Chenault et al v. The University of Kentucky (UK)

Appellant: Cory Lamon Chenault
Appellee: Central Kentucky Management Services and The University of Kentucky (UK)
Case Number: 5:2018cv00475
Filed: August 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Lexington Office
County: Fayette
Presiding Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: 1. The Court accepts Appellant Chenault's September 17, 2018, brief #8 ; and 2. The #5 scheduling mechanics persist. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 9/27/2018.(STC)cc: COR,Appellant
September 19, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Robert E. Wier for review: #8 Appellant's Brief, #7 Response to Order to Show Cause (GLD)
September 17, 2018 Filing 8 Appellant's BRIEF by Cory Lamon Chenault, pro se. (STC) Modified on 9/18/2018 (STC).
September 17, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE/MOTION TO EXCUSE DELAY by Cory Lamon Chenault, pro se, re #6 Order to Show Cause. (STC)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: 1. Appellant Chenault SHALL SHOW CAUSE why the Court should not dismiss this appeal for failure to prosecute within 30 days; 2. Failure to show cause will result in dismissal, without prejudice, of this appeal. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 9/14/2018.(STC)cc: COR,Appellant
September 11, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Wier for review: #5 Bankruptcy Scheduling Notice - Appellant brief not filed. (STC)
August 8, 2018 Filing 5 Bankruptcy Scheduling Notice: Appellant serve & file a brief w/in 30 days; Appellee serve & file brief 30 days later; Appellant may serve & file reply brief 14 days after service of Appellee brief. (STC)
August 8, 2018 VIRTUAL NOTICE re: Record on Bankruptcy Appeal re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal - Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 8010(b)(3), parties are advised that Bankruptcy Court notified District Court the record on appeal is electronically available as it relates to re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (STC)
August 3, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Central Kentucky Management Services. (Henry, Kevin)
August 1, 2018 Conflict Check run. (GLD)
August 1, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election by Cory Lamon Chenault and related documents from BAP: re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Attachments: #1 Appellees' Statement of Election to Proceed in District Court, #2 Bankruptcy Appellate Panel for the Sixth Circuit Docket Sheet, #3 U.S. Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet for Adv. #17-05024-grs, #4 Order, dated 6/29/18, DE #34, Adv. 17-05024-grs)(GLD)
August 1, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BAP- Bankruptcy Court case number Adv. 17-05024 grs. (GLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chenault et al v. The University of Kentucky (UK)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Cory Lamon Chenault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Central Kentucky Management Services
Represented By: Sarah Charles Wright
Represented By: Kevin G. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: The University of Kentucky (UK)
Represented By: William Eugene Thro
Represented By: Kevin G. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?