Erickson v. University of Kentucky et al
Plaintiff: |
Heidi K. Erickson |
Defendant: |
University of Kentucky Appeals Board, Parking Department, University of Kentucky, Joseph Fink, III and Lance Broeking |
Case Number: |
5:2013cv00052 |
Filed: |
February 26, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky |
Office: |
Lexington Office |
County: |
Bourbon |
Presiding Judge: |
Karl S. Forester |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 29, 2014 |
Filing
41
OPINION & ORDER: (1) 39 Motion to correct errors is GRANTED. (2) 32 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/29/2014. (SCD)cc: COR,Pro Se Pla(via US Mail)
|
April 17, 2014 |
Filing
30
OPINION & ORDER: DENYING pla's 27 Motion to Vacate 27 MOTION for Relief/Vacate 26 Order on Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 4/17/14. (KJR)cc: COR, Pla (US Mail)
|
March 4, 2014 |
Filing
26
OPINION & ORDER: (1) Recommended Disposition 25 is ADOPTED as and for the opinion of the Court; (2) this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE ;(3) all remaining motions are DENIED as moot; and(4) this matter is STRICKEN from the active docket. Signed by Judge Karl S. Forester on 3/4/2014. (CBD)cc: COR w/ copy to Heidi K. Erickson via US Mail, Lex Diary, Lex JC. Modified cc on 3/4/2014 (CBD).
|
October 3, 2013 |
Filing
11
OPINION & ORDER: (1) 5 MOTION for access to file and review via PACER is DENIED. (2) 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED. (3) 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct her complaint is GRANTED. (4) 1 Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE w respect to all claims against UK, Joseph Fink, in his official capacity, Lance Broeking, in his individual and official capacity, the Parking Dept, and University Appeals Board. (5) Pla is permitted to proceed on her claims against Joseph Fink, II I, individually pursuant to 42 USC 1983. (6) Pla's 10 motion for summons is GRANTED as to Joseph Fink, III and denied in all other respects. (7) Clerk shall prepare and issue summons for Joseph Fink, III in his individual capacity. (8) Clerk s hall prepare a copy of the complaint and USM Form. If insufficient info exists to complete the forms, Clerk shall make a clerk's entyr stating why Clerk cannot fill out the summons or USM form. (9) After Clerk has prepared the summons, USM Form, complaint copy, copy of this Order, Clerk shall hand-deliver said docs to USM. (10) Clerk shall obtain from USM a receipt whuch shall be entered into the instant report. (11) USM shall serve a summons, complaint, and copy of this Order on dft Joseph Fink, III, individually by certified mail, return receipt requested. (12) USM shall make a return report w/in 40 days. (13) Pla shall keep Clerk informed of her current mailing address. (14) For further pleading submit for consideration, Pla shall serve upon the dft or if atty has entered an appearance, upon each atty. Pla shall send the original papers to Clerk for filing w a certificate service. Signed by Judge Karl S. Forester on 10/3/2013.(SCD)cc: COR,USM,Pro Se Pla(via US Mail)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?