Ascion, LLC v. Tempur Sealy International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Ascion, LLC |
Defendant: |
Tempur Sealy International, Inc. and Tempur-Pedic Management, LLC |
Counter_claimant: |
Tempur-Pedic Management, LLC and Tempur Sealy International, Inc. |
Counter_defendant: |
Ascion, LLC |
Case Number: |
5:2017cv00403 |
Filed: |
October 16, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky |
Office: |
Lexington Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph M. Hood |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 1126 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 29, 2024 |
Filing
312
OPINION AND ORDER: 1) Reverie's motion to compel access to source code ( 174 , 300 ) is DENIED; 2) Reverie's 311 Motion for Hearing is DENIED; and 3) The parties SHALL FILE any dispositive motions and/or Daubert motions within 30 days of entry of this order. Further, the parties may file responses and replies to these motions in accordance with the Local Rules. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 4/29/2024. (STC)cc: COR
|
August 10, 2022 |
Filing
184
OPINION & ORDER: 1. Magistrate Judge Atkins' Report and Recommendation on Defendants' Motion for Sanctions (DE 179 ) is hereby ADOPTED IN FULL. 2. Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Stay Deadline for Final Election of Asserted Claims (DE 68 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. 3. Defendants' Motion to Supplement the Record for Purposes of Assessing Sanctions (DE 164 ) is GRANTED. 4. Defendants' Motion for Sanctions (DE 161 ) is GRANTED insofar as Plaintiff is ORDERED to pay for al l costs associated with the Defendants' pursuit of sanctions and the drafting of the supplemental filings entered in support thereof, as well as the time that counsel expended in briefing the aforementioned issues before the Court. 5. Defenda nts' unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (DE 183 ) is GRANTED. 6. The parties shall file all dispositive motions and motions in limine, including those made pursuant to Daubert v. Merrell Dow Pharm, Inc., 509 U.S. 579 (1993), no later than August 22, 2022. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 8/10/22.(JLM)cc: COR and attys Kolozsvary, Weed, Rucker by US Mail Modified on 8/10/2022 (JLM).
|
September 23, 2021 |
Filing
144
OPINION AND ORDER: 1. denying 129 Plt Ascion, LLC's Motion for Leave to Supplement the Complaint.(2) No later than September 24, 2021, the parties SHALL file a Joint Stipulation, outlining the amount of time necessary to complete all relevant tasks and remaining deadlines. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 9/23/21. (JLM)cc: COR and Andrew Kolozsvary, Benjamin Weed, Bryce Rucker by US mail
|
July 28, 2021 |
Filing
136
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER and ORDER ON CLAIM CONSTRUCTION: The claim terms listed shall be construed as listed herein. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 7/28/2021.(KM)cc: COR
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?