USA v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Jennifer M. Smith and Mark G. Smith
Case Number: 5:2018cv00586
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. NLT 30 days from this date parties shall conduct meeting to discuss a prompt settlement or resolution of the case and develop a discovery plan. 2. At meeting parties shall exchange disclosures. 3. NLT 10 days following the meeting, parties shall file a written joint report. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 12/3/2018.(JJ)cc: COR
December 3, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: #8 Answer to Complaint (GLD)
November 30, 2018 Filing 8 FIRST ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Jennifer M. Smith, Mark G. Smith.(Watson, Henry)
November 28, 2018 NOTICE OF ACTION BY CLERK STRIKING A DOCUMENT FROM THE RECORD re #7 Summons Returned Executed, #6 Summons Returned Executed was an INCOMPLETE PDF document filed as main document; Attorney shall re-file the corrected SUMMONS Returned Executed within seven (7) calendar days. *CBD* cc: COR (STC)
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 STRICKEN FROM DOCKET: INCOMPLETE DOCUMENT, PURSUANT to Notice of Action Striking Document filed on 11/28/2018 (STC).
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 STRICKEN FROM DOCKET: INCOMPLETE DOCUMENT, PURSUANT to Notice of Action Striking Document filed on 11/28/2018 (STC).
November 6, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Reissued as to Mark G. Smith. (GLD)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Returned Unexecuted by USA as to Mark G. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Summons for Issuance by Clerk)(O'Donnell, Sean)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jennifer M. Smith, Mark G. Smith; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons)(JLM)
October 24, 2018 Conflict Check run. (JLM)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(JLM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer M. Smith
Represented By: Henry Watson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark G. Smith
Represented By: Henry Watson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Sean Paul O'Donnell
Represented By: Matthew Bryce Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?