Petitioner: Azra Basic
Respondent: Loren Carl
Case Number: 5:2012cv00274
Filed: August 28, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Lexington Office
County: Fayette
Presiding Judge: PSO
Presiding Judge: Karen K. Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) GRANTING petitioner's 54 MOTION to Stay; (2) the court's 52 opinion & order & 53 judgment are STAYED pending the resolution of petitioner's appeal to the 6CCA; (3) the USA & all of its various depts are stayed & enjoined from extraditing petitioner from the US until her appeal is resolved. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 8/12/15.(KJR)cc: COR
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 OPINION AND ORDER: Basic's petition 1 for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DENIED. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 07/09/2015.(LC)cc: COR,
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 OPINION & ORDER: MOTION for Release on Bond Conditions 47 filed by Azra Basic is DENIED. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 09/10/2014.(lc)cc: COR
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Basic v. Carl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Azra Basic
Represented By: Patrick F. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Loren Carl
Represented By: James E. Arehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?