Beasley v. Does
Plaintiff: Brock Beasley
Defendant: Jane/John Does
Case Number: 5:2018cv00624
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE/ORDER FOR ARREST by Brock Beasley, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmarked Dec 12 2018)(STC)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 SWORN & TRUE STATEMENT by Brock Beasley, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmarked Dec 12 2018)(STC)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: To extent that #6 Letter filed by Beasley requests further relief, this request is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 12/18/2018.(GLD)cc: Pro Se Plaintiff
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 Letter from Brock Beasley, pro se (Attachments: #1 envelope postmarked 12/13/18) (JLM)
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 JUDGMENT: 1. Plaintiff's #1 Complaint is DISMISSED; 2. This action is DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the Court's docket; and 3. This is a FINAL and APPEALABLE Judgment and there is no just cause for delay. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 11/30/2018.(JJ)cc: COR, Pro Se Plaintiff via US Mail
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: 1. Beasley's #1 complaint is DISMISSED. 2. JUDGMENT shall be entered contemporaneously with this Order. 3. This matter is STRICKEN from the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 11/30/2018.(JJ)cc: COR
November 27, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: #1 Complaint (JLM)
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(JLM) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/27/2018) (SKV).
November 27, 2018 Conflict Check run. (JLM)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED), filed by Brock Beasley. (Attachments: #1 Envelope 1 postmarked 11/23/18, #2 Envelope 2 postmark not legible)(JLM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beasley v. Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane/John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brock Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?