USA v. Beatty

Petitioner: USA
Respondent: Robert D. Beatty
Case Number: 5:2018cv00537
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
0 Judge: Claria Horn Boom
1 Judge: Matthew A Stinnett
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Claria Horn Boom for review: #5 Status Report - Styled with incorrect case number. (JJ)
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT by USA. (Gentry, Thomas)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: (1) Respondent shall have up to and including 11/9/2018 to respond to the #1 PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons. (2) USA shall file a status report by 11/9/2018, indicating whether the issue remains unresolved; and (3)Upon receipt of the documents, the Court will determine a briefing and hearing schedule, as needed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett on 11/5/2018.(JJ)cc: COR
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: 1) This matter shall be REFERRED by blind draw (Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett) to conduct hearing on the issues of whether the respondent should be compelled to obey the summons, receiving evidence as necessary, and making findings and recommendations regarding disposition of the Petition. 2. A separate Scheduling Order shall be issued from Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 11/2/2018.(JJ)cc: COR, Pro Se respondent via US Mail Modified text on 11/2/2018 (JJ).
September 19, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Claria H. Boom for review: #1 PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons (KJR)
September 19, 2018 Conflict Check run. (KJR)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Fiona M. Schuler, #2 Exhibit B - Executed Summons, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 USM Form 285)(KJR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Beatty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert D. Beatty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: USA
Represented By: Thomas Lee Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?