January 9, 2017 |
Filing
116
ORDER: 1. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE set for 2/3/2017 at 10:30 AM in COVINGTON before Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith. All parties or counsel shall participate in call. Court will initiate call. 2. Dfts shall file a response to pending 115 MOTION for this Court to Enforce its Order re 110 Order filed by John Rose, by 1/24/2017. Plt will have until 1/31/2017 to file his reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 1/9/2017.(STC)cc: COR,CovD,Plt
|
November 13, 2015 |
Filing
39
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. Pittman's 21 MOTION to Dismiss, as amended, against her, for failure to state a claim is GRANTED; 2. Plaintiff's claims against dft Tammy Pittman are DISMISSED, and Tammy Pittman is terminated as a party to this action. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 11/13/2015.(STC)cc: COR,Plt
|
July 15, 2015 |
Filing
13
AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) Plt's 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint is GRANTED; (2) Clerk amend docket sheet to name Tammy Pittman, LPT, NTC as dft instead of Tammy Wilson; (3) Plt's claims for monetary damages against all dfts in official capacity DIMISSED; (4) Plt's claims for injunctive relief against Dr. Rhee, S. Votaw, L. Watson, L Good, T. Pittman, J. Thomas, Prison Correct Care Solutions in official capacity are DIMISSED; (5) Plt's claims for mone tary damages against dfts Dr. Rhee, J. Thomas and Prison Correct Care Solutions in their individual capacity DISMISSED; (6) All claims having been resolved against Dr. Rhee; J. Thomas; and Prison Correct Care Solutions/Correct Care Solutions having b een resolved, they are DISMISSED as parties to this action; (7) Plt's claims against Dr. Crall in his official capacity for injunctive relief and in his individual capacity for monetary damages shall proceed; (8) Plt's claims against S. Vot aw, L. Watson, L. Good, T. Pittman, all in their individual capacities for monetary damages shall proceed; (9) Clerk shall prepare docs necessary for service of process upon Dr. Crall, S. Votaw, L. Watson, L. Good, T. Pittman; (10) Clerk shall prepar e Service Packed for service on dfts; (11) Clerk provide service packets to USMS; (12) Service on Dr. Crall shall be conducted by USMS by serving packet personally, through arrangements w/ Ky Dept of Corrections; (13) Service upon S. Votaw, L. Watson , L. Good, T. Pittman shall be conducted by USMS by serving packed personally through arrangements w/ Northpoint Training Center; (14) Clerk directed to serve copy of Order on Ky Dept of Corrections; (15) Plt SHALL advise clerk's office of change in mailing address; communicate w/ court solely through notices or motions filed w/ Clerk's office; certify copy mailed to every dft. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 7/15/2015.(STC)cc: Plt,USM,KyDOC
|
July 14, 2015 |
Filing
10
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: (1) Plt's 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint is GRANTED; (2) Clerk amend docket sheet to name Tammy Pittman, LPT, NTC as dft instead of Tammy Wilson; (3) Plt's claims for monetary damages against all dfts in official capacity DIMISSED; (4) Plt's claims for injunctive relief against Dr. Rhee, S. Votaw, L. Watson, L Good, T. Pittman, J. Thomas, Prison Correct Care Solutions in official capacity are DIMISSED; (5) Plt's claims for monetary damages against dfts Dr. Rhee, J. Thomas and Prison Correct Care Solutions in their individual capacity DISMISSED; (6) All claims having been resolved against Dr. Rhee; J. Thomas; and Prison Correct Care Solutions/Correct Care Solutions having been resolved, they are DISMISSED as parties to this action; (7) Plt's claims against Dr. Crall in his official capacity for injunctive relief and in his individual capacity for monetary damages shall proceed; (8) Plt's claims against S. Votaw, L. Watson, L. Good, T. Pittman, all in their individual capacities for monetary damages shall proceed; (9) Clerk shall prepare docs necessary for service of process upon Dr. Crall, S. Votaw, L. Watson, L. Good, T. Pittman; (10) Clerk shall prepare S ervice Packed for service on dfts; (11) Clerk provide service packets to USMS; (12) Service on Dr. Crall shall be conducted by USMS by serving packet personally, through arrangements w/ Ky Dept of Corrections; (13) Service upon S. Votaw, L. Watson, L. Good, T. Pittman shall be conducted by USMS by serving packed personally through arrangements w/ Northpoint Training Center; (14) Clerk directed to serve copy of Order on Ky Dept of Corrections; (15) Plt SHALL advise clerk's office of change in mailing address; communicate w/ court solely through notices or motions filed w/ Clerk's office; certify copy mailed to every dft. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 7/14/2015.(STC)cc: Plt,USM,KyDOC Modified on 7/14/2015 (STC).
|