Mootoor v. Eastern Kentucky University

Plaintiff: Majenta Mootoor
Defendant: Eastern Kentucky University
Case Number: 5:2018cv00645
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: 1. Within 21 days after date of service of this Order, parties shall meet as required by Rule 26(a)(1). 2. Within 10 days after meeting, parties shall file joint status report as set forth in Order. Each party directed to advise Court of all parent corporations, etc. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 2/12/2019.(GLD)cc: COR
February 12, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: #1 Notice of Removal, #8 Answer to Complaint (STC)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Eastern Kentucky University.(Stigall, Jessica)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AGREED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE ANSWER: Defendant's #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer is GRANTED. IT IS ORDERED that the University shall file its answer on or before 2/11/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 1/22/2019.(JJ)cc: COR
January 18, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Eastern Kentucky University Unopposed Motion to File Answer (STC)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Eastern Kentucky University Unopposed Motion to File Answer (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stigall, Jessica)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time by Eastern Kentucky University Unopposed Motion to File Answer. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 12/21/2018. (JJ)cc: COR
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time by Eastern Kentucky University Unopposed Motion to File Answer (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stigall, Jessica)
December 17, 2018 Conflict Check run. (STC)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Eastern Kentucky University. (STC)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Madison Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-671. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4241638), filed by Eastern Kentucky University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B State Court Notice of Filing Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(STC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mootoor v. Eastern Kentucky University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Majenta Mootoor
Represented By: Edward E. Dove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastern Kentucky University
Represented By: Jessica Roberts Stigall
Represented By: Joshua Michael Salsburey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?