Adams v. Brenton
Plaintiff: |
Cory Adams |
Defendant: |
Wes C. Brenton |
Case Number: |
5:2017cv00251 |
Filed: |
June 8, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky |
Office: |
Lexington Office |
County: |
Scott |
Presiding Judge: |
Karen K. Caldwell |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 25, 2019 |
Filing
83
OPINION AND ORDER: This matter is before the Court on the writ of execution (DE 76 ) tendered by plaintiff Cory Adams. As to the jumping horse, Ashley has filed an affidavit stating that she sold the horse on October 11, 2017 to an individual name d Katie Dickerson. Accordingly, the Court will not issue a writ of execution authorizing the U.S. Marshal to seize the jumping horse from Ashleys possession at the last known location of Top Venture West, LLC. There is no basisfor any finding that the horse is located there. As to the $19,350 in cash, Ashley has filed an affidavit stating that the only money she has in her possession is in her checking account and totals $223.71. Accordingly, the Court will not issue a writ of execution authorizing the U.S. Marshal to seize $19,350 in cash from Ashley's residence. There is no basis for any finding that any cash is located at the residence. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/25/2019.(JLM)cc: COR
|
June 7, 2019 |
Filing
78
OPINION & ORDER re: 76 Writ of Execution. The Court hereby ORDERS that, within seven days of the entry date of this order, Adams SHALL FILE into the record of this matter a brief that: 1) explains why the Louis Vuitton purse and the jumping hor se are not exempt from execution and attachment under Kentucky law; and 2) sets forth the basis for his assertion that the $19,350 transferred by the defendant to Ashley Rayne Brenton is currently located at 1161 Wood Ridge Rd., Lexington, KY. C ounsel for Ashley Rayne Brenton has recently filed an appearance in this matter. If she wishes to file a response to any filing by Adams, she MUST DO SO within seven days of Adams' filing. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 6/7/19.(JLM)cc: COR,Wes C. Brenton to both addresses listed on docket via U.S. mail.
|
November 13, 2018 |
Filing
70
JUDGMENT: 1. Plaintiff Cory Adams is entitle to summary judgment in his favor on claims against defendant Wes C. Brenton for breach of contract, breach of express warranty, violation of the Kentucky Consumer Protection Act, and fraud; 2. Dft Wes C. Brenton is LIABLE to Adams for the following amounts: a. Compensatory damages of $235,000 plus interest; b. Attorney's fee of $40384.35; 3. This judgment is FINAL and APPEALABLE; 4. This matter is DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the Courts active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 11/13/2018.(KM)cc: COR, Dft via U.S. mail to both addresses listed on docket
|
June 4, 2018 |
Filing
61
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court ORDERS 1) 54 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, a) GRANTED as to Adams' claims for breach of contract, breach of warranty, violation of the KCPA, fraudulent concealment, and fraudulent misrepresentation. The Court Orders and Adjudges that Brenton is liable to Adams as a matter of law on all of these claims; and b) DENIED as to Adams' conversion claim. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 6/4/2018. (SCD)cc: COR,Pro Se Dft(via US Mail)
|
March 6, 2018 |
Filing
51
OPINION AND ORDER: 1) 43 MOTION to Exclude Defendant as an Expert Witness is GRANTED. 2) 3 Motion for a preliminary injunction is GRANTED. Terms of the injunction will be set forth in a separate order. 3) 13 Motion for hearing is DEN IED as moot. Adams having filed a second motion requesting same relief on 8/21/2018. 4) 19 Second motion for hearing is DENIED as moot. 5) 18 Motion for sanctions is DENIED. 6) Matter remains set for jury trial. JURY TRIAL will commence 6/11/2018 at 9:00 AM in LEXINGTON with counsel and parties to be present at 8:30 AM. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 3/6/2018.(SCD)cc: COR,D,JC,Pro Se Dft(via US Mail at both addresses listed in DE 39 )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?