USA v. Day

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Jeffrey Terrill Day
Case Number: 5:2018cv00479
Filed: August 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Lexington Office
County: Jessamine
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: It is ORDERED that the United States is directed to file a STATUS REPORT on or before 10/12/2018. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 9/28/2018.(KM)cc: COR
August 28, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: #4 Notice of Filing (KM)
August 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING by USA (Attachments: #1 Letter from defendant)(Datta, Rajbir)
August 2, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jeffrey Terrill Day; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (KM)
August 2, 2018 Conflict Check run. (KM)
August 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Indebtedness, #2 Exhibit B - National Health Service Corps Loan Repayment Contract, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(KM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Terrill Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Rajbir Datta, AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?