Texas Life Insurance Company v. Robinson et al
Plaintiff: Texas Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Barbara Jean Robinson and Blackburn & Ward Funeral Home, Inc.
Undetermined: Cherri Crockett
Case Number: 5:2018cv00640
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AGREED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME: re dft Barbara Jean Robinson's #9 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation For Extension of Time; that dft Robinson shall file a responsive pleading to pla's complaint by 2/25/19. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 1/31/19.(KJR)cc: COR
January 30, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re #9 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation For Extension of Time by Barbara Jean Robinson (KJR)
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation For Extension of Time by Barbara Jean Robinson. (Gay, Jonathan)
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Texas Life Insurance Company via Personal to Cherri Crockett served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. (Howard, Gary)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Texas Life Insurance Company via Personal to Blackburn & Ward Funeral Home, Inc. served on 1/8/2019, answer due 1/29/2019. (Howard, Gary)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Texas Life Insurance Company via Personal to Barbara Jean Robinson served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019. (Howard, Gary)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Texas Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Wilton Reassurance Company for Texas Life Insurance Company.. (Howard, Gary)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Gary L. Howard. #1 Complaint has been filed by Texas Life Insurance Company without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (JLM)
December 6, 2018 Conflict Check run. (JLM)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Blackburn & Ward Funeral Home, Inc., Cherri Crockett, Barbara Jean Robinson; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (JLM)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4232480), filed by Texas Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Policy, #2 Exhibit B-Application, #3 Exhibit C-Beneficiary Change, #4 Exhibit D-Divorce Decree, #5 Exhibit E-Separation Agreement, #6 Exhibit F-Claimant's Statement, #7 Exhibit G-11-08-18 Letters, #8 Exhibit H-11-14-18, #9 Exhibit I-Assignment and Release, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Summons)(JLM) Modified text on 2/1/2019 (JLM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Texas Life Insurance Company v. Robinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Jean Robinson
Represented By: Jonathan L. Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackburn & Ward Funeral Home, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Cherri Crockett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Gary L. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?