Banks v. Bosch Rexroth Corporation et al
Plaintiff: |
LaShaunna Banks |
Defendant: |
Bosch Rexroth Corporation, Dan Reynolds and Geoff O'Nan |
Case Number: |
5:2012cv00345 |
Filed: |
November 16, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky |
Office: |
Lexington Office |
County: |
Fayette |
Presiding Judge: |
Danny C. Reeves |
Nature of Suit: |
Family and Medical Leave Act |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 3, 2014 |
Filing
87
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: 1. Plt's 78 Motion to Review Clerk's taxation of costs is DENIED; 2. Dfts are awarded $5,579.14 in costs consistent with Clerk's decision 77 . Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 9/3/2014. (STC)cc: COR
|
April 14, 2014 |
Filing
70
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. Dfts' 49 MOTION for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. 2. Plt's 47 MOTION in Limine is DENIED AS MOOT. 3. All claims having been resolved, this action is DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the Court's docket. 4. A final and appealable Judgment shall be entered this date. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/14/2014.(STC)cc: COR
|
April 7, 2014 |
Filing
67
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) GRANTED IN PART & DENIED IN PART dfts' 37 MOTION to Exclude the expert opinion & testimony of Scott R. Bauries, JD,Ph.D; Bauries may testify re the calculation of FMLA leave; however all other opinions concerning the dfts' liability will be excluded; (2) DENYING dft's request for leave to depose Bauries. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/7/14.(KJR)cc: COR
|
March 5, 2014 |
Filing
53
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) GRANTING IN PART dft's 25 MOTION to Dismiss; granting with respect to: (a) Count III & IV as it pertains to the dfts Dan Reynolds, Geoff O'Nan & Valenda Allen, (b) Count VI, in its entirety, (c) Count VII , in its entirety, (d) Count VIII, in its entirety; (2) DENYING 25 Motion to Dismiss with respect to the remaining counts; (3) DENYING pla's request for leave to file a Second Amended Complaint; however, dft's request for a more definite statement is GRANTED; (4) pla is directed to file a more definite statement w/in 10 days of entry of this order. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 3/5/14.(KJR)cc: COR
|
June 21, 2013 |
Filing
19
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) Plaintiff's 15 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Clerk directed to file Amended Complaint in the record. (2) To the extent defendant's response contains request for add'l writen discovery or depositions, that request is DENIED, w/out prejudice. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 6/21/2013.(STB)cc: COR
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?