Williams v. Conyers et al
Plaintiff: Gerald Williams
Defendant: Christy Jolly, Correct Care Solution, Stephanie Thompson, Dawn Patterson, Shelli Votaw Conyers and Denise A. Burkett
Case Number: 5:2018cv00480
Filed: August 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Lexington Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: P SO
Referring Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Filing 11 JUDGMENT: 1) Eighth Amendment claims asserted by Pla are DISMISSED with prejudice. Judgment is entered in favor of the dfts with respect to these claims. 2) Any state law medical malpractice claims Pla may intend to assert are DISMISSED without prejudice. 3) This action is STRICKEN from the Court's docket. 4) This is a FINAL and APPEALABLE Judgment and there is no just cause for delay. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 9/11/2018.(SCD)cc: Pro Se Pla(via US Mail)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1) Williams's Eighth Amendment claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. 2) Any state law medical malpractice claims Williams may intend to assert are DISMISSED without prejudice. 3) This action is STRICKEN from the Court's docket. 4) A Judgment will be entered this date. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 9/11/2018.(SCD)cc: Pro Se Pla(via US Mail)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the #7 Motion to Amend Complaint and deems Williams's complaint so amended. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 9/11/2018. (KM)cc: COR, Pltf via U.S. mail
September 7, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of service of Motion to Amend to corrected address of Dawn Patterson by Gerald Williams (pro se). (KJR) Modified text on 9/7/2018 (KJR). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/7/2018: #1 return envelope) (KJR).
September 7, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: re #7 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Gerald Williams (KJR)
September 7, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Gerald Williams (pro se). Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Relief page of cmp, return env, #2 env postmarked 9/5/18)(KJR)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: GRANTING Williams' #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; payment of $50.00 admn fee is WAIVED; Williams must pay $350.00 ff; (2) w/in 30 days Williams must pay $6.42 as an initial partial filing fee; (3) Clerk shall open an account; send a Notice of Payment Form to the Warden; (4) after initial partial filing fee is paid, each month Williams' custodian shall send a payment in an amt equal to 20% of his income but only if the amt in his account exceeds $10.00; custodian shall continue monthly payments until paid; (5) matter stands submitted for initial screening. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 8/24/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Payment) (KJR)cc: COR, Finance, Williams & Warden (US Mail)
August 6, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gerald Williams (KJR)
August 6, 2018 Conflict Check run. (KJR)
August 3, 2018 Filing 5 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 sample caption)(KJR)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Gerald Williams. (pro se) (KJR)
August 3, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gerald Williams (pro se). Motions referred to P SO. (KJR)
August 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT referred to P SO., filed by Gerald Williams (pro se). (Attachments: #1 Health Care Grievance Committee, #2 env postmarked 8/1/18)(KJR) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2018: #3 Summons) (KJR). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2018: #4 Relief Page of Complaint & Return Envelope added per Order #9 ) (KM). Modified text on 9/11/2018 (KM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Conyers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christy Jolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Solution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelli Votaw Conyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise A. Burkett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?