Metcalf v. Akers et al

Plaintiff: Floyd Metcalf, Jr.
Defendant: Daniel Akers and Nikki Beckstrum
Case Number: 5:2018cv00625
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Filing 9 JUDGMENT: 1. Plaintiff's Complaint #1 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; 2. This action is DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the Court's docket; 2. This is a FINAL and APPEALABLE Judgment and there is not just cause for delay. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 12/10/2018.(KM)cc: COR, Pltf via U.S. mail
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. Metcalf's Complaint #1 is DISMISSED without prejudice; 2. This matter is stricken from the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 12/10/2018.(KM)cc: COR, Pltf via U.S. mail
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: 1. Metcalf's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. 2. Payment of partial filing fee is DEFERRED. 3. Clerk shall open account in Metcalf's name. Clerk shall complete Notice of Payment Form (Form EDKY 525). Clerk shall serve copy of this Order and Notice of Payment Form upon jailer/Warden for institution in which Metcalf is confined. 4. Each month, Metcalf's custodian shall send Clerk payment equal to 20% of income for preceding month, until entire $350 filing fee is paid. 5. Metcalf must advise Clerk of any change of address. 6. Matter stand submitted for initial screening.. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 11/28/2018. (GLD)cc: COR,Finance,pro se plaintiff, Office of General Counsel for Dept Corrections and Jailer/Warden with EDKY 525 Modified on 11/29/2018 (GLD).
November 28, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: #1 Complaint (Referred) (JLM)
November 28, 2018 Conflict Check run. (JLM)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(JLM)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Floyd Metcalf, Jr. (JLM)
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Floyd Metcalf, Jr by Floyd Metcalf, Jr. (JLM)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Floyd Metcalf, Jr Motions referred to P SO. (JLM)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT 1 summons(es) presented referred to Judge P SO., filed by Floyd Metcalf, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Envelope)(JLM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metcalf v. Akers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd Metcalf, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikki Beckstrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?