Hill v. Tammy et al
Plaintiff: Harold Hill
Defendant: Officer Johnson, Tom Jones, Doug Thomas and Nurse Tammy
Case Number: 5:2018cv00488
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Lexington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: 1. Hill's complaint #1 is DISMISSED without prejudice. 2. All pending motions are DENIED as moot. 3. This action is STRICKEN from the Court's docket. 4. If Hill wishes to pursue one or more of his claims, he may so by completing and filing the appropriate Court-approved forms in accordance with this Order. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 8/17/2018.(JJ)cc: COR, pro se plaintiff via us mail. Modified text on 8/17/2018 (JJ).
August 9, 2018 Filing 8 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(JJ)
August 9, 2018 Conflict Check run. (TDA)
August 9, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (TDA)
August 9, 2018 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Western. Case number 1:18-cv-00103. File and docket sheet received electronically. cc: Hill w/ copy of docket sheet
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Greg N. Stivers on 8/9/2018 TRANSFERRING the instant action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky, Central Division at Lexington for all further proceedings. All other filings shall be with that court.cc:Plaintiff, pro se; Clerk KYED (JWM) [Transferred from kywd on 8/9/2018.]
August 3, 2018 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Harold Hill by Harold Hill. (JWM) [Transferred from kywd on 8/9/2018.]
August 3, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Harold Hill, pro se (JWM) [Transferred from kywd on 8/9/2018.]
August 3, 2018 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM) [Transferred from kywd on 8/9/2018.]
August 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nurse Tammy, Captain Johnson, Tom Jones, and Doug Thomas filed by Harold Hill, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Envelope) (JWM) [Transferred from kywd on 8/9/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Tammy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Tammy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?