Natural Alternatives, LLC et al v. JM Farms et al
Plaintiff: |
Natural Alternatives, LLC and Todd A. Bloomer |
Defendant: |
JM Farms, Max Smith, SNI Solutions, Inc. and John Does |
Case Number: |
5:2012cv00333 |
Filed: |
November 1, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky |
Office: |
Lexington Office |
County: |
Fayette |
Presiding Judge: |
Karen K. Caldwell |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 30, 2016 |
Filing
74
OPINION & ORDER: (1) DENYING plas' 62 Motion for Summary Judgment; (2) GRANTING dfts' 65 Motion for Summary Judgment; (3) any breach of contract claim by Todd Bloomer is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/30/16. (KJR)cc: COR Modified text on 9/30/2016 (KJR).
|
April 28, 2015 |
Filing
51
OPINION AND ORDER: the Court ORDERS that JM Farms' 44 motion for reconsideration is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as follows: 1) the parties may engage in discovery & motion practice re whether JM Farms remains obligated to pay royalty fe es under terms of the license agreement even if the '330 & '684 patents are invalid; 2) discovery & other proceedings on the issue of validity of '330 & '684 patents are STAYED until Court resolves the issue discussed above; 3) w/ in 14 days of entry date of this order, parties SHALL FILE a new proposed scheduling order containing a discovery plan & motion deadlines for resolution of the issue discussed in paragraph 1; 4) w/in 7 days of resolution of the USPTO's reexamina tion of either patent '330 or '684, Natural Alternatives, LLC SHALL FILE a notice advising the Court of the resolution; & 5) count III of JM Farms' counterclaim is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on April 28, 2015. (MWZ) cc: COR
|
December 2, 2014 |
Filing
42
OPINION & ORDER: (1) DENYING dfts' 35 MOTION to Stay Pending Patent Reexamination; the prior Stay of this case is LIFTED; (2) w/in 14 days, parties are ordered to submit a new proposed scheduling order consistent w/this order; if parties ar e unable to agree, then each party should submit separate proposed schedules; (3) if any party's proposed scheduling order contains dates for claims construction proceedings such as those contained in para 2&3 of the scheduling order, that party should submit an explanation as to how these proceedings are relevant to the claims/defenses in this action; (4) w/in 21 days dfts shall SHOW CAUSE why Count III of its counterclaim should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; Natural Alternatives may file a response w/in 21 days thereafter; (5) DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS MOOT pla's 33 MOTION to Compel discovery. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 12/2/14.(KJR)cc: COR
|
September 30, 2013 |
Filing
27
OPINION AND ORDER: DENYING pla's 22 Motion to Dismiss the dft's counterclaim. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/30/13. (KJR)cc: COR
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?