Curd v. GLA Collection Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Celeste Curd
Defendant: GLA Collection Co., Inc., Transworld Systems, Inc, Trans Union, LLC, University of Kentucky Federal Credit Union, Eagle Financial Services, Inc. and Equifax Credit Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv00503
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: #21 Notice of Settlement as to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (KM)
September 28, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC by Celeste Curd (Lawson, James)
September 20, 2018 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Eagle Financial Services, Inc..(Deatrick, David)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brian D. Roth by Transworld Systems, Inc.; and granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by Eagle Financial Services, Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 9/19/2018. (GLD)cc: COR, Brian D. Roth w/copy of Mandatory ECF General Order & ECF Registration
September 18, 2018 Filing 18 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Equifax Credit Information Services, LLC. (Williams, John)
September 18, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Equifax Credit Information Services, LLC.(Williams, John)
September 18, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: re #12 MOTION for Brian D. Roth to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Transworld Systems, Inc ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4169723), #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Eagle Financial Services, Inc. (KM)
September 18, 2018 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Brian D. Roth re #12 MOTION for Brian D. Roth to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Transworld Systems, Inc (Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4169723). (KM)
September 17, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Eagle Financial Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Deatrick, David)
September 17, 2018 Filing 15 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Eagle Financial Services, Inc.. (Deatrick, David)
September 17, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eagle Financial Services, Inc.. (Deatrick, David)
September 17, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, And Affirmative Defenses by Trans Union, LLC.(Jansen, Sandra)
September 17, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Brian D. Roth to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Transworld Systems, Inc ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4169723) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit of Brian D. Roth, #3 Proposed Order GRANTING Mtn for Admission)(Lewis, Danielle)
September 14, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by GLA Collection Co., Inc..(Smith, William)
September 12, 2018 Filing 10 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Transworld Systems, Inc. (Lewis, Danielle)
September 12, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Transworld Systems, Inc.(Lewis, Danielle)
September 6, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Whitney Elizabeth Wood on behalf of GLA Collection Co., Inc. (Wood, Whitney)
September 6, 2018 Filing 7 CORPORATE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GLA Collection Co., Inc.. (Smith, William)
September 6, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William E. Smith, III on behalf of GLA Collection Co., Inc. (Smith, William)
September 5, 2018 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trans Union, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC.. (Jansen, Sandra)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra Davis Jansen on behalf of Trans Union, LLC (Jansen, Sandra)
August 23, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Eagle Financial Services, Inc., Equifax Credit Information Services, LLC, GLA Collection Co., Inc., Trans Union, LLC, Transworld Systems, Inc, University of Kentucky Federal Credit Union; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (KM)
August 23, 2018 Conflict Check run. (KM)
August 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4151813), filed by Celeste Curd. (Attachments: #1 Summons GLA Collection Co., Inc., #2 Summons Eagle Financial Servinces, Inc., #3 Summons Equifax Information Services, LLC, #4 Summons Trans Union, LLC, #5 Summons Transworld System, Inc., #6 Summons University of Kentucky Federal Credit Union, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(KM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curd v. GLA Collection Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLA Collection Co., Inc.
Represented By: William E. Smith, III
Represented By: Whitney Elizabeth Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transworld Systems, Inc
Represented By: Danielle Jarvis Lewis
Represented By: Brian D. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Sandra Davis Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Kentucky Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: David R. Deatrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Credit Information Services, LLC
Represented By: John M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celeste Curd
Represented By: James Hays Lawson
Represented By: James R. McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?