Peck et al v. Air Evac EMS, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jason W. Peck
Defendant: Air Evac EMS, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv00615
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF FILING by Jason W. Peck(individually) Notice of Withdrawal (Meyman, Henrietta)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that request for extension to file initial Rule 26 disclosures and submit proposed discovery schedule #10 is GRANTED, in part. Parties shall provide their initial Rule 26 disclosures and submit a proposed discovery schedule within 30 days of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 1/3/2019.(GLD)cc: COR
January 3, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Moorman, Keith)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #7 Motion for Mallory M. Stumpf to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Air Evac EMS, Inc.; granting #8 Motion for Rodney A. Harrison to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Air Evac EMS, Inc. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 11/30/2018. (STC)cc: COR
November 30, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: re #7 MOTION for Rodney A. Harrison to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Air Evac EMS, Inc. #8 MOTION for Mallory M. Stumpf to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Air Evac EMS, Inc., (JJ)
November 30, 2018 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Rodney A. Harrison, Mallory M. Stumpf re #8 MOTION for Mallory M. Stumpf to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Air Evac EMS, Inc., #7 MOTION for Rodney A. Harrison to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Air Evac EMS, Inc.. (JJ)
November 30, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Mallory M. Stumpf to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Air Evac EMS, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate od Admission from Missouri, #2 Receipt)(JJ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2018: #3 Receipt) (STC).
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Rodney A. Harrison to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Air Evac EMS, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Admission from Missouri, #2 Receipt)(JJ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2018: #3 Receipt) (STC).
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. No later than 30 days from date of this order, counsel conduct meeting of parties as required by Rule 26(f) to discuss possibilities for prompt resolution and develop proposed discovery plan; 2. At time of mtg, counsel exchange Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures; 3. No later than 10 days after mtg, counsel file written joint report outlining proposed discovery plan. Consent forms attached. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 11/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 AO 85)(STC)cc: COR
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Air Evac EMS, Inc..(Moorman, Keith)
November 19, 2018 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason W. Peck(individually), Jason W. Peck(on behalf of others similarly situated) via certified mail on 10/30/18 to Air Evac EMS, Inc. served on 10/30/2018. (Filed in State Court, see doc. #1 ). (JLM) Modified on 11/19/2018 to edit text(JLM).
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Air Evac EMS, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Air Medical Group Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Global Medical Response, Inc., Other Affiliate GMR Intermediate Corp., Other Affiliate GMR Buyer Corp. for Air Evac EMS, Inc. (JLM)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING REMOVAL by Air Evac EMS, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant's Notice of Removal)(JLM)
November 19, 2018 Conflict Check run. (JLM)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fayette Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-3774. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4217631), filed by Air Evac EMS, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peck et al v. Air Evac EMS, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason W. Peck
Represented By: Henrietta Gera Meyman
Represented By: Christopher D. Miller
Represented By: Charles William Arnold
Represented By: Gerry Lynn Calvert, II
Represented By: J. Robert Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Evac EMS, Inc.
Represented By: Keith Moorman
Represented By: Rodney A. Harrison
Represented By: Mallory M. Stumpf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?