EQT Production Company v. Magnum Hunter Production, Inc.
Plaintiff: EQT Production Company
Defendant: Magnum Hunter Production, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2016cv00150
Filed: May 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Lexington Office
County: Fayette
Presiding Judge: Joseph M. Hood
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: EQT's 124 Motion for a New Trial or Altered Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 3/8/2018. (STC)cc: COR
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: IT IS ORDERED as follows: 1. EQTs objection to Magnum Hunters defense that EQTs claims from the 2002-2010 period are time-barred [DE 97 , p. 7-8] is OVERRULED. In addition, FOA's requiring parties to bring claims wit hin 24 months are EXCLUDED for 2002-2010 time period. Magnum Hunter will be permitted to make a laches defense as to the other FOAs for this time period; 2. EQT's request for data on FOAs during 2002-2010 period is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. For the FOAs not excluded by this order, Magnum Hunter must supply information to EQT; 3. EQTs objection to Magnum Hunters defense of overpayment [DE 97 , p. 7] is OVERRULED. Magnum Hunter may argue it is entitled to credit for overpayment during the Mercadante Audit period; 4. EQT shall be PROHIBITED from seeking any damages amount not listed in its Complaint. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 8/31/2017.(KM)cc: COR
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: The Plaintiff's 93 MOTION for Reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 08/15/2017.(LC)cc: COR
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: It is ordered that 73 MOTION in Limine is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 8/11/2017.(SCD)cc: COR
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: that plaintiff's 65 Objections to Judge Wier's 61 Order, are OVERRULED. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 7/19/17.(KJR)cc: COR
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: The Court DENIES 49 MOTION for Reconsideration and affirms the provisional ruling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert E. Wier on 05/25/2017.(LC)cc: COR
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EQT Production Company v. Magnum Hunter Production, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EQT Production Company
Represented By: Nora Clevenger Currens
Represented By: Candace Beth Smith
Represented By: Alana M. Valle
Represented By: John Kevin West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magnum Hunter Production, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?