Anderson v. Dickson et al
Plaintiff: Artis Anderson
Defendant: Vanessa M. Dickson, Patricia Wiley, Patricia Biggerstaff, Costigan, Rankin, Ford, Council Oaks, John Short, Thomas Quisenberry, Thomas Coburn, Robert Horn and Benny Sowder
Case Number: 5:2016cv00071
Filed: February 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Lexington Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Karen K. Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 1/11/19.(JLM)cc: COR, Anderson by U.S. Mail.
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 OPINION AND ORDER: 1) 80 Motion for Attorney Fees by Dft Horn is GRANTED. Anderson MUST PAY Horn atty's fees and costs of $720. 2) 81 Motion for Attorney Fees by Dft Thomas Quisenberry is GRANTED. Anderson MUST PAY Quisenberry atty� 39;s fees and costs of $2700. 3) 82 Motion for Costs and Fees by dfts Council Oaks and Short is GRANTED. Anderson MUST PAY Council Oaks and Short a total of $7300 in atty's fees and costs. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 8/24/2018. (SCD)cc: COR,Pro Se Pla(via US Mail)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 OPINION & ORDER: (1) GRANTING Quisenberry's 11 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim, 17 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION to Dismiss & 47 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim; GRANTING Council Oaks & Short's 14 MOTION to Dismiss & 42 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; GRANTING Biggerstaff & Wiley's 26 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim & 44 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim; (2) all claims asserted under 42:1981, 1983 & 1985 are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; (3) all state-law claims asserted by pla are DISMSISED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 7/26/16.(KJR)cc: COR, Anderson & Horn (US Mail). Modified on 7/26/2016 (KJR).
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 OPINION AND ORDER: 1) 64 Motion to recuse, 3 motion for preliminary injunction, and 4 motion for grand jury referral are DENIED. 2) Robert Horn's 25 Motion to join the motion to dismiss by dfts Council Oaks, John Short, and Thomas Quisen berry is GRANTED. 3) Dft Thomas Coburn's 53 motion to join the motion to dismiss filed by Thomas Quisenberry is GRANTED. 4) 61 Motion to stay discovery is GRANTED. No party is permitted to conduct discovery until a Scheduling Order has been issued. Scheduling Order will not be issued until after the Court rules on all the pending motions to dismiss. 5) 19 and 58 Motions to dismiss filed by Judges Dickson and Moss are GRANTED and all claims against those dfts are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 7/21/2016.(SCD)cc: COR,Pro Se Pla(via US Mail),Robert Horn(via US Mail)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Dickson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Artis Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanessa M. Dickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Biggerstaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Council Oaks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Quisenberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benny Sowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?