USA v. Fitzgerald et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Board of Education of Harrison County Schools, FIA Card Services, N.A., City of Cynthiana, LNV Funding, LLC, Bank Trust Financial, County of Harrison, Becky Edwards, Jason H. Fitzgerald, HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., Asset Acceptance, LLC and Discover Bank (A Delaware Corporation)
Case Number: 5:2018cv00604
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Filing 24 Summons Reissued as to Jason H. Fitzgerald. Summons returned to counsel electronically for service. (STC)
December 27, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE by USA for Issuance of Summons (Attachments: #1 Summons - Jason Fitzgerald)(Gentry, Thomas)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: 1) w/in 21 days, parties meet to discuss the nature of claims and defenses and possibilities for a prompt resolution of the case, make disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1), and to develop a proposed discovery plan; 2) w/in 10 days after meeting, file joint status report. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 12/14/2018.(STC)cc: COR
December 13, 2018 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Becky Edwards. Filed pursuant to #20 Order. (STC)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: (1) Defendant Becky Edwards' Motion to File Belated Answer #17 is GRANTED; and (2) Clerk shall FILE Defendant Becky Edwards' Answer #17 -1; #18 into the record. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 12/13/2018. (STC)cc: COR
December 12, 2018 Filing 19 Summons Returned Unexecuted by USA as to Jason H. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Returned Envelope)(Gentry, Thomas)
December 11, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: re #17 FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Becky Edwards (KM)
December 10, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE OF FILING by Becky Edwards (Attachments: #1 Supplement - Decree of Dissolution of Marriage)(Arnold, Sam) Modified text on 12/11/2018 (KM).
December 10, 2018 Filing 17 FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Becky Edwards (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Tendered Answer, #2 Proposed Order)(Arnold, Sam) Modified text on 12/11/2018 (KM). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/11/2018: #3 Exhibit to Answer - Decree of Disolution of Marriage) (KM).
November 27, 2018 Filing 16 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bank Trust Financial identifying Corporate Parent Field & Main Bancorp, Inc. for Bank Trust Financial, Bank Trust Financial.. (Parker, Jennifer)
November 26, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA via Certified Mail to Bank Trust Financial served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(Gentry, Thomas)
November 26, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA via Certified Mail to County of Harrison served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(Gentry, Thomas)
November 26, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA via Certified Mail to City of Cynthiana served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(Gentry, Thomas)
November 26, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA via Certified Mail to Board of Education of Harrison County Schools served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(Gentry, Thomas)
November 26, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA via Certified Mail to LNV Funding, LLC served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(Gentry, Thomas)
November 26, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA via Certified Mail to FIA Card Services, N.A. served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(Gentry, Thomas)
November 26, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA via Certified Mail to Asset Acceptance, LLC served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(Gentry, Thomas)
November 26, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA via Certified Mail to Becky Edwards served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(Gentry, Thomas)
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA via Certified Mail to HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc. served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(Gentry, Thomas)
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA via Certified Mail to Discover Bank (A Delaware Corporation) served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(Gentry, Thomas)
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Jennifer Parker. #4 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim has been filed by Bank Trust Financial without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (STC)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Bank Trust Financial. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Mortgage)(Parker, Jennifer)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Asset Acceptance, LLC, Bank Trust Financial, Board of Education of Harrison County Schools, City of Cynthiana, County of Harrison, Discover Bank (A Delaware Corporation), Becky Edwards, FIA Card Services, N.A., Jason H. Fitzgerald, HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., LNV Funding, LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (JLM)
November 7, 2018 Conflict Check run. (JLM)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Note 44-14, #2 Exhibit B-Note 43-19, #3 Exhibit C-Note 44-20, #4 Exhibit D-Mortgage, #5 Exhibit E-Notice of Acceleration of Debt, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons for Jason Fitzgerald, #8 Summons for HSBC Mortgage Svc, #9 Summons for Bank Trust Financial, #10 Summons for Discover Bank, #11 Summons for FIA Card Svcs, #12 Summons for LNV Funding, #13 Summons for Asset Acceptance LLC, #14 Summons for Becky Edwards, #15 Summons for Harrison County, #16 Summons for City of Cynthiana, #17 Summons for Board of Education)(JLM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Fitzgerald et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Education of Harrison County Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIA Card Services, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Cynthiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LNV Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Trust Financial
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becky Edwards
Represented By: Sam W. Arnold, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason H. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asset Acceptance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Bank (A Delaware Corporation)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Thomas Lee Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?