Woods v. The Standard Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Laura N. Woods
Defendant: The Standard Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2018cv00658
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: (1) The #6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting is construed in part as motion to bifurcate and stay all proceedings related to Plaintiff's bad faith claims, and the motion to bifurcate and stay is GRANTED; (2) Plaintiff's bad faith claims against Defendants are BIFURCATED and STAYED PENDING RESOLUTION OF THE CONTRACT AND OTHER CLAIMS FOR RELIEF; (3) The #6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting is construed in part as a motion to stay pending resolution of the anticipated motions for summary judgment on benefits under the underinsured motorist policy, that motion is GRANTED; (4) discovery in this matter is STAYED PENDING RESOLUTION OF THE AMOUNT OF BENEFITS PAYABLE TO THE PLAINTIFF UNDER THE UNDERINSURED MOTORIST POLICY; (5) Parties SHALL FILE motions for summary judgment NLT 3/8/2019; and (6) Motion practice is governed by Local Rule 7.1. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 2/11/2019.(JJ)cc: COR
February 8, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: #6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (STC)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Keller, Stephen)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1) Within 21 days parties shall meet to discuss prompt settlement or resolution of the case, arrange the disclosures required, and to devlope a discovery plan. 2. Within 10 after the meeting the parties shall file a joint status report. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 1/8/2019.(JJ)cc: COR
January 8, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: #1 Notice of Removal, #4 Answer to Complaint (JJ)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by The Standard Fire Insurance Company.(Keller, Stephen)
January 2, 2019 Conflict Check run. (JJ)
December 31, 2018 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Standard Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for The Standard Fire Insurance Company.. (JJ)
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fayette County Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-04199. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4249635), filed by The Standard Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record, #3 Exhibit K Dept of Ins Rec, #4 Supplement Notice of filing Notice of Removal, #5 Supplement Certificate of Service)(JJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. The Standard Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura N. Woods
Represented By: Blake Charles Nolan
Represented By: Stephen Paul Stoltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Standard Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephen Keller
Represented By: Tyler Douglas Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?