Bradley v. Marriott International, Inc.

Plaintiff: Ron Bradley
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv00639
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
0 Judge: Claria Horn Boom
1 Judge: Danny C Reeves
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Claria Horn Boom for review: #10 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (KM)
January 24, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Muyskens, Elizabeth)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: (1) parties meet within 21 days; exchange disclosures; (2) Rule 26 Meeting Report due within 14 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 12/21/18.(KJR)cc: COR
December 20, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Claria Horn Boom for review: #8 Answer to Complaint (KM)
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Marriott International, Inc..(Muyskens, Elizabeth)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER TO COMPLAINT re #6 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation: It is ORDERED as follows: 1. Defendant Marriott International, Inc. SHALL have up to and including 12/19/2018, in which to file an answer or other response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 12/10/2018.(KM)cc: COR
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation For Extension of Time by Marriott International, Inc.. (Muyskens, Elizabeth)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Undersigned RECUSES from further participation in the action. It is ORDERED that this action is REASSIGNED by random draw to another Judge (Claria Horn Boom) assigned to accept civil cases in Lexington. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 12/6/2018.(KM)cc: COR
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Marriott International, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Marriott Hotel Services, Inc. for Marriott International, Inc. (JLM)
December 5, 2018 Conflict Check run. (JLM)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fayette Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-3970. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4232261), filed by Marriott International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley v. Marriott International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Represented By: Richard G. Griffith
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Muyskens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Bradley
Represented By: James N. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?