In re: Onglyza (Saxagliptin) and Kombiglyze (Saxagliptin and Metformin) Products Liability Litigation MDL 2809
Plaintiff: Susan Settle, Charles David Ware, William Dinger Sr., David Caldwell, Mattie Holmes, Steven Vallentine, Audrie Winborne, Wayne Driver, Rosa Davila, Anita Rochelle Holland, Tony Campbell, Yvonne Sandoval, David Taylor, Patricia Word, Dennis Turner, Catherine Woods, Randall McCall, Allen Atkins, Sr., Patricia Reid, Don Lynn, Donielle Cousins, Cleotha Silvers, Ethel Green, Robert Rosencranse, Margie Goforth, Norman Johnson, Lisa Arlene Peoples, Vicki Lacy, Robert Williams, Darryl McAfee, Bobbie Brown, Michael Sechler, Milton George, Lynda Lyles, Roy Carter, Gail Talton, Randolph Young, Therese Medley, Diann M. Reeves, Michael Winkle, Cynthia Turner, Larry Reeves, Jay Epps, Ophelia Dubose, Edwin Asencio, Jason Mask, Michael Martin, Linda Day, April Sechler, Harvey Beeler, Sherman Jackson, Billy Davis, Allen Ellis, Carl Hulbert, Donald Carpenter, Jr., Walter Garcia, Michael Miller, Leatha Taylor, Wilma Barner, Robbie York, Wilda Chamberlain, Maisha Johnson, Jerald Adams, Michael Veloria, Willie Harris, Cheryll Campbell, Earl Binns, Pixie Nance, Carolyn Williams, Jimmy Stacy, H.B. Green, Angela Hardy, Kathy Barnes, Cloyd Tucker, Wrendell Chester, Nichole Wilcox, Johny Sosh, Amy Mitchell, Sheryle Christensen, Ronald Letell, Neva Boller, Ray Gomez, Elke Mounteer, Olivier Herbert, Shirley Nail, Chleo Trapp, Veryl Mills, Mary Smith, Cathy Nelson, Bobbie Jean Singletary, Guadalupe Vasquez, Christopher Hocker, Kimberly Payne, Johann A. Sproule, John Wesley Hunt, Sr, Alice Watts, Robert Ervin, John Howard, Jr., Guadalupe Ybarra, Cynthia Humphrey, Teresa Ann Freeman, Gary Smith, Teresa Booth, Donald Jackson, Elmer Leary, Colleen Taylor, Ernest Trapp, Nancy Kee, Hank Ray, Barbara Woodruff, Wilma J. Sexton, Tommy Lee Dustin Sheppard, Deborah Vasquez, Milagros Ganzalez-McAllister, Susan Gosner, Richard Merritt, Billy Harris, Mary Sparkman, Robert Curtis, Margie Black, Helen Dunn, Jeff Parks, Ceasar Ortega, Alphonso Hayes, Wanda Johnson, Barbara Harrell, Lawana Garrette, John Clark, Ruben Barrientes, James Butler, Roxie Hampton, Charles Cannon, Deanna Fouse, Marian D. Rundell, Katherine Orschel, Janiet Sheppard, Oswald Gooch, Timothy Waterman, John H. Anderson, Jr., Milton Jones, Mark Davis, Sr., William Hightower, James Mann, Donald Forgione, Michael Havice, Addie Huff, Patsy Nesselrodt, Jennifer Carter, Sonia Nicholas, Jerry Brittain, Michael Moody, Clarence Couisan, Martha Chapman, Donald Helire, Jay Gintz, Billy Alexander, Georgia Clanton, Gregory Ross, Catina Loggan, Susan Berry, Debbie Crear, Natalie Ross, Jose Serpa, Jean Wilson, Harry Gordon, Alberta Spicer, Diane Bakalyar, Perry Brown, Kelley Miears, Roberta Dunn, Nicky Carter, Susan Birk, Violet Martin, Cyndy McCugh, Roy McGhee, Robert Bivins, Kevin LeBlanc, Diana Lawrence, Lisa L. Becoat, Shelia Austin, Audrey Gore, Samuel Mwakamsha Yaa, Christy Dawn Sheppard, Jacqueline Young, Minnie Banks, Phyllis Marcum, Linda Lucas, Juan Gonzalez, Derrell Johnson, Belinda Didericksen, Raul Telles, Larry Matthews, David Lester Moore, James Walz, Patrick Utterback, Martha Sherill, Bailey Erwin, Bonnie Hopkins, Donnie Vernon Farrell, Sabir Hasan, Linda Ware, Rhudenia Williams, Jeffrey L. Brown, Sharon McCay, Harry Grimes, Bobby L. Taylor, Druella Maurras, Georgia Moton, Mark Jones, Charles Wood, Lester Speights, Eddie Billington, Carl Jarman, Wiley Williams, Jr., Mary Delaney, Jean Mitchell, Charles King, Larry Slaton, Vannessa Slaughter, Debra Underwood, William E. Williams, Kathy Abshire, Allen Rouse, Richard Rimkus, John Proples, Michael Caston, Francoisce Baker, John Key, Gilbert Corbello, Gary Sturgell, Marry Ann Harris, Victor Young, Carolyn Haley, Calvin Sheppard, Terry Martin, Raymond Hardin, Rose Williams, Lori Stewart, Richard Garry, Shirley Whiteside, Georgia Ishman, Marcia McKinley, Hubert Allen Royal, Cathy Terrell, Walter Harding, Stuart J. North, Canice North, Louis Karitenos, Valerie Rankow, Thelma J. Sharp, Terry D. Sharp, Author W. Scott, Dean Perkins, Norman Schwartz, Floreida Ray, Diane Horne, Sonja Davis, Sullivan Wilkerson, Thomas Mason, Shawntay Brown, Deanna Daily, David Ritz, Sarah Kelly, Peggy Spearman, William Ford, Michelle Dupree, Orlando Santiago, Audrey Cagle, James Alston, Linda Wright, Harlon Gholar, Joe Hudson, Travis Hosey, Angelo Johnson, Roy Hudson, Eli Harrington, Earl Y. Ragsdale, Lewis McLean, Ulrich Smith, Henry Collins, Rhonda Thompson, Nancy Greer, Betty Mays, Tyrone Irvan, Peggy Strange, Anthony Wendricks, Carolyn Sweeney, John Wigginton, Robert Born, Binwattie Sukhoo, Vanessa D. Hagger, Daphine Shepard, Leroy Scott, Martin O'Toole, Nancy O'Toole, Curtis Bruce McConnell, Elana Barnett, Larry Tincher, Nada Mann, Matthew R. McGhghy, Michael McGhghy, Todd McGhghy, Grady Parker, Richard McGhghy, Stephen T. McGhghy, Pamela J. McGhghy, Rual Gene Newton, Rhoda Robinson, Leonard Abernathy, Wayne Perry, Ernestine Samuels, Jerry Branham, Shirley Wilson, James Wilkins, Mary Phillips, Cody Ryan, Marina Eagle Elk, Lloyd Rosenbaum, Danna Shannon, Mackie J. Griffith, Jefferey V. Carvin, Judy Crawford, Patricia Liles, Joe C. Denmon, David Brooks, Mable Herrera, Myrna Negron, Vickie Tugger and John Moran
Defendant: Onglyza (Saxagliptin) and Kombiglyze (Saxagliton and Metformin) Products Liability Litigation MDL 2809, McKesson Corporation, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, IPR Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and AstraZeneca LP
Case Number: 5:2018md02809
Filed: February 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Lexington Office
County: Fayette
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Referring Judge: Matthew A Stinnett
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Filing 424 MOTION to Dismiss by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Meyers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., McKesson Corporation for Failure to File a Motion for Substitution (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00141-KKC(Browning, Carol)
February 20, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO C. Browning Stipulations of Dismissal, (120 in 5:18-cv-00369-KKC), (118 in 5:18-cv-00245-KKC), (122 in 5:18-cv-00254-KKC): ***Error: Attorney filed the documents in the individual member case files only. Pursuant to the Court's Practice & Procedure Order (Entry #3 in 5:18-md-2809) attorney should have filed the documents in the master case and spread text to each related individual member case; Entries by Attorney; Correction: Clerk has re-filed the documents in the master and related member case files. No further action required by counsel as to this error. cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00245-KKC, 5:18-cv-00254-KKC, 5:18-cv-00369-KKC(CBD)
February 20, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: re #421 Proposed Agreed Stipulation of Dismissal of Prejudice, #422 Proposed Agreed Stipulation of Dismissal of Prejudice, #423 Proposed Agreed Stipulation of Dismissal of Prejudice (CBD)
February 20, 2020 Filing 423 Proposed Agreed Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice by AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Susan Gosner. Filed per QC re DE 120 in 5:18-cv-369Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00369-KKC(CBD)
February 20, 2020 Filing 422 Proposed Agreed Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation, Timothy Waterman. Filed per QC re DE 122 in 5:18-cv-254 Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00254-KKC(CBD)
February 19, 2020 Filing 421 Proposed Agreed Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice by AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Nicky Carter. Filed per QC re DE 118 in 5:18-cv-245Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00245-KKC(CBD)
February 19, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: #420 Joint Status Report (CBD)
February 18, 2020 Filing 420 JOINT STATUS REPORT by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(Ullman, Emily)
January 23, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO David Friend re Stipulation of Dismissal (filed as 26 in 5:19-cv-00414-KKC): ***Error: Attorney filed the document in the individual member case file only. Pursuant to the Court's Practice & Procedure Order (Entry [R. 3] in 5:18- md-2809) attorney should have filed the document in the master case and spread text to the related individual member case; Entry by Attorney; Correction: Clerk has re- filed the document in the master and member case files. No further action required by counsel as to this error. cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:19-cv-00414-KKC(CBD)
January 23, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: re Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice (419 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 27 in 5:19-cv-00414-KKC) Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:19-cv-00414-KKC(CBD)
January 22, 2020 Filing 419 Proposed STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with prejudice by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., Billy Harris, McKesson Corporation. Filed per QC re DE 26 in 5:19-cv-414 Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:19-cv-00414-KKC(CBD)
January 22, 2020 Filing 418 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 1/22/2020. before Judge Karen K. Caldwell: The parties advised the Court that they are reviewing the supplemental production of documents. The Court scheduled four telephonic status conferences and advised the parties to contact chambers should any issues arise. The Court HEREBY ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: 1. The Telephonic Status Conference schedule at Lexington, Ky is as follows: Wednesday, April 22, 2020 at 1:00 p.m..; Wednesday, July 22, 2020 at 10:00 a.m.; Wednesday, October 14, 2020 at 10:00 a.m.; and Wednesday, January 13, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. 2. Counsel shall access the calls by dialing 1-888-684-8852, then entering access code 6823688. (Court Reporter Diane Farrell.) Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al. (CBD)cc: COR, Lex D
January 22, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE set for 4/22/2020 at 01:00 PM in FRANKFORT before Judge Karen K. Caldwell. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE set for 7/22/2020 at 10:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE set for 10/14/2020 at 10:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE set for 1/13/2021 at 10:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell. (CBD)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER: the Court ORDERED that the above-named plaintiff show cause why her case should not be dismissed with prejudice for failing to submit a Plaintiff Profile Form (DE 408 in 5:18-md-2809) in accordance with this Court's Case Management Order No. 2 (DE 197 in 5:18-2809). She has not filed any response. Accordingly, the Court hereby ORDERS that the above-referenced case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 1/17/2020.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00061-KKC(CBD)cc: COR, JPML Clerk, SKV
January 17, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: #416 Joint Status Report (CBD)
January 15, 2020 Filing 416 JOINT STATUS REPORT by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., McKesson Corporation. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(Browning, Carol)
January 10, 2020 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Moran v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al opened as a Direct Filed Case in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:20-cv-7-KKC pursuant to #174 Stipulated Order re Direct Filing. (TDA)
January 10, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: Show Cause Order (408 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS) - No response filed. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00061-KKC(CBD)
December 26, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Tugger v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-00499-KKC pursuant to #174 Order. cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
December 17, 2019 Filing 415 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 12/17/2019. before Judge Karen K. Caldwell: The Court heard statements from counsel on a minor issue regarding production of documents and the parties advised the court they are working to resolve the issue and to comply with the production schedule. The Court HEREBY ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: 1. A Telephonic Status Conference regarding the production issue is SCHEDULED for Wednesday, January 22, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. Counsel shall access the call by dialing 1-888-684-8852, then entering access code 6823688.2. If the parties resolve the production issue and no longer require the January 22nd StatusConference, they shall advise the Court in the Joint Status Report due January 15, 2019. (Court Reporter - Elaine Haberer.) Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al. (CBD)cc: COR, Lex D
December 17, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE set for 1/22/2020 at 09:30 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell. (CBD)
December 16, 2019 Filing 414 JOINT STATUS REPORT by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(Ullman, Emily)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 413 ORDER: 1) the defendants' motion for leave to maintain documents under seal (DE 376 in 5:18-md-2809) is GRANTED; 2) the clerk of the court SHALL maintain the documents filed at (DE 368 and DE 368-1 in 5:18-md-2809) under SEAL until further orders of the Court; and 3) the plaintiffs motion (DE 364in 5:18-md-2809 ) to file the documents under seal until the Court rules on defendants motion is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 12/16/2019. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(CBD)cc: COR
December 11, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: DAUBERT HEARINGS set for 10/6/2020 at 09:00 AM, 10/7/2020 at 09:00 AM, 10/8/2020 at 09:00 AM, 10/9/2020 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell. (CBD)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 412 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 6 REVISED GENERAL CAUSATION EXPERT AND DAUBERT DEADLINES: The Court hereby ORDERS that certain of the general causation discovery deadlines set forth in Case Management Order No. 4 are REVISED as follows: 1) Plaintiffs must serve expert reports relating to the issue of general causation by March 27, 2020; 2) Defendants must serve expert reports relating to the issue of general causation by April 15, 2020; 3) Plaintiffs must serve rebuttal expert reports by May 16, 2020; 4) Depositions of expert witnesses on the issue of general causation must be completed by June 29, 2020; 5) Daubert motions challenging expert witness testimony on the issue of general causation must be filed by July 17, 2020. Any responses to such motions must be filed by August 14, 2020. Any replies must be filed by August 28, 2020. 6) DAUBERT MOTION HEARINGS currently scheduled the week of June 8, 2020 are RESCHEDULED to take place the week of October 6, 2020. This matter remains REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Matthew Stinnett for purposes of resolving all discovery disputes as set forth in Case Management Order No. 4. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 12/11/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(CBD)cc: COR, Lex
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER: 1. Leatha Taylor's Motion (409 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 149 in 5:18-cv-00053-KKC) is GRANTED. 2.Plaintiff David Taylor is removed from this matter, and in his place Leatha Taylor, Administratrix of the Estate of David Taylor, is substituted. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 12/11/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00053-KKC(CBD)cc: COR
December 10, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Randi Kassan re NOTICE OF APPEARANCES filed as (113 in 5:18-cv-00372-KKC; 110 in 5:18-cv-00255-KKC; 58 in 5:19-cv-00070-KKC; 112 in 5:18-cv-00247-KKC; 58 in 5:19-cv-00071-KKC; 112 in 5:18-cv-00369-KKC; 50 in 5:19-cv-00169-KKC; 107 in 5:18-cv-00370-KKC). ***Error: Notices of Appearance were filed in the member cases only. Pursuant to the court's Practice & Procedure Order (Entry #3 in 5:18-md-2809) attorney should have filed each of the documents identified above in the master case and spread text to each related member case; Entries by Attorney; Correction: Clerk has added counsel of record referenced in the Notices to the master case. No further action required by counsel as to this error cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(CBD)
December 10, 2019 Attorney Update. Attorney Randi Alyson Kassan for Robert Ervin, Randi Alyson Kassan for Donald Forgione, Randi Alyson Kassan for Oswald Gooch, Randi Alyson Kassan for Susan Gosner, Randi Alyson Kassan for Louis Karitenos, Randi Alyson Kassan for Violet Martin, Randi Alyson Kassan for Valerie Rankow, Randi Alyson Kassan for Leroy Scott, added. (CBD)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER: that the notices (filed as DE 354, 355, 356, 357, 358 in Master File No. 5:18-md-2809-KKC) are ineffective. To the extent that the notices should be construed as motions to withdraw, they are DENIED. If counsel wishes to withdraw as counsel of record in this or any other case in this MDL, they SHALL comply with Local Rule 83.6. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 12/9/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(CBD)cc: COR
December 4, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: MOTION (149 in 5:18-cv-00053-KKC, 409 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS) to Substitute Party by Leatha Taylor . Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00053-KKC(CBD)
December 3, 2019 Filing 409 MOTION to Substitute Party by Leatha Taylor (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Death Certificate, #3 Exhibit Probate Order)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00053-KKC(McCarty, Sean)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHOW CAUSE WHY HER CASES SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO SUBMIT A PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM: Defendants' motion (174 in 5:18-cv-00061-KKC, 342 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS) is GRANTED. Within thirty (30) days of this Order, the plaintiff in the above- captioned action shall file a response showing cause why her case should not be dismissed with prejudice. If the plaintiff files such a response, defendants may file a reply within fourteen (14) days of the date the response is filed. If the plaintiff fails to show cause why the case should not be dismissed with prejudice, the Court will dismiss the case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 12/3/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00061-KKC(CBD)cc: COR
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ORDER: In accordance with the stipulation (137 in 5:18-cv-00064-KKC, 370 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS) filed by the parties, the Court hereby ORDERS that this matter is DISMISSED without prejudiced and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 12/3/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00064-KKC(CBD)cc: COR, JPML, SKV
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER: In accordance with the stipulation(114 in 5:18-cv-00146-KKC, 371 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS) filed by the parties, the Court hereby ORDERS that this matter is DISMISSED without prejudiced and STRICKEN from the Courts active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 12/3/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00146-KKC(CBD)cc: COR, JPML, SKV
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER: In accordance with the stipulation (350 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 20 in 5:19-cv-00219-KKC) filed by the parties, the Court hereby ORDERS that this matter is DISMISSED without prejudiced and STRICKEN from the Courts active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 12/3/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:19-cv-00219-KKC(CBD)cc: COR, JPML, SKV
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 404 ORDER: In accordance with the stipulation (filed as 107 in 5:18-cv-00368-KKC, 397 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS) filed by the parties, the Court hereby ORDERS that this matter is DISMISSED without prejudiced and STRICKEN from the Courts active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 12/3/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00368-KKC(CBD)cc: COR, JPML, SKV
November 22, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Negron v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-462 KKC pursuant to #174 Order. cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
November 22, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Griffith v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-463 KKC pursuant to #174 Order. cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
November 22, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Estate of Elaine Denmon et al v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al Opened Directly in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-461 KKC pursuant to #174 Order. cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
November 19, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: Suggestion of Death (403 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 118 in 5:18-cv-00141-KKC). Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00141-KKC (CBD)
November 19, 2019 Filing 403 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Samuel Mwakamsha Yaa by Samuel Mwakamsha Yaa. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00141-KKC(Johnson, Michael)
November 18, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: Joint Status (402 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, et al). Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(CBD)
November 15, 2019 Filing 402 JOINT STATUS REPORT by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(Ullman, Emily)
November 7, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re CMO 5 (401 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS); Error: Incorrect caption "Case Management Order No. 1" entered; Entry by clerk; Correction: Caption was corrected to reflect "Case Management Order No. 5"; No further action required. cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(CBD)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 401 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 5 ESTABLISHING STANDARDS AND PROCEDURES FOR COUNSEL SEEKING REIMBURSEMENT FOR COMMON BENEFIT FEES AND COSTS: This Order is entered to provide standards and procedures for the fair and equitable sharing among Plaintiffs, and their counsel, of the burden of services performed and expenses incurred by attorneys acting for the common benefit of all plaintiffs in this complex litigation. Each Participating Counsel who performs work or incurs expense for the common benefit has the right to present his/her claims for compensation and/or reimbursement prior to any distribution approved by this Court. At the appropriate time, this Court shall request that the PEC make recommendations for distributions to Participating Counsel who have performed common benefit work and/or incurred common benefit expenses. The PEC shall dictate the recommended distribution for common benefit work, and shall determine the most fair and efficient manner by which to evaluate all of the time and expense submissions in making its recommendations to this Court. The Court will give due consideration to the recommendations. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 11/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Participation Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Monthly Expense, #3 Exhibit C - Monthly Time)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(CBD)cc: COR Modified text on 11/7/2019 (CBD).
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER: plaintiffs' motion for entry of a case management order establishing standards and procedures for counsel seeking reimbursement for common benefit fees and costs (filed as DE 180 in 5:18-md-2809, et al) is GRANTED to the extent it requests that the Court enter the plaintiffs' third amended proposed case management order tendered at (DE 372-1 in 5:18-md-2809, et al), together with the exhibits referenced in the order and which are filed at (DE 344-2, 344-3, and DE 344-4 in 5:18-md-2809, et al.) The motion is otherwise DENIED. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 11/7/2019. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(CBD)cc: COR
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 399 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: For the reasons stated herein, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Compel #349 is: 1) GRANTED as to the clinical and non-clinical trial data; 2) GRANTED as to the pharmacoviligence data; 3) GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, as detailed above, as to the custodial files. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett on 11/5/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(CBD)cc: COR
November 4, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Crawford v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-00439 pursuant to Order #174 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
October 31, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Herrera v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al opened as a Direct Filed Case in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-436-KKC pursuant to #174 Stipulated Order re Direct Filing. cc: COR (TDA)
October 29, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: re #376 MOTION for leave to Seal a Document by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation (CBD)
October 29, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Emily Ullman re (398 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS) Reply. Error: a link was not created to the Motion; Entry by attorney; Clerk modified the entry to create a link to the Motion, thereby placing the reply on the Judge's motion report. In the future, create a link to the subject motion. The appropriate event is Reply to Response to Motion. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(CBD)
October 29, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation of Dismissal (107 in 5:18-cv-00368-KKC, 397 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS). Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00368-KKC(CBD) Modified text on 10/31/2019 (CBD).
October 28, 2019 Filing 398 REPLY to Response to Motion (filed as DE 376 in 5:18-ms-2809, et al) for Leave to Maintain Under Seal filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(Ullman, Emily) Modified link on 10/29/2019 (CBD).
October 28, 2019 Filing 397 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc.. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00368-KKC(Browning, Carol) Modified event on 10/29/2019 (CBD). Modified event on 10/29/2019 (CBD).
October 26, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Jennifer Moore re ( #396 in 5:18-md-2809, et al) Response in Opposition to Motion. *** Error: a link was created to the Motion in Member Case 5:19-cv-414 instead of the Motion in the Master Case 5:18-md-2809; Entry by attorney; Clerk modified the entry to create a link to the Motion #376 in 5:18-md-2809, et al, thereby placing the response on the Judge's motion report. In the future, create a link to the subject motion. The appropriate event is Reply to Response to Motion. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (CBD)
October 26, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: NOTICE OF FILING THIRD AMENDED [PROPOSED] CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (filed as 372 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, et al) ESTABLISHING STANDARDS AND PROCEDURES FOR COUNSEL SEEKING REIMBURSEMENT FOR COMMON BENEFIT FEES AND COSTS re MOTION (R. 180 in 5:18-md-2809, et al) Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(CBD)
October 21, 2019 Filing 396 RESPONSE in Opposition re (376 in 5:18-md-2809-KKC, et al) MOTION for leave to Seal a Document by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation filed by Don Lynn. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(Moore, Jennifer) Modified link on 10/26/2019 (CBD).
October 21, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Brooks v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al directly opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-00422 pursuant to #174 Order. cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
October 21, 2019 Filing 395 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashton Rose Smith on behalf of Sullivan Wilkerson Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:19-cv-00112-KKC(Smith, Ashton)
October 21, 2019 Filing 394 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashton Rose Smith on behalf of Chleo Trapp, Ernest Trapp Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00260-KKC(Smith, Ashton)
October 21, 2019 Filing 393 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashton Rose Smith on behalf of Allen Rouse Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00250-KKC(Smith, Ashton)
October 21, 2019 Filing 392 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashton Rose Smith on behalf of Katherine Orschel Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00243-KKC(Smith, Ashton)
October 21, 2019 Filing 391 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashton Rose Smith on behalf of Michael Havice Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00253-KKC(Smith, Ashton)
October 21, 2019 Filing 390 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashton Rose Smith on behalf of Shirley Whiteside(Individually), Shirley Whiteside Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00373-KKC(Smith, Ashton)
October 21, 2019 Filing 389 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashton Rose Smith on behalf of James Butler Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00375-KKC(Smith, Ashton)
October 21, 2019 Filing 388 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer A. Moore on behalf of Sullivan Wilkerson Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:19-cv-00112-KKC(Moore, Jennifer)
October 21, 2019 Filing 387 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer A. Moore on behalf of Chleo Trapp, Ernest Trapp Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00260-KKC(Moore, Jennifer)
October 21, 2019 Filing 386 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer A. Moore on behalf of Allen Rouse Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00250-KKC(Moore, Jennifer)
October 21, 2019 Filing 385 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer A. Moore on behalf of Katherine Orschel Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00243-KKC(Moore, Jennifer)
October 21, 2019 Filing 384 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer A. Moore on behalf of Michael Havice Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00253-KKC(Moore, Jennifer)
October 21, 2019 Filing 383 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer A. Moore on behalf of Shirley Whiteside(Individually) Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00373-KKC(Moore, Jennifer)
October 21, 2019 Filing 382 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer A. Moore on behalf of James Butler Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00375-KKC(Moore, Jennifer)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 381 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting MOTION (filed as 380 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, et al) for leave to Seal a Documents relating to Plaintiffs' Proposed Search Term Recommondations (filed as 379 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, et al) by Carolyn Williams, et al. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett on 10/18/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(CBD)cc: COR
October 17, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Stinnett for review: re #380 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENTS MARKED "CONFIDENTIAL" IN PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED SEARCH TERM RECOMMENDATIONS AND CUSTODIANS #379 by Carolyn Williams (CBD)
October 17, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Stinnett for review: #379 PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED SEARCH TERM RECOMMENDATIONS, #378 DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM REGARDING DISCOVERY (CBD)
October 17, 2019 Filing 380 MOTION for leave to Seal a Documents re Plaintiffs' Proposed Search Term Recommendations (filed as 379 in 5:19-md-2809, et al) marked "Confidential" by Carolyn Williams (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(Clark, Timothy) Modified text on 10/17/2019 (CBD).
October 17, 2019 Filing 379 PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED SEARCH TERM RECOMMENDATIONS filed by Carolyn Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs Proposed List of Search Terms, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs' Exemplar)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(Clark, Timothy) Modified text on 10/17/2019 (CBD). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2019: #3 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs Proposed List of Search Terms, #4 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs' Exemplar) (CBD). Modified text on 10/17/2019 (CBD). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/21/2019: #5 Un-redacted Proposed Search Term Recommendations) (CBD). (Attachment 3, 4 replaced on 11/1/2019 with images in color) (CBD).
October 16, 2019 Filing 378 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM REGARDING DISCOVERY filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(Ullman, Emily) Modified text on 10/17/2019 (CBD).
October 16, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: DAUBERT HEARINGS set for 6/8/2020 at 09:00 AM, 6/9/2020 at 09:00 AM, 6/10/2020 at 09:00 AM, 6/11/2020 at 09:00 AM, and 6/12/2020 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell. (CBD)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER: the Daubert hearings scheduled for the week of June 15, 2020 are RESCHEDULED for the week of June 8, 2020 beginning at 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 10/16/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(CBD)cc: COR, Lex D
October 16, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: Joint Status Report (filed as 375 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, et al) Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(CBD)
October 15, 2019 Filing 376 MOTION for leave to Seal a Documents: (1) Exhibit A Study Summary for the Single-Dose Intravenous Exploratory Cardiovascular Telemetry Study in Monkeys (ONG005726792) (2) Exhibit B Email Correspondence regarding Study Summary (ONG005726790) by Defendants (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(Ullman, Emily) Modified text on 11/5/2019 (CBD).
October 15, 2019 Filing 375 JOINT STATUS REPORT by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(Ullman, Emily)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 374 AMENDED MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR MOTION HEARING held on 10/10/2019. before Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett: After hearing statements of counsel, the Court took the Motion of the Plaintiffs (filed as 349 in 5:19-md-2809, et al) under advisement. IT IS ORDERED that not later than 10/16/2019, the parties SHALL FILE supplemental briefs, with no response time, addressing, individually, the seventeen custodial files Plaintiffs seek to be produced. The briefs shall address the relevance of each file to causation, the proportionality of the burden of producing each file at this stage compared to its relevance to causation and proposed search terms for the custodial files. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett on 10/10/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(CBD)cc: COR
October 10, 2019 Filing 373 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR MOTION HEARING held on 10/10/2019. before Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett: After hearing statements of counsel, the Court took the Motion of the Plaintiffs (filed as 349 in 5:19-md-2809, et al) under advisement. IT IS ORDERED that not later than 10/17/2019, the parties SHALL FILE supplemental briefs, with no response time, addressing, individually, the seventeen custodial files Plaintiffs seek to be produced. The briefs shall address the relevance of each file to causation, the proportionality of the burden of producing each file at this stage compared to its relevance to causation and proposed search terms for the custodial files. Signed by Matthew A. Stinnett. (Tape #KYED-LEX__5-18-md-2809-KKC_20191010_145422.) Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(CBD)cc: COR
October 10, 2019 Filing 372 NOTICE OF FILING by Carolyn Williams THIRD AMENDED [PROPOSED] CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ESTABLISHING STANDARDS AND PROCEDURES FOR COUNSEL SEEKING REIMBURSEMENT FOR COMMON BENEFIT FEES AND COSTS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Third Amended Proposed Common Benefit Order, #2 Exhibit B - Edited Second Amended Proposed Common Benefit Order)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(Clark, Timothy)
October 9, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Harris v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al opened as a Direct Filed Case in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-414-KKC pursuant to #174 Stipulated Order re Direct Filing. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
October 4, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: Proposed Agreed Orders of Dismissal (114 in 5:18-cv-00146-KKC, 371 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS), (137 in 5:18-cv-00064-KKC, 370 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS) Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00064-KKC, 5:18-cv-00146-KKC (CBD)
October 3, 2019 Filing 371 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation without Prejudice by Vannessa Slaughter. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00146-KKC(Kassan, Randi)
October 3, 2019 Filing 370 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation without Prejudice by Wrendell Chester. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00064-KKC(Kassan, Randi)
October 3, 2019 Filing 369 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 4/25/2019 before Judge Karen K. Caldwell. Court Reporter: Joan Averdick, Telephone number (859) 291-9666. Transcript ordered by: Carol Browning, Esq. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: In order to remove personal identifier data from the transcript, a party must follow the Court's policy regarding the Redaction Responsibility of Counsel and Parties. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov. #Read this policy carefully. Sample forms, i.e., a Notice of Intent to Redact, may be found on the court website by clicking on #Local Forms. If there are no redactions requested, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available via PACER 90 days from today's date. The Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Redaction Request due 10/28/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/7/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/6/2020.
October 1, 2019 Filing 368 SEALED DOCUMENTS same being Exhibit A cardiovascular telemetry study stamped ONG005726792 & Exhibit B emails re telemetry results stamped ONG005726790 re Reply (365 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS) filed pursuant to #364 MOTION TO SEAL documents (364 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS) by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B emails re telemetry results (ONG005726790)) Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(CBD)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER: the MOTION HEARING scheduled for October 2, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. is hereby CONTINUED until October 10, 2019, at 3:00 p.m. in Lexington. This date is firm and will not be changed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett on 10/1/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(CBD)cc: COR, Lex D. Modified cc on 10/1/2019 (CBD).
October 1, 2019 Filing 366 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 12/18/2018 before Judge Caldwell. Court Reporter: Linda Mullen, Telephone number (859) 469-7459. Transcript ordered by: CAROL BROWNING. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: In order to remove personal identifier data from the transcript, a party must follow the Court's policy regarding the Redaction Responsibility of Counsel and Parties. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov. #Read this policy carefully. Sample forms, i.e., a Notice of Intent to Redact, may be found on the court website by clicking on #Local Forms. If there are no redactions requested, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available via PACER 90 days from today's date. The Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Redaction Request due 10/25/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/2/2020.
October 1, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Rosenbaum v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-00403-KKC pursuant to Order #174 . cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
October 1, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Liles v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al directly opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-00401-KKC pursuant to Order #174 . cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
October 1, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Stinnett for review: re #349 MOTION to Compel to produce complete responses to the discovery that was propounded by Plaintiffs on 5/31/2019 , #364 MOTION for leave to Seal Exhibits A & B to Plaintiffs' Reply (filed as 365 in 5:18-md-2809) (CBD)
September 30, 2019 Filing 365 REPLY to (363 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS) Motion to Compel filed by Carolyn Williams, et al. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ONG005726792 - CONDITONALLY UNDER SEAL, #2 Exhibit B - ONB005726790 - CONDITIONALLY UNDER SEAL)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(Clark, Timothy) Modified on 10/1/2019 (CBD).
September 30, 2019 Filing 364 MOTION for leave to Seal a Exhibits A & B to Plaintiffs' Reply (filed as 365 in 5:18-md-2809) by Carolyn Williams, et al (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(Clark, Timothy) Modified text on 10/1/2019 (CBD).
September 30, 2019 Clerk's Note: Clerk provided electronic recording information packet to Joan Averdick re: #361 Transcript Order Form. (CBD)
September 30, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: re MOTION for Order to Show Cause (174 in 5:18-cv-00061-KKC, 342 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS) Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00061-KKC(CBD)
September 30, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: re MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (88 in 5:18-cv-00304-KKC, 355 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS); (91 in 5:18-cv-00325-KKC, 356 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS), (354 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 91 in 5:18-cv-00307-KKC), (357 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 87 in 5:18-cv-00326-KKC), (87 in 5:18-cv-00328-KKC, 358 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS) Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(CBD)
September 30, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: re Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation (350 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 20 in 5:19-cv-00219-KKC) Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:19-cv-00219-KKC(CBD)
September 27, 2019 Filing 363 RESPONSE in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Nishanth Chintala, #2 Affidavit of Mark Lewish, #3 Affidavit of Emily Ullman, #4 Exhibit A - 2008 FDA eCTD Guidance, #5 Exhibit B - Onglyza Summary Review, #6 Exhibit C - Onglyza Approval Letter, #7 Exhibit D - Kombiglyze Approval Letter, #8 Exhibit E - April 2016 Onglyza Label, #9 Exhibit F - April 2016 Kombiglyze Label, #10 Exhibit G - 2017 FDA eCTD Information, #11 Exhibit H - October 2017 Production Letter, #12 Exhibit I - January 2018 Production Letter, #13 Exhibit J - RFPs to AstraZeneca, #14 Exhibit K - RFPs to BMS, #15 Exhibit L - June 2019 CMC Transcript, #16 Exhibit M - June 30 Email from Defs, #17 Exhibit N - July 2019 Production Letter, #18 Exhibit O - July 30 Letter from Pls, #19 Exhibit P - August 19 Letter from Defs)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(Ullman, Emily)
September 27, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Shannon v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al directly opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-00398-KKC pursuant to #174 Order. (TDA)
September 25, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Carvin v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al directly opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-00393-KKC pursuant to #174 Order. cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
September 25, 2019 Filing 362 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., McKesson Corporation for proceedings held on 12/18/2018 before Judge Hon. Karen K. Caldwell.. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(Browning, Carol)
September 25, 2019 Filing 361 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., McKesson Corporation for proceedings held on 4/25/2019 before Judge Hon. Karen K. Caldwell.. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(Browning, Carol)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER: Defendants file response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (349 in 5:18-md-2809) by 9/27/2019; Plaintiffs may file reply by 9/30/2019. MOTION HEARING set for 10/2/2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Lexington before Magistrate Judge Stinnett. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett on 9/20/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(STC)cc: COR,D
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER: In accordance with the stipulation (345 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 85 in 5:18-cv-00235-KKC) filed by the parties, the Court hereby ORDERS that this matter is DISMISSED without prejudice and STRICKEN from the Courts active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/19/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00235-KKC(CBD)cc: COR, JPML, SKV
September 19, 2019 Filing 358 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jacqueline Young (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00328-KKC(Burge, Frank)
September 19, 2019 Filing 357 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by William E. Williams (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00326-KKC(Burge, Frank)
September 19, 2019 Filing 356 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by John Howard, Jr (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00325-KKC(Burge, Frank)
September 19, 2019 Filing 355 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Minnie Banks(on behalf of all wrongful death beneficiaries and as personal representative of the estate of the), Minnie Banks(Individually) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00304-KKC(Burge, F.)
September 19, 2019 Filing 354 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Billy Alexander (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00307-KKC(Burge, F.)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER: Plaintiffs have moved (DE 180 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS) the Court to enter a case management order that would establish procedures to pay plaintiffs counsel fees and reimburse them for their costs. In response (344 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS) to the Courts concerns regarding prior versions of the proposed order, the plaintiffs have submitted several revised proposed orders. As the Court discussed at the most recent status conference, the Court still has concerns about the most recent proposed order (DE 344-1). Specifically, the Court is concerned about ambiguities and inconsistencies in the provisions that would govern the two funds. (see Order) The Court hereby ORDERS that, within 21 days of the entry date of this order, plaintiffs MUST FILE an amended proposed order with all exhibits that addresses the issues raised in this order. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/19/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(CBD)cc: COR
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER: In accordance with the stipulation (111 in 5:18-cv-00137-KKC, 346 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS) filed by the parties, the Court hereby ORDERS that this matter is DISMISSED without prejudice and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket.. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/19/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00137-KKC(CBD)cc: COR, JPML, SKV
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER: In accordance with the stipulation (23 in 5:19-cv-00135-KKC, 343 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS) filed by the parties, the Court hereby ORDERS that this matter is DISMISSED without prejudice and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket.. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/19/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:19-cv-00135-KKC(CBD)cc: COR, JPML, SKV
September 19, 2019 Filing 350 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., McKesson Corporation. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:19-cv-00219-KKC(Browning, Carol) Modified event on 9/30/2019 (CBD).
September 19, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Timothy Clark re Motion to Compel (349 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, et al). ***Error: attachments were insufficiently described as "Exhibit A," "Exhibit B." Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachments. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel. cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(CBD)
September 19, 2019 Filing 349 MOTION to Compel to produce complete responses to the discovery that was propounded by Plaintiffs on May 15, 2019 by Carolyn Williams Motions referred to Matthew A. Stinnett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendants letter dated 5/31/2019, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Request for Production of Doc.s, #3 Exhibit C - Objections and Responses to Pltf's Request for Production of Documents, #4 Exhibit D - Letter from Defendants dated 7/24/2019, #5 Exhibit E - Letter from Plaintiffs counsel dated 9/16/2019, #6 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(Clark, Timothy) Modified text on 9/19/2019 (CBD).
September 17, 2019 Filing 348 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 9/17/2019 before Judge Karen K. Caldwell: 1. If the parties are unable to reach an agreement as to discovery requests by the weeks end, plaintiff SHALL file as soon as possible any Motion to Compel Discovery. 2. The Quarterly Status Telephone Conference remains SCHEDULED for Tuesday, December 17, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. (see Order for directives) 3. The Plaintiffs SHALL file a revised proposed order with exhibits for the Motion for Entry of Case Management Order Establishing Standards and Procedures for Counsel Seeking Reimbursement for Common Benefit Fees and Costs (DE 180). The revised proposed order should address the inconsistencies in the most recent proposed order regarding the proposed expense fund and fee fund, which the Court addressed on the record. (Tape #KYED-LEX__5-18-MD-2809-KKC-MAS_20190917_144954.) Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al. (CBD)cc: COR
September 16, 2019 Filing 347 JOINT STATUS REPORT by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(Ullman, Emily)
September 13, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: re Proposed Agreed Orders of dismissal without Prejudice (85 in 5:18-cv-00235-KKC, 345 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS), (346 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 111 in 5:18-cv-00137-KKC) by Randall McCall Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00137-KKC, 5:18-cv-00235-KKC(CBD)
September 12, 2019 Filing 346 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation of dismissal without Prejudice by Randall McCall. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00137-KKC(Kassan, Randi) Modified text on 9/13/2019 (CBD).
September 12, 2019 Filing 345 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation of dismissal without Prejudice by Teresa Booth (5:18-cv-235 - as Personal Representative of the ), Teresa Booth (5:18-cv-235 - Individually ). Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00235-KKC(Kassan, Randi) Modified text on 9/13/2019 (CBD).
September 6, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwelll for review: #344 RESPONSE to #340 Order. (5:18-md-2809, et al) (CBD)
September 6, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation without prejudice (23 in 5:19-cv-00135-KKC, 343 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS) Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:19-cv-00135-KKC(CBD)
September 5, 2019 Filing 344 RESPONSE to (340 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS) THE COURTS AUGUST 14, 2019 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED COMMON BENEFIT ORDER filed by Wilda Chamberlain. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Participation Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Monthly Expense, #4 Exhibit C - Monthly Time)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(Clark, Timothy)
September 5, 2019 Filing 343 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice by Harlon Gholar. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:19-cv-00135-KKC(Harris, Laurel) Modified on 9/6/2019 (CBD).
September 5, 2019 Filing 342 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., McKesson Corporation for Failure to Submit Plaintiff Profile Form (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00061-KKC(Browning, Carol)
September 3, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Elk v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al directly opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-00350-KKC pursuant to #174 Order. cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
August 27, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Cody Ryan v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al directly opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-343-KKC pursuant to #174 STIPULATED ORDER REGARDING DIRECT FILING cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
August 19, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: Joint Status Report(341 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS) as to all Cases. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(CBD)
August 15, 2019 Filing 341 JOINT STATUS REPORT by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(Ullman, Emily)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER: Plaintiffs have moved (180 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS) the Court to enter a case management order that would establish procedures to pay plaintiffs counsel fees and reimburse them for their costs. Plaintiffs have responded with an amended proposed order and amended Participation Agreement and written responses to the Courts questions (283 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS) The Court still has concerns regarding the proposed order, which are set forth below. The Court hereby ORDERS that, within 21 days of the entry date of this order, plaintiffs MUST FILE either 1) an amended proposed order that addresses the issues raised in this order; 2) a written response to the questions raised in this order; or 3) both. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 8/14/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(CBD)cc: COR
August 14, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re Orders 339, 337 and 338 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS. ***Error: Incorrect text was entered; Entries by clerk; Correction: Text corrected to reflect that plaintiffs claims against AstraZeneca LP only were dismissed. Individual member cases 5:18-cv-337, 5:18-cv-341 and 5:18-cv-342 were re-opened. No further action required cc: COR, JPML, SKV Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00337-KKC, 5:18-cv-00341-KKC, 5:18-cv-00342-KKC(CBD)
August 14, 2019 Party Jay Gintz (5:18-cv-236), Catina Loggan (5:18-cv-249), Harvey Beeler (5:18-cv-109) and Rosa Davila (5:18-cv-68) terminated. (CBD) Modified text on 8/14/2019 (CBD).
August 14, 2019 Filing 339 DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: plaintiffs claims against AstraZeneca LP are dismissed without prejudice (318 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 81 in 5:18-cv-00341-KKC), and AstraZeneca LP is DISMISSED as a party to this individual action. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 8/14/2019. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00341-KKC(CBD)cc: COR, JPML, SKV Modified text on 8/14/2019 (CBD).
August 14, 2019 Filing 338 DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: the plaintiffs claims against AstraZeneca LP are dismissed without prejudice (319 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 81 in 5:18-cv-00342-KKC), and AstraZeneca LP is DISMISSED as a party to this individual action. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 8/14/2019. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00342-KKC(CBD)cc: COR, JPML, SKV Modified text on 8/14/2019 (CBD).
August 14, 2019 Filing 337 DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: the plaintiffs claims against AstraZeneca LP are dismissed without prejudice (320 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 82 in 5:18-cv-00337-KKC), and AstraZeneca LP is DISMISSED as a party to this individual action. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 8/14/2019. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00337-KKC(CBD)cc: COR, JPML, SKV Modified text on 8/14/2019 (CBD).
August 14, 2019 Filing 336 DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: this matter is DISMISSED (329 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 86 in 5:18-cv-0068-KKC) without prejudice and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 8/14/2019. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00068-KKC(CBD)cc: COR, JPML, SKV
August 14, 2019 Filing 335 DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: this matter is DISMISSED (331 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 107 in 5:18-cv-00109-KKC) without prejudice and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 8/14/2019. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00109-KKC(CBD)cc: COR, JPML, SKV
August 14, 2019 Filing 334 DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: this matter is DISMISSED (332 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 81 in 5:18-cv-00249-KKC) without prejudice and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 8/14/2019. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00249-KKC(CBD)cc: COR, JPML, SKV
August 14, 2019 Filing 333 DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: this matter is DISMISSED (330 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 86 in 5:18-cv-00236-KKC) without prejudice and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 8/14/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00236-KKC(CBD)cc: COR, JPML, SKV
August 6, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: re Proposed Agreed Orders of Dismissal without Prejudice by Rosa Davila #329 , Jay Gintz #330 , as to Harvey Beeler #331 , as to Catina Loggan #332 . Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00068-KKC, 5:18-cv-00109-KKC, 5:18-cv-00236-KKC, 5:18-cv-00249-KKC(CBD)
August 2, 2019 Filing 332 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Without Prejudice by Catina Loggan. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00249-KKC(Kassan, Randi)
August 2, 2019 Filing 331 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Without Prejudice by Harvey Beeler. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00109-KKC(Kassan, Randi)
August 2, 2019 Filing 330 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Without Prejudice by Jay Gintz. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00236-KKC(Kassan, Randi)
August 2, 2019 Filing 329 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation without Prejudice by Rosa Davila. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00068-KKC(Kassan, Randi)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER: In a prior order (DE 309 in 5:18-2809), the Court ORDERED certain plaintiffs, including all the plaintiffs referenced above, to show cause why their cases should not be dismissed with prejudice for failing to submit Plaintiff Profile Forms. None of the above-referenced plaintiffs has shown cause why his or her case should not be dismissed. Accordingly, the Court hereby ORDERS that the above- referenced cases are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 8/1/2019. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-83-KKC, 5:18-84-KKC, 5:18-102-KKC, 5:18-113-KKC, 5:18-135-KKC, 5:18-386-KKC, 5:18-450-KKC, 5:18-635-KKC.(CBD)cc: COR, JPML, SKV
July 31, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Fact Discovery due by 11/8/2019. Daubert Motions due by 3/19/2020, responses to those motion due 4/16/2020 and replies due by 4/30/2020. (CBD)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 327 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 4 - REVISED GENERAL CAUSATION DISCOVERY DEADLINES AND REFERRAL OF DISCOVERY DISPUTES TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The parties have submitted proposed extensions (DE 324-2, 325-1 in 5:18-md-2809) of the deadlines for discovery pertaining to general causation established by Case Management Order No. 3 (DE 206 in 5:18-md-2809). The Court hereby ORDERS that the General Causation Discovery Deadlines set forth beginning on page 4 of Case Management Order No. 3 are REVISED as follows: 1) Fact discovery relating to the issue of general causation must conclude by November 8, 2019; 2) Plaintiffs must serve expert reports relating to the issue of general causation by November 26, 2019; 3) Defendants must serve expert reports relating to the issue of general causation by December 17, 2019; 4) Plaintiffs must serve rebuttal expert reports by January 17, 2020; 5) Depositions of expert witnesses on the issue of general causation must be completed by February 28, 2020; 6) Any Daubert motions challenging expert witness testimony on the issue of general causation must be filed by March 19, 2020. Any responses to such motions must be filed by April 16, 2020. Any replies must be filed by April 30, 2020. 7) Hearings on any Daubert motions currently scheduled for January 21- 23, 2020 are RESCHEDULED to take place the week of June 15, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Matthew Stinnett for purposes of resolving all discovery disputes. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 7/30/2019. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(CBD)cc: COR, Lex D.
July 30, 2019 Re-Set Hearing(s): DAUBERT MOTIONS HEARING set for 6/15/2020 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell. DAUBERT MOTIONS HEARING set for 6/16/2020 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell. DAUBERT MOTIONS HEARING set for 6/17/2020 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell. DAUBERT MOTIONS HEARING set for 6/18/2020 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell. DAUBERT MOTIONS HEARING set for 6/19/2020 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell. (CBD)
July 30, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Phillips v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al was directly opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-00302-KKC pursuant to #174 Order re Direct Filing. cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
July 30, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Stinnett for review: re #325 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION to Amend/Correct by David Taylor Scheduling Order Regarding General Causation Discovery, #324 DEFENDANTS' MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order Regarding General Causation Discovery Phase (CBD)
July 30, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED per ORDER #313 : #325 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION to Amend/Correct by David Taylor Scheduling Order Regarding General Causation Discovery, #324 DEFENDANTS' MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order Regarding General Causation Discovery. Motions referred to Matthew A. Stinnett. (CBD)
July 30, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Carol Browning re Supplement/Motion for Extension (324 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS). Error: This pleading is both a Supplement to a Joint Status Report and requests a Motion for Extension re General Causation Phase of Discovery and incorrectly docketed only as a Joint Status Report; Entry by attorney; Clerk re-defined the event to appear on the Judge's motion report and modified the text to reflect both items. No further action required by counsel cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(CBD)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER re (309 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 75 in 5:18-cv-00317-KKC, 75 in 5:18-cv-00310-KKC, 78 in 5:18-cv-00313-KKC, 76 in 5:18-cv-00265-KKC, 77 in 5:18-cv-00299-KKC): the show cause order entered at DE 309 in Master File No. 5:18-md-2809-KKC is VACATED as to the actions referenced above. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 7/29/2019. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al. (TDA) cc: COR
July 26, 2019 Filing 325 PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENT TO JOINT STATUS REPORT (DE 321 in 5:18-md-2809) AND REQUEST/MOTION FOR AN AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING GENERAL CAUSATION DISCOVERY by Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(Moore, Jennifer) Modified text on 7/30/2019 (CBD).
July 26, 2019 Filing 324 DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENT TO THE JOINT STATUS REPORT filed 7/15/2019 filed at DE (321) in 5:18-md-2809 AND MOTION FOR EXTENSION RE GENERAL CAUSATION PHASE OF DISCOVERY (Defendants' Supplement ) by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 07.24.2019 Discovery Letter, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Revised Discovery CMO (July 2019))Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(Browning, Carol) Modified text/re-defined on 7/30/2019 (CBD).
July 25, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Daniel Burke Response to Order to Show Cause (323 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS). ***Error: Document was incorrectly filed as to all member cases. Pursuant to the courts Practice & Procedure Order (Entry #3 in 5:18-md-2809) attorney should have filed the document identified above in the master case and spread text only to those member cases identified in the caption of the document those being 5:18-cv- 386, 5:18-cv-450 and 5:18-cv-635; Entry by Attorney; Correction: Clerk has marked the entry as "incorrectly filed" for all other member cases not identified in the caption of this pleading case. No further action required by counsel as to this error cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(CBD)
July 24, 2019 Filing 323 RESPONSE TO ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS SHOW CAUSE WHY THEIR CASES SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE by Mark Davis, Sr, Cyndy McCugh, Kathy Abshire (309 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 309 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS) filed by Mark Davis, Sr, Cyndy McCugh, Kathy Abshire. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-386, 5:18-cv-450, 5:18-cv-635.(Burke, Daniel) Modified text on 7/25/2019 (CBD).
July 24, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel ( 322 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 124 in 5:18-cv-00150-KKC). Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00150-KKC(CBD)
July 23, 2019 Filing 322 NOTICE Withdrawal of CounselDarrel J. Papillion and Renee C. Crasto, of Walters, Papillion on behalf of Plaitiffs Gregory Ross, Natalie Ross . Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00150-KKC(Crasto, Renee) Modified text on 7/24/2019 (CBD).
July 19, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Wilkins v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al opened as a Direct Filed Case in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-287-KKC pursuant to #174 Stipulated Order re Direct Filing. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
July 18, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: #321 Joint Status Report (CBD)
July 15, 2019 Filing 321 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(Ullman, Emily) Modified text on 7/18/2019 (CBD).
July 10, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: Proposed Agreed Stipulations of Dismissal Without Prejudice ( #318 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, #319 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, #320 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS). Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00337-KKC, 5:18-cv-00341- KKC, 5:18-cv-00342-KKC(CBD)
July 9, 2019 Filing 320 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc.. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00337-KKC(Browning, Carol) Modified on 7/10/2019 (CBD).
July 9, 2019 Filing 319 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Browning, Carol)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00342-KKC. Modified on 7/10/2019 (CBD).
July 9, 2019 Filing 318 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca LP. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00341-KKC(Browning, Carol) Modified on 7/10/2019 (CBD).
July 9, 2019 Filing 317 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 6/25/2019 before Judge Caldwell. Court Reporter: Linda Mullen, Telephone number (859) 469-7459. Transcript ordered by: CAROL DAN BROWNING. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: In order to remove personal identifier data from the transcript, a party must follow the Court's policy regarding the Redaction Responsibility of Counsel and Parties. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov. #Read this policy carefully. Sample forms, i.e., a Notice of Intent to Redact, may be found on the court website by clicking on #Local Forms. If there are no redactions requested, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available via PACER 90 days from today's date. The Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Redaction Request due 8/2/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/12/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/10/2019.
July 8, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Wilson v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al directly Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-272 pursuant to #1 Conditional Transfer Order #174 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
July 5, 2019 Clerk's Note: Transcript Request #316 forwarded to Court Reporter this date. (CBD)
July 3, 2019 Filing 316 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST re TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held 6/25/2019 (filed as DE #313 in 5:18-md-2809) by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., McKesson Corporation for proceedings held on 06/25/2019 before Judge Hon. Karen K. Caldwell.. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al.(Browning, Carol) Modified text on 7/5/2019 (CBD).
July 3, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Frank Petosa re (66 in 5:18-cv-00496-KKC) Notice of Dismissal of Party. Error: Attorney filed the document in the individual member case file only. Pursuant to the Court's Practice & Procedure Order (Entry #3 in 5:18-md-2809) attorney should have filed the document in the master case and spread text to each related individual member case; Entry by Attorney; Correction: Clerk has re- filed the document in the master and member case files. No further action required by counsel as to this error. cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00496-KKC(CBD)
July 3, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: (315 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 67 in 5:18-cv-00496-KKC) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Party IPR Pharmaceuticals. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00496-KKC(CBD)
July 2, 2019 Filing 315 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Party IPR Pharmaceuticals by Rhudenia Williams, Wiley Williams, Jr Filed per QC re DE #66 in 5:18-md-2809 Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS, 5:18-cv-00496-KKC(CBD)
June 25, 2019 Filing 313 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 6/25/2019 before Judge Karen K. Caldwell: The parties advised the Court of issues relating to discovery and the need to amend the discovery plan. The Court hereby ORDERS as follows: 1. The parties shall submit a proposed revised schedule to the Court's Chambers by e-mail. If the parties are unable to agree, they may request another telephone conference. 2. The Court REFERS this matter to United States Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett to assist in discovery related issues. (Court Reporter Linda Mullen.) Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC-MAS et al. (CBD)cc: COR
June 25, 2019 ***Reopen Document #180 MOTION for Entry by David Taylor of Case Management Order Establishing Standards & Procedures for Counsel Seeking Reimbursement for Common Benefit Fees & Costs (CBD)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER: Derrick Speights motion 134 in 5:18-cv-00148-KKC, 269 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) to substitute him as the named plaintiff in this action (DE 269) is DENIED. Derrick Speights may reassert the motion to substitute with evidence that he has been appointed to represent Lester Speights estate. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 6/25/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00148-KKC(CBD)cc: COR
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER: the show cause order entered at DE 309 in Master File No. 5:18-md-2809-KKC is VACATED as to the actions referenced above.. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 6/24/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER: the request (280 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) is DENIED. Pursuant to the Court's January 9, 2019 Case Management Order, the Court will enter a show cause order that will grant the plaintiffs 30 days to show cause why their cases should not be dismissed with prejudice. As also provided in the order, if any of the plaintiffs are unable to show cause, the Court will dismiss his or her case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 6/24/2109.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00386-KKC, 5:18-cv-00450-KKC, 5:18-cv-00635-KKC(CBD)cc: COR
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Show Cause (247 in 5:18-md-02809) is GRANTED. The Court further hereby ORDERS as follows: Within thirty (30) days of this Order, each plaintiff in the above-captioned actions shall file a response showing cause why his or her case should not be dismissed with prejudice. If the plaintiff files such a response, defendants may file a reply within fourteen (14) days of the date the response is filed. If a plaintiff fails to show cause why the case should not be dismissed with prejudice, the Court will dismiss the case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 6/24/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER: the notices (DE 267, 268, 271, 272, 274, 275, 276, 277, 278 in Master File No. 5:18-md-2809-KKC) are ineffective. To the extent that the notices should be construed as motions to withdraw, they are DENIED. If counsel wishes to withdraw as counsel of record in this or any other case in this MDL, they SHALL comply with Local Rule 83.6. The Court further ORDERS that, to the extent that Frank Burge, Sr.s withdrawal (DE 279, in Master File No. 5:18-md-2809-KKC) of his notice of withdrawal in Howard v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al., Individual Case No. 5:18-325 should be construed as a motion to withdraw the notice, it is DENIED as moot.. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 6/24/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER: In accordance with the stipulation (298 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 72 in 5:18-cv-00317-KKC) filed by the parties, the Court hereby ORDERS that this matter is DISMISSED without prejudiced and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 6/21/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00317-KKC(CBD)cc: COR, JPML
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER: In accordance with the stipulation (72 in 5:18-cv-00310-KKC, 297 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) filed by the parties, the Court hereby ORDERS that this matter is DISMISSED without prejudiced and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 6/21/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00310-KKC(CBD)cc: COR, JOML
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER: In accordance with the stipulation (76 in 5:18-cv-00313-KKC, 296 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) filed by the parties, the Court hereby ORDERS that this matter is DISMISSED without prejudiced and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 6/21/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00313-KKC(CBD)cc: COR, JPML
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER: In accordance with the stipulation (75 in 5:18-cv-00299-KKC, 295 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) filed by the parties, the Court hereby ORDERS that this matter is DISMISSED without prejudiced and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 6/21/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00299-KKC(CBD)cc: COR, JPML
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER : In accordance with the stipulation (74 in 5:18-cv-00265-KKC, 294 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) filed by the parties, the Court hereby ORDERS that this matter is DISMISSED without prejudice and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 6/21/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00265-KKC(CBD)cc: COR, JPML
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER: In accordance with the stipulation (293 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 15 in 5:19-cv-00132-KKC) filed by the parties, the Court hereby ORDERS that this matter is DISMISSED without prejudice and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 6/21/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:19-cv-00132-KKC(CBD)cc: COR, JPML
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER : In accordance with the stipulation (266 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) filed by the parties, the Court hereby ORDERS that this matter is DISMISSED without prejudice and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 6/21/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00071-KKC(CBD)cc: COR, JPML
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER: In accordance with the stipulation (265 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 109 in 5:18-cv-00060-KKC) filed by the parties, the Court hereby ORDERS that this matter is DISMISSED without prejudiced and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 6/21/2109.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00060-KKC(CBD)cc: COR
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER: Grimes' motion (70 in 5:18-cv-00167-KKC, 286 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) to substitute her as the named plaintiff in this action is DENIED. Grimes may reassert the motion to substitute, addressing the two issues raised by the Court in this order. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 6/21/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00167-KKC(CBD)cc: COR
June 20, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: re Proposed Agreed Orders/Stipulations of Dismissal #298 , #296 , #295 , #297 , #294 , #293 (CBD)
June 20, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Branham v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al Directly Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-00252-KKC pursuant to #174 Direct File Order cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
June 19, 2019 Filing 298 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation of Dismissal by Mary Smith. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00317-KKC(Harris, Laurel) Modified text on 6/20/2019 (CBD).
June 19, 2019 Filing 297 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation of Dismissal by James Mann. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00310-KKC(Harris, Laurel) Modified text on 6/20/2019 (CBD).
June 19, 2019 Filing 296 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation of Dismissal by Charles King. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00313-KKC(Harris, Laurel) Modified text on 6/20/2019 (CBD).
June 19, 2019 Filing 295 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation of Dismissal by Addie Huff. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00299-KKC(Harris, Laurel) Modified text on 6/20/2019 (CBD).
June 19, 2019 Filing 294 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation of Dismissal by Deanna Fouse. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00265-KKC(Harris, Laurel) Modified text on 6/20/2019 (CBD).
June 19, 2019 Filing 293 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation of Dismissal by James Alston. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:19-cv-00132-KKC(Harris, Laurel) Modified text on 6/20/2019 (CBD).
June 18, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Timothy Clark re Response to Order to Show Cause (291 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC). Error: Attorney filed the document in the master case only. Pursuant to the Court's Practice & Procedure Order (Entry #3 in 5:18-md-2809) attorney should have filed the document in the master case and spread text to each related individual member case; Entry by Attorney; Correction: Clerk has re-filed the document in the master and member case files. No further action required by counsel as to this error. cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)
June 18, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: Status Report (290 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC). Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)
June 18, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Jenneifer Moore re Status Report (290 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC - ALL Cases). Error: attachments were insufficiently described as "Exhibit A," "Exhibit B." Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachments. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel. cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)
June 17, 2019 Filing 292 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE #208 by Plaintiffs. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al. Filed per QC re DE 291 in 5:18-md-2809.(CBD)
June 17, 2019 Filing 291 INCORRECTLY FILED - RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Carolyn Williams #208 filed by Carolyn Williams. (Clark, Timothy)See DE (292 in 5:18-md-2809) for CORRECTED entry of this pleading. Modified on 6/18/2019 (CBD).
June 17, 2019 Filing 290 STATUS REPORT by David Taylor, Leatha Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Request for Production, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants' Initial Letter, #3 Exhibit C - Responses to Request for Production)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Moore, Jennifer) Modified text on 6/18/2019 (CBD).
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER RESCHEDULING JUNE 2019 STATUS CONFERENCE: the quarterly TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE currently scheduled for 6/18/2019 is RESCHEDULED to take place on 6/25/2019 at 01:00 PM. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 6/12/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR, Lex D
June 12, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE set for 6/25/2019 at 01:00 PM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell. (CBD)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER: In accordance with the stipulation (71 in 5:18-cv-00272-KKC, 285 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) this matter is DISMISSED without prejudice and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 6/7/2019. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00272-KKC (TDA) cc: COR, JPML
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER: In accordance with the stipulation (68 in 5:18-cv-00071-KKC, 180 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) filed by the parties, the Court hereby ORDEHS that this matter is DISMISSED without prejudice and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 6/7/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00071-KKC(CBD)cc: COR, JPML
June 3, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Perry v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-231 pursuant to Order #174 . cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
June 3, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Samuels v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-232 KKC pursuant to Order #174 . cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
May 31, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Abernathy v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-00230-KKC pursuant to Order #174 . cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
May 30, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: Response filed as to #246 Order and re #180 MOTION for Entry by David Taylor of Case Management Order Establishing Standards & Procedures for Counsel Seeking Reimbursement for Common Benefit Fees & Costs (CBD)
May 30, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: Motion (280 in 5:18-md-2809) for Extension of Time to Respond to (247 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) AMENDED MOTION for Order. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00386-KKC, 5:18-cv-00450-KKC, 5:18-cv-00635-KKC(CBD)
May 30, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: MOTION to Substitute Party by Harry Grimes (286 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 70 in 5:18-cv-00167-KKC). Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00167-KKC(CBD)
May 29, 2019 Filing 286 MOTION to Substitute Party Linda Grimes for Harry Grimes, deceased. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Letters of Administration, #3 Exhibit Death Certificate)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00167-KKC(Carr, Daniel) Modified text on 5/30/2019 (CBD).
May 29, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Robinson v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al opened as a Direct Filed Case in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-227-KKC pursuant to #174 Stipulated Order re Direct Filing. (TDA)
May 24, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Newton v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-223 KKC pursuant to #174 Order cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
May 24, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice re (71 in 5:18-cv-00272-KKC, 285 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) by Sabir Hasan, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Sabir Hasan, McKesson Corporation. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00272-KKC(CBD)
May 23, 2019 Filing 285 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice by Sabir Hasan, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation. Filed per QC re DE 70 in 5:18-cv-272 Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00272-KKC(CBD)
May 23, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: Response to Order to Show Cause (284 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 93 in 5:18-cv-00134-KKC) Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00134-KKC(CBD)
May 22, 2019 Filing 284 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by William Dinger Sr. (88 in 5:18-cv-00134-KKC, 247 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) filed by William Dinger Sr.. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00134-KKC(Kassan, Randi)
May 22, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: McGhghy v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-221 pursuant to #174 Order cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
May 22, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Mann v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-219 pursuant to #174 Order 1 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
May 22, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Parker v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-00218-KKC pursuant to #174 Order cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
May 20, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: #282 Joint Status Report (CBD)
May 17, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: (283 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) RESPONSE to Court's Order #246. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(TDA)
May 16, 2019 Filing 283 RESPONSE to (246 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) filed by David Taylor, Leatha Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Plaintiffs' Amended Proposed Case Management Order Establishing Standards and Procedures for Counsel Seeking Reimbursement for Common Benefit Fees and Costs, #2 Exhibit 2- Common Benefit Participation Agreement)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Moore, Jennifer)
May 15, 2019 Filing 282 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs and AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al. REFILED pursuant to QC re DE #281 in Master Case(TDA)
May 9, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Caldwell for review: re #269 MOTION to Substitute Party Derrick Speights for Lester Speights, deceased filed on behalf of Lester Speights (CBD)
May 9, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: re #274 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jacqueline Young , #268 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by John Howard, Jr, John Howard, Jr, #278 AMENDED MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by John Howard, Jr , #267 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Billy Alexander, Billy Alexander, #277 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Mary Smith , #272 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, #271 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, #276 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by James Mann , #279 MOTION to Withdraw by John Howard, Jr , #275 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Minnie Banks(on behalf of all wrongful death beneficiaries and as personal representative of the estate of the), Minnie Banks(Individually) , #273 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by William E. Williams (CBD)
May 9, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Daniel Burke re (270 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) Response to Order to Show Cause. ***Error: Attorney filed the document in the master case file only. Pursuant to the Court's Practice & Procedure Order (Entry #3 in 5:18- md-2809) attorney should have filed the document in the master case and spread text to each related individual member case; Entry by Attorney; Correction: Clerk has re-filed the document in the master and spread to the related member case files. No further action required by counsel as to this error. *** Error: This is a response AND a motion to extend time. The document was filed only as a response when the document should be filed as two separate entries; Entry by attorney; Clerk re-filed the document as a Response and Motion to Extend Time. In the future, when filing multiple documents within one filing, please refer to the ECF User Manual 'Filing Other Types of Documents' for the correct procedure. No further steps required by counsel cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00386-KKC, 5:18-cv-00450-KKC, 5:18-cv-00635-KKC(CBD)
May 9, 2019 Filing 279 MOTION to Withdraw Motion (filed as #271 in 5:18-md-2809 and as 67 in 5:18-cv-325) by John Howard, Jr (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Withdrawal of Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel) Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00325-KKC(Burge, F.) Modified on 5/9/2019 (CBD). Modified on 5/9/2019 (CBD).
May 9, 2019 Filing 278 AMENDED MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by John Howard, Jr (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00325-KKC(Burge, Frank)This entry corrects #271 in 5:18-md-2809 Modified on 5/9/2019 (CBD).
May 9, 2019 Filing 277 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Mary Smith (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel for Plaintiff)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00317-KKC(Burge, F.)
May 9, 2019 Filing 276 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by James Mann (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel for Plaintiff)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00310-KKC(Burge, F.)
May 9, 2019 Filing 275 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Minnie Banks(on behalf of all wrongful death beneficiaries and as personal representative of the estate of the), Minnie Banks(Individually) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel for Plaintiff)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00304-KKC(Burge, F.)
May 9, 2019 Filing 274 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jacqueline Young (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00328-KKC(Burge, Frank)
May 9, 2019 Filing 273 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by William E. Williams (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00326-KKC(Burge, Frank)
May 9, 2019 Filing 272 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Billy Alexander (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00307-KKC(Burge, F.) Modified on 5/9/2019 (CBD).
May 9, 2019 Filing 271 MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL by by John Howard, Jr (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00325-KKC(Burge, Frank) Modified on 5/9/2019 (CBD). This entry is CORRECTED at #278 in 5:18-md-2809. Modified on 5/9/2019 (CBD).
May 9, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Tincher v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-00204-KKC pursuant to Order #174 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
May 8, 2019 Filing 270 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Kathy Abshire, Mark Davis, Sr, Cyndy McCugh #247 filed by Kathy Abshire, Mark Davis, Sr, Cyndy McCugh. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burke, Daniel)
May 8, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Cadlwell for review: re (266 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation of Dismissal of Case, (265 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation of Dismissal. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00060-KKC, 5:18-cv-00071-KKC(CBD)
May 8, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Daniel Carr re (133 in 5:18-cv-00148-KKC) MOTION to Substitute Party. ***Error: Attorney filed the document in the individual member case file only. Pursuant to the Court's Practice & Procedure Order (Entry #3 in 5:18-md-2809) attorney should have filed the document in the master case and spread text to each related individual member case; Entry by Attorney; Correction: Clerk has re- filed the document in the master and member case files]. No further action required by counsel as to this error. cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00148-KKC(CBD)
May 8, 2019 Filing 269 MOTION to Substitute Party Derrick Speights for Lester Speights, deceased filed on behalf of Lester Speights (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Death Certificate)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00148-KKC(CBD) Filed per QC re DE 133 in 5:18-cv-148 Modified text on 5/8/2019 (CBD).
May 7, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO F. Tucker Burge Sr. re (67 in 5:18-cv-00307-KKC) MOTION. ***Error: Attorney filed the document in the individual member case file only. Pursuant to the Court's Practice & Procedure Order (Entry #3 in 5:18-md-2809) attorney should have filed the document in the master case and spread text to each related individual member case; Entry by Attorney; Correction: Clerk has re- filed the document in the master and member case files. No further action required by counsel as to this error. NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY & DOCKET MODIFICATION to F. Tucker Burge Jr. and F. Tucker Burge Sr. re (66 in 5:18-cv-00325-KKC) MOTION. ***Error 1: Attorney filed the document in the individual member case file only. Pursuant to the Court's Practice & Procedure Order (Entry #3 in 5:18-md-2809) attorney should have filed the document in the master case and spread text to each related individual member case; Entry by Attorney; Correction: Clerk has re- filed the document in the master and member case files. No further action required by counsel as to this error. ***Error 2: Signature on document F. Tucker Burge Jr. and ECF filer F. Tucker Burge Sr. do not match; Entry by attorney; the name of the Filing User under whose login and password the document is filed must be typed in the space where the signature would otherwise appear. No further action required by counsel. ***Error 3: attorney failed to submit a [proposed order] as an electronic attachment to the motion. Entry by attorney; within 7 calendar days, prepare a document entitled Notice of Filing, file the Notice using the event Notice of Filing, attach the proposed order, and create a link to the related docket entry. cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00307-KKC, 5:18-cv-00325-KKC(CBD)
May 7, 2019 Filing 267 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney F. Tucker Burge, Sr. for Billy Alexander. Filed per QC re D.E. 67 in 5:18-cv-307 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00307-KKC(CBD)
May 7, 2019 Filing 266 STIPULATION of Dismissal off Case by Brown and Defendants. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00071-KKC(Browning, Carol) Modified text on 5/8/2019 (CBD).
May 7, 2019 Filing 265 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by Carpenter and Defendants. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00060-KKC(Browning, Carol) Modified text on 5/8/2019 (CBD).
May 6, 2019 Filing 268 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney F. Tucker Burge, Jr. for John Howard, Jr. Filed per QC re DE 66 in 5:18-cv-325 Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00325-KKC(CBD)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER: In accordance with the stipulation filed by the parties, the Court hereby ORDERS that this matter is DISMISSED without prejudice and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/6/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00126-KKC(CBD)cc: COR, JPML
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER: In accordance with the stipulation (75 in 5:18-cv-00136-KKC, 250 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) this matter is DISMISSED without prejudice and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/6/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00136-KKC(CBD)cc: COR, JPML
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER: In accordance with the stipulation ( #107 in 5:18-cv-00069-KKC, #249 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) this matter is DISMISSED without prejudice and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/6/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00069-KKC(CBD)cc: COR, JPML
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER: In accordance with the stipulation (68 in 5:18-cv-00309-KKC, 243 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) this matter is DISMISSED without prejudice and STRICKEN from the Courts active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/6/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00309-KKC(CBD)cc: COR, JPML
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER: In accordance with the stipulation (242 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 65 in 5:18-cv-00324-KKC) this matter is DISMISSED without prejudice and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/6/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00324-KKC(CBD)cc: COR, JPML. Modified on 5/6/2019 (CBD).
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER: In accordance with the stipulation (241 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 64 in 5:18-cv-00340-KKC) this matter is DISMISSED without prejudice and STRICKEN from the Courts active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/6/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00340-KKC(CBD)cc: COR, JPML. Modified on 5/6/2019 (CBD).
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER: In accordance with the stipulation (65 in 5:18-cv-00267-KKC, 240 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) this matter is DISMISSED without prejudice and STRICKEN from the Courts active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/6/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00267-KKC(CBD)cc: COR, JPML. Modified on 5/6/2019 (CBD).
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER: In accordance with the stipulation (65 in 5:18-cv-00319-KKC, 239 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) this matter is DISMISSED without prejudice and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/6/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00319-KKC(CBD)cc: COR, JPML. Modified on 5/6/2019 (CBD).
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER : In accordance with the stipulation (252 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 66 in 5:18-cv-00390-KKC) this matter is DISMISSED without prejudice and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/6/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00390-KKC(CBD)cc: COR, JPML. Modified on 5/6/2019 (CBD).
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER: In accordance with the stipulation ( #238 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, #64 in 5:18-cv-00262-KKC) filed by the parties, the Court hereby ORDERS that this matter is DISMISSED without prejudice and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/6/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00262-KKC(CBD)cc: COR, JPML Clerk. Modified on 5/6/2019 (CBD).
May 3, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Caldwell for review re FRCP 4M as to defendant IPR Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in Member Csaes (5:19-cv-00025-KKC and 5:19-cv-00026-KKC). Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:19-cv-00025-KKC, 5:19-cv-00026-KKC(CBD)
May 2, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Barnett v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-00194-KKC pursuant to #171 Order cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
May 2, 2019 Filing 254 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Motion for Issuance of Order to Show Cause served on William Dinger on 04/10/2019, filed by William Dinger Sr.. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00134-KKC(Kassan, Randi)
May 1, 2019 Filing 253 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of AMENDED MOTION for Order to Show Cause (95 in 5:18-cv-00113-KKC, 247 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) to Lisa Ford, on behalf of Mattie Holmes, deceased, by Plaintiffs . Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00113-KKC(Kassan, Randi) Modified text on 5/2/2019 (CBD).
May 1, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: Proposed Agreed Order of Dismissal without Prejudice (filed as #66 in 5:18-cv-00390-KKC, #252 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00390-KKC(CBD)
May 1, 2019 Filing 252 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation without Prejudice by Jeffrey L. Brown, Jeffrey L. Brown(individually ). Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00390-KKC(Kassan, Randi)
April 30, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: McConnell v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-190 KKC pursuant to #1 Order #174 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
April 29, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: Proposed Agreed Orders/Stipulations re (75 in 5:18-cv-00136-KKC, 250 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC), (251 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 107 in 5:18-cv-00126-KKC), (107 in 5:18-cv-00069-KKC, 249 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC). Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00069-KKC, 5:18-cv-00126-KKC, 5:18-cv-00136-KKC(CBD)
April 26, 2019 Filing 251 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation without prejudice by Therese Medley. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00126-KKC(Kassan, Randi)
April 26, 2019 Filing 250 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation without prejudice by David Caldwell. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00136-KKC(Kassan, Randi)
April 26, 2019 Filing 249 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation without prejudice by Carl Hulbert. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00069-KKC(Kassan, Randi)
April 26, 2019 Set Hearing re 5:18-md-2809 - ALL Cases: QUARTERLY TELEPHONE CONFERENCE set for 6/18/2019 at 03:00 PM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell. (CBD)
April 26, 2019 Motions Taken Under Advisement: AMENDED MOTION for Order to Show Cause (247 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 88 in 5:18-cv-00134-KKC, 64 in 5:18-cv-00310-KKC, 95 in 5:18-cv-00113-KKC, 104 in 5:18-cv-00069-KKC, 68 in 5:18-cv-00302-KKC, 71 in 5:18-cv-00083-KKC, 69 in 5:18-cv-00313-KKC, 63 in 5:18-cv-00450-KKC, 64 in 5:18-cv-00317-KKC, 67 in 5:18-cv-00217-KKC, 70 in 5:18-cv-00135-KKC, 66 in 5:18-cv-00297-KKC, 69 in 5:18-cv-00386-KKC, 67 in 5:18-cv-00265-KKC, 105 in 5:18-cv-00126-KKC, 71 in 5:18-cv-00102-KKC, 71 in 5:18-cv-00084-KKC, 72 in 5:18-cv-00136-KKC, 6 in 5:18-cv-00635-KKC, 71 in 5:18-cv-00106-KKC, 68 in 5:18-cv-00299-KKC) Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)
April 25, 2019 Filing 248 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 4/25/2019 before Judge Karen K. Caldwell: 1. Defendant's Amended Motion #247 for Order to Show Cause for Failure to Submit Plaintiff Profile Form is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. 2. The Court DIRECTS the parties to request court intervention as soon as possible if the fact discovery deadline of July 9, 2019 cannot be met. 3. The Quarterly Status Telephone Conference remains SCHEDULED for Tuesday, June 18, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. Counsel shall access the call by dialing 1-888-684-8852, then entering access code 6823688.(Tape #KYED-LEX__18-MD-2809-KKC_20190425_154840.) Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al. (CBD)cc: COR
April 25, 2019 Filing 247 AMENDED MOTION for Order to Show Cause by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Bristol Myers Squibb Company for Failure to Submit Plaintiff Profile Form (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - List of Plaintiffs, #2 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Browning, Carol)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS that, within 21 days of the entry date of this order, plaintiffs MUST FILE re Motion #180 either: 1) an amended proposed order and amended Participation Agreement that addresses the issues raised in the questions in Section II of this order; 2) a written response to the questions raised in Section II (see Order for section I and II) of this order; or 3) both. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 4/25/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR
April 24, 2019 Filing 245 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol Myers Squibb Company, Bristol-Meyers Squibb Company, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., McKesson Corporation, McKesson Corporation, McKesson Corporation for Failure to Submit Plaintiff Profile Form (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - List of Plaintiffs, #2 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Browning, Carol)
April 23, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: PROPOSED AGREED STIPULATIONS/NOTICES OF DISMISSAL filed as (238 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 64 in 5:18-cv-00262-KKC); (65 in 5:18-cv-00267-KKC, 240 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC); (243 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 68 in 5:18-cv-00309-KKC); (239 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 65 in 5:18-cv-00319-KKC); (65 in 5:18-cv-00324-KKC, 242 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) ; (64 in 5:18-cv-00340-KKC, 241 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)
April 23, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: O'Toole et al v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al opened as a Direct Filed Case in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-173-KKC pursuant to #174 Stipulated Order re Direct Filing. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
April 22, 2019 Party Patrick Utterback (5:18-cv-218 KKC) terminated. (CBD)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER: In accordance with the stipulation ( #237 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, #65 in 5:18-cv-00218-KKC) filed by the parties, the Court hereby ORDERS that this matter is DISMISSED without prejudice and STRICKEN from the Courts active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 4/22/2019. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00218-KKC (TDA) cc: COR
April 18, 2019 Filing 243 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cathy Terrell Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00309-KKC(Harris, Laurel)
April 18, 2019 Filing 242 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Larry Matthews Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00324-KKC(Harris, Laurel)
April 18, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: re (65 in 5:18-cv-00218-KKC, 237 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation, Patrick Utterback Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00218-KKC(CBD)
April 18, 2019 Filing 241 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by William Hightower Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00340-KKC(Harris, Laurel)
April 18, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Laurel Harris re (64 in 5:18-cv-00218-KKC) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation: Attorney filed the document in the individual member case file only. Pursuant to the Court's Practice & Procedure Order (Entry #3 in 5:18- md-2809) attorney should have filed the document in the master case and spread text to each related individual member case; Entry by Attorney; Correction: Clerk has re-filed the document in the master and related member case file. No further action required by counsel as to this error. cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00218-KKC(CBD)
April 18, 2019 Filing 240 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Debbie Crear Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00267-KKC(Harris, Laurel)
April 18, 2019 Filing 239 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Francoisce Baker Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00319-KKC(Harris, Laurel)
April 18, 2019 Filing 238 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Bailey Erwin Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00262-KKC(Harris, Laurel)
April 18, 2019 Filing 237 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation, Patrick Utterback. Filed per QC re #64 in 5:18-cv-218 Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00218-KKC(CBD)
April 18, 2019 Party John Key (5:18-cv-242), Patsy Nesselrodt (5:18-cv-164), Allen Ellis (18-cv-114) and Carl Jarman (5:18-cv-286-KKC) terminated. (CBD)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER: the stipulation (63 in 5:18-cv-00286-KKC, 227 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) filed by the parties, the Court hereby ORDERS that this matter is DISMISSED without prejudice and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 4/18/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00286-KKC(CBD)cc: COR, JPML
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER the stipulation ( #67 in 5:18-cv-00242-KKC, #229 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) filed by the parties, the Court hereby ORDERS that this matter is DISMISSED without prejudice and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 4/18/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00242-KKC(CBD)cc: COR, JPML
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER: the stipulation ( #221 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, #67 in 5:18-cv-00164-KKC) filed by the parties, the Court hereby ORDERS that this matter is DISMISSED without prejudice and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 4/18/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00164-KKC(CBD)cc: COR, JPML
April 18, 2019 Clerk's Note: Order #233 regenerated to JPML. (CBD)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER: the stipulation ( #228 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, #101 in 5:18-cv-00114-KKC) filed by the parties, the Court hereby ORDERS that this matter is DISMISSED without prejudice and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 4/18/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00114-KKC(CBD)cc: COR
April 17, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: Status Report (filed as #231 in 5:18-md-2809, et al) (CBD)
April 17, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Show Cause Response due by 6/17/2019. (CBD)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER: Motion (DE #224 in 5:18-md-2809, et al) is GRANTED and the Court's Order to Show Cause is continued sixty (60) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 4/17/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR
April 17, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Scott v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-169 KKC pursuant to #174 Order. cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
April 15, 2019 Filing 231 JOINT STATUS REPORT by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Bristol-Myers Company, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation, Bristol-Meyers Squibb Company. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Browning, Carol)
April 15, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Shepard v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al opened as a Direct Filed Case in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-166-KKC pursuant to #174 Stipulated Order re Direct Filing. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
April 8, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Haggar v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-00161-KKC pursuant to #174 Order. cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
April 5, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Irvan v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al opened as as a Direct Filed Case in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-156-KKC pursuant to #174 Stipulated Order re Direct Filing. (TDA)cc: COR, JPMDL
April 5, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Greer v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-155 KKC pursuant to #174 Order. cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
April 4, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Sukhoo v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al opened as a Direct Filed Case in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-149-KKC pursuant to #174 Stipulated Order re Direct Filing. (TDA)
April 4, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Sweeney v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al opened as a Direct Filed Case in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-148-KKC pursuant to #174 Stipulated Order re Direct Filing. (TDA)
April 4, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Strange v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al opened as a Direct Filed Case in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-147-KKC pursuant to #174 Stipulated Order re Direct Filing. (TDA) cc: COR,JPMDL
April 4, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Mays v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-154 KKC pursuant to #174 Order. cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
April 4, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Wendricks v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-153 KKC pursuant to #174 Order. cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
April 4, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Wendricks v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al directly Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-152 KKC pursuant to #174 Order. cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
April 4, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Wendricks v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-151 KKC pursuant to #174 Order. cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
April 4, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Thompson v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al directly Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-150 KKC pursuant to #174 Order. cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
April 4, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Smith v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al opened as Direct Filed Case in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-146-KKC pursuant to #174 Stipulated Order re Direct Filing. (TDA) cc: COR, JPMDL
April 4, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: re #224 MOTION for Extension of Time to comply with the Court's Show Cause Order #208 by Plaintiffs (CBD)
April 3, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Johnson v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-00144-KKC pursuant to #174 . cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
April 3, 2019 Filing 230 NOTICE OF FILING by David Taylor, Leatha Taylor re (224 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) MOTION for Extension of Time by David Taylor (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Moore, Jennifer)
April 3, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: McLean v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-145 KKC pursuant to #174 Order cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
April 3, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Collins v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-143 KKC pursuant to #174 Order. cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
April 3, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Hudson v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-00142-KKC pursuant to #174 Order. cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
April 3, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Ragsdale v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-00141-KKC pursuant to Order #174 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
April 3, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Harrington v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-00140-KKC pursuant to Order #174 . cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
April 3, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: re (229 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 67 in 5:18-cv-00242-KKC) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation without Prejudice by John Key Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00242-KKC(CBD)
April 3, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation without Prejudice (101 in 5:18-cv-00114-KKC, 228 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC). Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00114-KKC(CBD)
April 2, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Hosey v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al opened as a Direct Filed Case in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-138-KKC pursuant to #174 Stipulated Order re Direct Filing. (TDA)
April 2, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Hudson v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-00139-KKC pursuant to Order #174 . cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
April 2, 2019 Filing 229 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation without Prejudice by John Key. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00242-KKC(Kassan, Randi)
April 2, 2019 Filing 228 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation without Prejudice by Allen Ellis. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00114-KKC(Kassan, Randi)
April 1, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: re Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation (63 in 5:18-cv-00286-KKC, 227 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00286-KKC(CBD)
April 1, 2019 Filing 227 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice by Carl Jarman. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00286-KKC(Kassan, Randi) Modified on 4/1/2019 (CBD).
April 1, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Spearman v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al opened on 3/29/2019 as a Direct Filed Case in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-129-KKC pursuant to #174 Stipulated Order re Direct Filing. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
April 1, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Cagle v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al opened on 3/29/2019 as a Direct Filed Case in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-128-KKC pursuant to #174 Stipulated Order re Direct Filing. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
April 1, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Ford v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-00133-KKC pursuant to Order #174 . cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
April 1, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Wight v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-00134-KKC pursuant to Order #174 . cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
April 1, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Gholar v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-00135-KKC pursuant to Order #174 . cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
April 1, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Santiago v. Bristol-Meyers Squibb Company. et al directly opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-131 KKC pursuant to Order #174 . cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
April 1, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Dupree v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al directly opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-00130-KKC pursuant to #174 Order re Direct Filing. cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
April 1, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alston v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al directly opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-00132-KKC pursuant to #174 Order re Direct Filing. cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
March 29, 2019 Filing 226 NOTICE of Change of Address by Lauren Aliz Welling Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Welling, Lauren)
March 29, 2019 Filing 225 NOTICE of Change of Address by Timothy Michael Clark Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Clark, Timothy)
March 28, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Mason v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Inc., et al opened as a Direct Filed Case in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-126-KKC pursuant to #174 Stipulated Order re Firect Filing. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
March 28, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Ritz v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Inc., et al opened as a Direct Filed Case in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-127-KKC pursuant to #174 Stipulated Order re Firect Filing. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
March 28, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Daily v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al directly opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-123 KKC pursuant to #174 Order re Direct Fililng cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
March 28, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Kelly v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al directly opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-125 KKC pursuant to #174 Order re Direct Filing cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
March 28, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Brown v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al directly opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-00122-KKC pursuant to #174 Order re Direct Filing cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
March 28, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY & DOCKET MODIFICATION to Jennifer Moore. ***Error 1 re (223 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) Response to Order to Show Cause; This is a motion AND a response. The document was filed only as a response when the document should be filed as two separate entries; Entry by attorney; Clerk re- filed the document as a Motion for Extension at #224 in 5:18-md-2809, et al. In the future, when filing multiple documents within one filing, please refer to the ECF User Manual "Filing Other Types of Documents" for the correct procedure. No further steps required by counsel. ***Error 2: MOTION for Extension of Time (224 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, et al) attorney failed to submit a proposed order as an electronic attachment to the motion. Entry by attorney; within 7 calendar days, prepare a document entitled "Notice of Filing", file the Notice using the event "Notice of Filing," attach the proposed order, and create a link to the related docket entry. cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)
March 27, 2019 Filing 224 MOTION for Extension of Time to comply with Show Cause Order (filed as #208 in 5:18-cv-2809-KKC, ET AL) by David Taylor. Filed per QC re #223 Response Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)
March 27, 2019 Filing 223 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by David Taylor, Leatha Taylor (208 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) filed by David Taylor, Leatha Taylor. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Moore, Jennifer)
March 27, 2019 Filing 222 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jennifer A. Moore Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Moore, Jennifer)
March 20, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Wilkerson v. Bristol-Meyers Squibb Company, et al directly opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-112 KKC pursuant to #1 Direct File Order #174 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
March 20, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Randi Kassan re Stipulation (66 in 5:18-cv-00164-KKC). Error: Attorney filed the document in the individual member case file only. Pursuant to the Court's Practice & Procedure Order (Entry #3 in 5:18-md-2809) attorney should have filed the document in the master case and spread text to each related individual member case; Entry by Attorney; Correction: Clerk has re-filed the document in the master and related individual member case files. No further action required by counsel as to this error. cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00164-KKC(CBD)
March 20, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: re (67 in 5:18-cv-00164-KKC, 221 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson of Dismissal without Prejudice. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00164-KKC(CBD)
March 19, 2019 Filing 221 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation of Dismissal by Patsy Nesselrodt, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation. Filed per QC re #66 in 5:18-cv-164 Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00164-KKC(CBD)
March 18, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judeg Caldwell for review: Joint Status Report (220 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, et al) Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)
March 15, 2019 Filing 220 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Browning, Carol) Modified text on 3/18/2019 (CBD).
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER: the quarterly telephonic status conference scheduled to take place on 3/19/2019 is RESCHEDULED to take place on 4/25/2019 at 4:00 p.m. Unless the Court orders otherwise, the conference will be conducted telephonically. (See Order for details) The other scheduled quarterly status conferences remain scheduled for the dates set forth in the preliminary scheduling order.(DE #164 , Case. No. 5:18-md-2809, et al). Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 3/12/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR, Lex D
March 12, 2019 Reset Hearing: Quarterly TELEPHONE CONFERENCE set for 4/25/2019 at 04:00 PM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell. (CBD)
March 8, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Horne v. Bristol-Myers Squibb directly opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-95 KKC pursuant to #174 Order re Direct Filing cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
March 8, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Davis v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al opened as a Direct Filed Case in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-89-KKC pursuant to #174 Stipulated Order re Direct Filing. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
March 8, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Schwartz v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al directly opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-92 KKC pursuant to #174 Order re Direct Filing cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
March 8, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Perkins v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al directly opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-91 KKC pursuant to #174 Order re Direct Filing cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
March 8, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Ray v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al directly opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-00090-KKC pursuant to #174 Oder re Direct Filing cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER: In accordance with the stipulation ( #214 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, #71 in 5:18-cv-00140-KKC) filed by the parties, the Court hereby ORDERS that this matter is DISMISSED without prejudice and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 3/6/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00140-KKC(CBD)cc: COR, JPML Modified cc on 3/6/2019 (CBD).
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER: In accordance with the stipulation (207 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 78 in 5:18-cv-00117-KKC) filed by the parties, the Court hereby ORDERS that this matter is DISMISSED without prejudice and STRICKEN from the Courts active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 3/6/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00117-KKC(CBD)cc: COR, JPML Modified cc on 3/6/2019 (CBD).
March 6, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs' Show Cause Response due by 3/27/2019. (CBD)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER: Motion (R. #215 in 5:2809, et al) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' response to the Order to Show Cause is due 3/27/2019. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 3/6/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR
February 28, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Sharp et al v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al; Directly Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-00078-KKC pursuant to #174 Order re Direct Filing. (TDA)
February 28, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Scott v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al; Directly Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-00076-KKC pursuant to #174 Order re Direct Filing. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
February 27, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Karitenos v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al Directly Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-00071-KKC pursuant to #174 Order re Direct Filing cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
February 27, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Rankow v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al Directly Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-70 KKC pursuant to Order re Direct Filing {174] cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
February 26, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: North v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al Directly Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-00068-KKC pursuant to #174 Order re Direct Filing cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
February 26, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: re #215 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responseas to Show Cause Order ( #208 in 5:18-md-2809-KKC, ET AL) Plaintiffs (CBD)
February 26, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: re Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation without prejudice as to John Wesley Hunt, Sr. (214 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 71 in 5:18-cv-00140-KKC) Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00140-KKC(CBD)
February 25, 2019 Filing 215 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to ( #208 in 5:18-cv-2809-KKC, ET AL) Order to Show Cause by Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Moore, Jennifer) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (CBD).
February 25, 2019 Filing 214 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice by John Wesley Hunt, Sr., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00140-KKC(Browning, Carol) Modified event/text on 2/26/2019 (CBD).
February 22, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO E. Scott Verhine re Amended Complaint ( #5 in 5:19-cv-00055-KKC). Error: Attorney filed the document in the individual member case file only. Pursuant to the attorney should have filed the document in the master case and spread text to the related individual member case. Entry by Attorney. Correction: Clerk has re-filed the document in the master and member case filed as (R. #213 in 5:18-md-2809 and R. #6 in 5:19-cv-55.) Counsel is further advised to use captioning as set out in the Court's Practice & Procedure Order (R. #3 in 5:18- md-2809) for all future pleadings in this litigation. No further action required as to this pleading by counsel. cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:19-cv-00055-KKC(CBD)
February 20, 2019 Filing 213 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (correcting Caption) against AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., McKesson Corporation, filed by Walter Harding, Walter Harding. Filed per QC re #5 in 5:19-cv-55Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:19-cv-00055-KKC(CBD)
February 19, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Harding v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al direct filed and opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-55 KKC pursuant to #174 Order re Direct Filing. cc: COR, Schumacher with 2809 ECF Reg. Form, JPMDL (CBD)
February 19, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: Joint Status Report (212 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, et al). Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, ALL cases.(CBD)
February 15, 2019 Filing 212 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Browning, Carol) Modified text on 2/19/2019 (CBD).
February 7, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: Notice of Withdrawal of Timothy Young for Plaintiffs filed as ([209, #210 and #211 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00298-KKC, 5:18-cv-00300-KKC, 5:18-cv-00303-KKC(CBD)
February 7, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Timothy Young re Notice filed as #209 , #210 and #211 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC. Error: Documents were filed in the member cases only. Pursuant to the court's Practice & Procedure Order (Entry #3 in 5:18-md-2809) attorney should have filed each of the documents identified above in the master case and spread text to each related member case; Entries by Attorney; Correction: Clerk has added counsel of record referenced in the Notices to the master case. No further action required by counsel as to this error. cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00298-KKC, 5:18-cv-00300-KKC, 5:18-cv-00303-KKC(CBD)
February 6, 2019 Filing 211 NOTICE by Olivier Herbert Withdrawal of Counsel Timothy Young (Young, Timothy)
February 6, 2019 Filing 210 NOTICE by Richard Garry Withdrawal of Counsel Timothy Young (Young, Timothy)
February 6, 2019 Filing 209 NOTICE by Gilbert Corbello Withdrawal of Counsel Timothy Young (Young, Timothy)
February 6, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation filed as ( #207 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC and #78 in 5:18-cv-00117-KKC) Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00117-KKC(CBD)
February 4, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Show Cause Response due by 2/26/2019 re #208 . (CBD)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER: The Joint Motions for Entry of Stipulated Cases Management Orders (DE #169 , #183 in 5:18-2809) were filed by the plaintiffs and only the following defendants:AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP,Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, andMcKesson Corporation. Certain actions in this MDL name defendants other than these three defendants. Accordingly, the Court hereby ORDERS that, within 21 days of the entry date of this order, Plaintiffs Co-lead Counsel MUST FILE a response to this order SHOWING CAUSE why the claims against any defendants other than the three defendants named above should not be dismissed from any action currently pending in this MDL and from any action subsequently made a part of this MDL. In addition, the Master Complaint asserts that Plaintiffs have suffered injuries including,but not limited to, "heart failure, congestive heart failure, cardiac failure, death fromheart failure, and other serious health conditions as set forth in the individual Short FormComplaints, Plaintiff Profile Forms, Plaintiff Fact Sheets or any other responsive discoveryadduced in the respective constituent actions." (DE #185 , Master Complaint 5.) Accordingly, the Court hereby ORDERS that, within 21 days of the entry date of thisorder, Plaintiffs' Co-lead Counsel MUST FILE a Notice Regarding Injuries Allegedclarifying whether any plaintiff in this MDL alleges injuries other than heart failure includingwrongful death resulting from heart failure.. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 2/4/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR
February 4, 2019 Filing 207 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice by Cleotha Silvers. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00117-KKC(Kassan, Randi) Modified type on 2/6/2019 (CBD).
January 29, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Fact Discovery re General Causation ddl 7/9/2019. (CBD)
January 29, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Daubert Motions due by 10/28/2019. (CBD)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 206 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 3 REGARDING GENERAL CAUSATION DISCOVERY AND DAUBERT MOTIONS: Having conducted a status conference in this matter on December 18, 2018, and having further considered the Joint Discovery Plan ( #202 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al) submitted by the parties, the Court hereby ORDERS as follows: 1. Counter-claims, Cross-Claims, and Third-Party Complaints ddl 2/1/19. 2. Motions in Individual Cases pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12 shall be stayed until after the completion of the first phase of discovery on the issue of general causation. Discovery Procedures see items 3- 6 of this Order. Coordination with State Court Proceedings see items 7- 9 of this Order. 10. Fact discovery on the issue of general causation may commence upon the entry of this Order. 11. Fact discovery relating to issues of general causation ddl 7/9/19. 12. Plaintiffs shall serve expert reports re general causation by 7/25/19. 13. Defendants shall serve expert reports re general causation by August 8, 2019. 14. Plaintiffs shall serve rebuttal expert reports by 8/26/19. 15. Depositions of expert witnesses re general causation ddl 9/27/19. 16. Daubert motions challenging expert witness testimony on the issue of general causation ddl 10/28/19. Oppositions to such motions shall be due on 12/4/19. Any replies shall be due on 12/20/19. 17. Hearings on any Daubert motions have been scheduled for January 21-23, 2020.. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 1/29/19. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR Modified text on 1/29/2019 (CBD).
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER: Plaintiffs' motion to approve the proposed short form complaint (SFC) (DE #193 in 5:18-MD-2809, et al) is GRANTED. The Court further ORDERS as follows: 1) In accordance with the motion (DE 193) for approval of the SFC and the Stipulated Order Regarding Direct Filing (DE #174 in 5:18-MD-2809, et al), plaintiffs who file their case directly in this MDL must do so by filing the SFC as the initiating pleading. No other plaintiffs are required to file the SFC; and 2) By filing the SFC, a plaintiff adopts all the allegations and claims in the Master Complaint but asserts only the claims indicated on the SFC against only the defendants indicated on the SFC and alleges only the injuries indicated on the SFC. granting (193) Motion for Order in case 5:18-md-02809-KKC. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 1/29/19. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR
January 29, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Williams v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-26 KKC pursuant to #174 Stipulated Order re Direct Filing cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
January 29, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Clanton v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al directly opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-25 pursuant to #174 Stipulated Order re Direct Filing. cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
January 28, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Sherill v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al opened as a Direct Filed Case in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:19-cv-23 KKC pursuant to Stipulated Order re Direct Filing #174 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
January 25, 2019 Filing 204 NOTICE of Change of Address by David L. Friend Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00571-KKC, 5:18-cv-00572-KKC, 5:18-cv-00576-KKC, 5:18-cv-00578-KKC(Friend, David)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER: the Show Cause Order (DE 196 in 5:18-md-2809, et al)entered December 26, 2018, is hereby DISCHARGED. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 1/16/2019.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR
January 15, 2019 Filing 202 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Regarding Joint Discovery Plan by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Ullman, Emily)
January 15, 2019 Filing 201 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company and McKesson Corporation, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, . Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Browning, Carol) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (CBD).
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 197 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2 Regarding Plaintiff Profile Forms, Plaintiff Fact Sheets, and Defendant Fact Sheets: JOINT MOTION (DE #183 in 5:18-md-02809- KKC, et al) is GRANTED. I. PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM This Case Management Order governs the production of Plaintiff Profile Forms (PPF) for all cases now included in MDL No. 2809 and any cases subsequently added to MDL No. 2809. For all cases included in MDL No. 2809 or any case added to MDL No. 2809 on or before January 15, 2019, the completed PPF and accompanying materials, including executed authorizations and required documents and things, are due by March 1, 2019. For any case added to MDL No. 2809 after January 15, 2019, the PPF and accompanying materials are due within seventy-five (75) days of the date the case is added to MDL No. 2809. Responses to the PPF shall be treated as answers to interrogatories under FRCP 33 and requests for the production of documents under FRCP 34 and shall be supplemented in accordance with FRCP 26. II. PRODUCTION OF RECORDS SHOWING USE AND INJURY Each plaintiff alleges that use of Onglyza or Kombiglyze XR (collectively, Onglyza) caused him or her to develop heart failure (or aggravation or worsening of heart failure) or caused his or her decedent to develop heart failure (or aggravation or worsening of heart failure). As part of his or her PPF, a plaintiff must produce documentation that shows: (1) use of Onglyza; and (2) subsequent heart failure or aggravation or worsening of heart failure. III. DEFICIENCY NOTICE AND ENFORCEMENT PROCEDURES The following procedures shall apply to failure to comply with the PPF requirements, including by failing to provide a response entirely or failing to produce documents showing use and injury (see Order). IV. PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET AND DEFENDANT FACT SHEET. The parties shall negotiate a Plaintiff Fact Sheet and a Defendant Fact Sheet. During the period in which the Court is evaluating Daubert motions regarding expert witness testimony on the issue of general causation, the parties shall file the proposed PFS, the proposed DFS, and an accompanying proposed Case Management Order which will contemplate the submission of completed PFS and DFS shortly thereafter. During this time period the parties plan to reach consensus on a pool of cases that will be required to submit PFS and DFS.. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 1/9/2019. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR
December 26, 2018 Set/Reset Deadline: Show Cause Response due by 1/11/2019. (CBD)
December 26, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judeg Caldwell for review: re #193 CONSENT MOTION for Order by David Taylor, Leatha Taylor Approving Plaintiffs' Proposed Short Form Complaint (CBD)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: the above counsel (Dylan James Hooper) SHALL SHOW CAUSE in a writing filed by no later than January 11, 2019 as to why the Court should not impose sanctions on him or her, including suspension of the right to practice in the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky, for failure to comply with the Court's order. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 12/26/2018.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR
December 26, 2018 Party McKesson Corporation added per Master Complaint ( #185 in 5:18-md-2809, et al). Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)
December 20, 2018 Attorney Update. Attorney Chelsea R. Kurth for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Chelsea R. Kurth for Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Chelsea R. Kurth for McKesson Corporation. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00063-KKC, 5:18-cv-00074-KKC, 5:18-cv-00109-KKC(CBD)
December 20, 2018 Filing 195 NOTICE by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., McKesson Corporation of Withdrawal of Counsel (Corrected) Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00063-KKC, 5:18-cv-00074-KKC, 5:18-cv-00109-KKC(Kurth, Chelsea)
December 20, 2018 Filing 194 NOTICE by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., McKesson Corporation of Withdrawal of Counsel Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00063-KKC, 5:18-cv-00074-KKC, 5:18-cv-00109-KKC(Kurth, Chelsea)
December 19, 2018 Filing 200 MASTER ANSWER to MASTER COMPLAINT ( #185 in 5:18-md-2809, ET AL) with Jury Demand by McKesson Corporation. Filed per QC re #192 in 5:18-md-2809, ET AL) Associated Cases: ALL (CBD)
December 19, 2018 Filing 199 MASTER ANSWER to MASTER COMPLAINT ( #185 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, ET AL) with Jury Demand by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Filed per QC re #191 in 2:18-md-2809, ET AL ALL Associated Cases. (CBD)
December 19, 2018 Filing 198 MASTER ANSWER to MASTER COMPLAINT ( #185 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, ET AL) with Jury Demand by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. Filed per QC re #190 in 5:18-md-2809, ET AL Associated Cases: ALL (CBD)
December 19, 2018 Filing 193 CONSENT MOTION for Order by David Taylor, Leatha Taylor Approving Plaintiffs' Proposed Short Form Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Short Form Complaint)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Moore, Jennifer)
December 19, 2018 Filing 192 INCORRECTLY FILED - ANSWER to (185 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) Complaint, with Jury Demand by McKesson Corporation. Associated Cases: ALL (Browning, Carol) See DE #200 in 18-md-2809, ET AL for CORRECTED entry of this pleading. Modified text on 1/10/2019 (CBD).
December 19, 2018 Filing 191 INCORRECTLY FILED - ANSWER to (185 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) Complaint, with Jury Demand by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Filed in ALL Associated Cases (Browning, Carol) See DE #199 in 18-md-2809, ET AL for CORRECTED entry of this pleading Modified text on 1/9/2019 (CBD).
December 19, 2018 Filing 190 INCORRECTLY FILED - ANSWER to (185 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) Complaint, with Jury Demand by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. Associated Cases: ALL (Browning, Carol) See DE #198 in 18-md-2809, ET AL for CORRECTED entry of this pleading Modified text on 1/10/2019 (CBD).
December 18, 2018 Filing 189 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 12/18/2018. before Judge Karen K. Caldwell: 1. The Court will set aside January 21, 22 and 23, 2020, for Daubert Hearings in this matter. 2. The e-mail summary requirement as set forth in the Initial Submissions section of the Order regarding Practice and Procedure upon Transfer entered February 9, 2018, is suspended. (Court Reporter Linda Mullen.) Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al. (CBD)cc: COR
December 17, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Moton v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00648-KKC pursuant to #174 Stipulated Order re Direct Filing cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
December 17, 2018 Filing 188 NOTICE OF FILING Proposed Joint Agenda for Status Conference on December 18, 2018 by all parties. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Browning, Carol) Modified text on 12/19/2018 (CBD).
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER REGARDING MANDATORY CM/ECF REGISTRATION FOR COUNSEL OF RECORD: The following attorneys (Dylan James Hooper and Eric Holland), who have failed to register with the CM-ECF system as required, SHALL RETURN to the Court an Electronic Filing Attorney Registration Form within 14 days from the entry date of this order. Failure to do so may result in sanctions being imposed by the Court, including termination of the right to practice before this Court. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 12/6/2018.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR w/ copy of MDL 2809 ECF Ref. Form to Dylan J. Hooper and Eric Holland
December 3, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Abshire v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. opened as a Direct Filed Case in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-635-KKC pursuant to #174 Stipulated Order re Direct Filing. cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
November 30, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern, 1:18-cv-09406, Nicholas v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-634 KKC pursuant to #186 Conditional Transfer Order 22 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
November 28, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: re MOTION for Entry of Case Management Order Establishing Standards & Procedures for Counsel Seeking Reimbursement for Common Benefit Fees & Costs (180 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, et al) Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(TDA)
November 28, 2018 Filing 186 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. 22 from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Records requested from the transferor court(s) via email. cc: COR (CBD)
November 21, 2018 Parties terminated per #185 : AstraZeneca LP (and) IPR Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)
November 21, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: re #183 JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Plaintiffs and Defendants Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, and McKesson Corporation (CBD)
November 19, 2018 Filing 185 MASTER COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND, filed by Plaintiffs David Taylor, et al against Defendants Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, and McKesson Corporation. Filed per QC re #184 in 5:18-md-2809, et alAssociated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)
November 19, 2018 Filing 184 AMENDED DOCUMENT by David Taylor, Leatha Taylor. Plaintiffs' Master Complaint and Jury Demand. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Moore, Jennifer)See DE ( #185 in 5:18-md-2809) for CORRECTED entry of this pleading Modified on 11/21/2018 (CBD).
November 19, 2018 Filing 183 JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Plaintiffs, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, and McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Proposed Stipulated CMO, #2 Exhibit 2- Plaintiff Profile Form and Authorization)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Moore, Jennifer) Modified text on 11/20/2018 (CBD).
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER SUBSITUTING PARTY: Motion (DE #181 in 5:18-md-2809, #44 in 5:18-cv-151) is GRANTED. The Court further ORDERS that Plaintiff Bobby Taylor is removed from this matter, and in his place Colleen Taylor, Administratrix of the Estate of Bobby Taylor, is substituted. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 11/16/2018. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00151-KKC(CBD)cc: COR
November 13, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: MOTION to Substitute Deceased Party by Bobby L. Taylor (181 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 44 in 5:18-cv-00151-KKC). Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00151-KKC(CBD)
November 7, 2018 Filing 181 MOTION to Substitute Party by Bobby L. Taylor (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate, #2 Exhibit Probate Order, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Substitute Parties)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00151-KKC(McCarty, Sean)
November 6, 2018 Filing 180 MOTION for Entry by David Taylor of Case Management Order Establishing Standards & Procedures for Counsel Seeking Reimbursement for Common Benefit Fees & Costs (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 PO Exhibit A, #3 PO Exhibit B, #4 PO Exhibit C) Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Moore, Jennifer) Modified text on 11/9/2018 (TDA).
November 5, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Singletary v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. opened as a Direct Filed Case in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-598-KKC pursuant to #174 Stipulated Order re Direct Filing. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
November 5, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Harris v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. opened as a Direct Filed Case in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-596 KKC pursuant to #174 Stipulated Order re Direct Filing. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
November 1, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Sean McCarty re (42 in 5:18-cv-00151-KKC) Notice of Appearance, (73 in 5:18-cv-00053-KKC) Notice of Appearance. Error: Documents were filed in the member cases only. Pursuant to the court's Practice & Procedure Order (Entry #3 in 5:18-md-2809) attorney should have filed each of the documents identified above in the master case and spread text to each related member case; Entries by Attorney; Correction: Clerk has added counsel of record referenced in the Notices to the master case. No further action required by counsel as to this error cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00053-KKC, 5:18-cv-00151-KKC(CBD)
October 31, 2018 Attorney Update. Attorney Sean A. McCarty for Bobby L. Taylor, Sean A. McCarty for David Taylor, Sean A. McCarty for Leatha Taylor, added per QC re (DE 73 in 5:18-cv-53 KKC and DE 42 in 5:18-cv-151 KKC). (CBD)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 179 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 REGARDING MASTER PLEADINGS AND PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN FOR PHASE ONE: GENERAL CAUSATION: plaintiffs' proposal (DE #168 in 5:18-md-2809, et al) to conduct concurrent discovery on all issues is DENIED. The Court further ORDERS as follows: 1. Both parties having proposed the filing of a Master Complaint, the Court hereby ORDERS that, on or before November 19, 2018, Plaintiffs must file a Master Complaint. 2. The Master Complaint may not be amended absent leave of the Court. 3. The Master Complaint will be the operative complaint in every individual action for the duration of these pretrial proceedings except that Defendants may respond to any individual complaint by way of motions permissible under Rule 12 of the FRCP. 4. If the parties wish to utilize Plaintiff Fact Sheets, authorization forms, and/or Defendant Fact Sheets, they must file proposed facts sheets and authorization forms and an accompanying motion for approval on or before November 19, 2018. If the parties are unable to agree on such fact sheets and forms, they may file separate proposals. Any objections to the motion for approval must be filed within 14 days of the date the motion for approval is filed. 5. On or before December 19, 2018, Defendants must file a Master Answer ("Master Answer") responding to the allegations of the Master Complaint. 6. Defendants will be deemed to have answered all cases pending in, filed in, or subsequently transferred to the MDL proceedings upon the filing of the Master Answer. The Master Answer will be deemed to deny any allegations contained in individual complaints that are not contained in the Master Complaint. 7. After the filing of the Master Answer, cases may only be voluntarily dismissed by order of the Court pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2) or a stipulation pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(ii), except that a Complaint filed directly in the MDL may be voluntarily dismissed upon notice by Plaintiff within ten (10) days of the filing of the Complaint. 8. Neither the filing of the Master Answer, nor the filing of a Notice of Appearance, nor CM/ECF registration, nor the appearance of any party or counsel at a status conference constitutes a waiver of any defense including lack of personal jurisdiction, objections to service, jurisdiction or venue, and any defenses to any state law claims. 9. The plaintiffs may not file a reply to the Master Answer. 10. Both parties having proposed the use of a Short Form Complaint, no later than December 19, 2018, Plaintiffs counsel must file a proposed Short Form Complaint and accompanying motion for approval stating the Short Form Complaint's proposed purpose and effect. Any objections to the motion for approval must be filed within 14 days of the date the motion for approval is filed. 11. On or before January 15, 2019, the parties must file a proposed plan. 12. In any action that is (a) filed in or transferred to this Court after this Order is entered and (b) consolidated with this action for pretrial purposes, the Clerk need not separately file the Case Management Orders already entered in these MDL proceedings. However, the Clerk must include a statement in the initial notice to counsel that the Order Regarding Practice and Procedure Upon Transfer, this Case Management Order, and all subsequent Case Management Orders govern all cases in the MDL proceedings. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 10/24/2018. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR Modified text on 10/24/2018 (CBD).
October 12, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Eastern District of Texas, 6:18-cv-463, Rundell v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-579 pursuant to #177 Conditional Transfer Order 21 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
October 12, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Eastern District of Pennsylvania, 2:18-cv-03730, Brown v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-578-KKC pursuant to #177 Conditional Transfer Order 21. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
October 12, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Eastern District of Pennsylvania, 2:18-cv-03729, Serpa v. Bristol-Meyers Squibb Co., Inc. et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-576-KKC pursuant to #177 Conditional Transfer Order 21. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
October 11, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: New Jersey, 3:18-cv-13904, Mounteer v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00570-KKC pursuant to #177 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 21 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
October 11, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Eastern District of Pennsylvania, 2:18-cv-03732, Sturgell v. Bristol-Meyers Squibb Co., Inc. et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-572-KKC pursuant to #177 Conditional Transfer Order 21. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
October 11, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: re MOTION Adopt Plaintiffs' Proposed Scheduling Order ( #168 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, et al) ; RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION ( #175 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, et al); REPLY ( #178 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, et al) Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC - ALL CASES.(CBD)
October 11, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Eastern District of Pennsylvania, 2:18-cv-03731, Hampton v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-571-KKC pursuant to #177 Conditional Transfer Order 21. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
October 11, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Jennifer Moore re (178 in 5:18-md-02809, et al) REPLY BRIEF. Error: a link was created to the Motion in one member case only. Entry by attorney; Clerk modified the entry to create a link to the Motion (R. #168 in 5:18-md-2809, et al), thereby placing the reply on the Judge's motion report. In the future, create a link to the subject motion in the Master Case. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)
October 11, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Emily Ullman re (175 in 5:18-md-02809, et al) Response in Opposition to Motion. Error: a link was not created to the Motion (R. #168 in 5:18-md-2809, et al). Entry by attorney; Clerk modified the entry to create a link to the Motion, thereby placing the response on the Judge's motion report. In the future, create a link to the subject motion in the Master Case. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)
October 10, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: New Jersey, 3:18-cv-13461, Vasquez et al v. AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00569-KKC pursuant to #177 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 21 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
October 10, 2018 Filing 178 REPLY BRIEF to (DE #168 in 5:18-md-2809, et al) filed by David Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Xarelto PTO 27)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Moore, Jennifer) Modified link on 10/11/2018 (CBD).
October 10, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: New Jersey, 3:18-cv-09273, Young v. Bristol-Meyers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00568-KKC pursuant to #177 Conditional Transfer Order 21 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
October 10, 2018 Filing 177 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. 21 from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Records requested from the transferor court(s) via email. cc: COR (CBD)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER: Motion (DE #165 in 5:18-md-2809, et al) is GRANTED and Rebecca L. Phillips of The Lanier Law Firm is substituted in place of Jerome Prather as a member of the Plaintiffs' Steering Committee. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 10/9/2018. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR
October 5, 2018 Filing 175 RESPONSE in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Proposed Schedule (DE #168 in 5:18-md-2809, et al) filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Emily S. Ullman, #2 Exhibit A - Pls' JPML Motion, #3 Exhibit B - Pls' JPML Memorandum, #4 Exhibit C - Sept 7 CMC Transcript, #5 Exhibit D - Interested Parties' JPML Response, #6 Exhibit E - Zofran Scheduling Order, #7 Exhibit F - Vallejo v. Amgen Scheduling Order, #8 Exhibit G - Incretin Discovery Order, #9 Exhibit H - Filion (2016), #10 Exhibit I - Scirica (2014), #11 Exhibit J - Onglyza Prescribing information, #12 Exhibit K - Roundup Daubert Order, #13 Exhibit L - Roundup Scheduling Letter, #14 Exhibit M - JCCP CMO 3, #15 Exhibit N - JCCP CMO 4, #16 Exhibit O - JCCP CMC Transcript, #17 Exhibit P - Ethicon Plaintiff Form)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Ullman, Emily) Modified link on 10/11/2018 (CBD).
October 5, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Becoat v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. opened as a Direct Filed Case in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-562 KKC pursuant to #174 Stipulated Order re Direct Filing. cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
October 3, 2018 Clerk's Note: Stipulated Order Regarding Direct Filing and Service of Complaints #174 regenerated to JPML Clerk. (CBD)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 174 STIPULATED ORDER REGARDING DIRECT FILING AND SERVICE OF COMPLAINTS: I. Direct Filing A. To promote judicial efficiency and to avoid delays associated with the transfer of cases filed in or removed from other federal district courts to this Court as part of MDL No. 2809, any plaintiff whose case would be subject to transfer to MDL No. 2809 may file her or his case directly in MDL No. 2809 in the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky. B. Cases directly filed in this Court pursuant to this Order shall not name more than a single plaintiff in each directly filed case C. Defendants stipulate and agree not to challenge venue for pretrial proceedings for any directly filed case properly filed pursuant to this Order. D. Filing a case directly in MDL No. 2809 will not determine the choice of law, including the statute of limitations; however, Defendants stipulate and agree that the filing of a complaint directly in MDL No. 2809 pursuant to this Order shall stop the running of any statute of limitations or prescriptive period, including statute of repose, as if the complaint had been filed in the district where it could otherwise have been brought absent this Order. E. The direct filing of actions in MDL No. 2809 is solely for the purposes of consolidated discovery and related pretrial proceedings as provided by 28 U.S.C. 1407 and pursuant to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigations February 2, 2018 Transfer Order ("Transfer Order"). F. Nothing in this Order shall be construed as a waiver of any Defendants right to move to remand any case directly filed in MDL No. 2809 or to move to dismiss any or all causes of action in any directly filed complaint. G. The caption for all direct filed complaints shall bear the same caption as instructed by this Courts February 9, 2018 Order Regarding Practice and Procedure Upon Transfer. (DE 3 in 5:18-md-2809.) H. All complaints must be filed electronically. Attorneys must register for and obtain an Eastern District of Kentucky MDL 2809 CM/ECF login name and password prior to filing. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at #www.kyed.uscourts.gov/518-md-02809-kkc. All instructions contained within this Courts February 9, 2018 Order Regarding Practice and Procedure Upon Transfer govern the electronic filing process, including the Local Rules for the Eastern District of Kentucky, available at http://www.kyed.uscourts.gov/?q=local-rules. The requirements of Local Rules 83.1 and 83.2 regarding permission to practice and pro hac vice admission are waived as to any attorney appearing in these actions who is admitted to practice and in good standing in any United States District Court. II. Service of Directly-Filed Complaints (see Order for Items A-G). Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 10/3/2018.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR Modified text on 2/5/2019 (CBD).
October 2, 2018 Attorney Update. Attorney Jennifer A. Moore, Timothy Michael Clark, Laraclay Drake Parker added for Plaintiffs per Order #162 . (CBD)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 STIPULATED ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURES FOR ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION: Plaintiffs and Defendants, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, and McKesson Corporation ("Defendants"), by counsel, have stipulated and agreed to entry of the following Order Regarding Procedures for Electronically Stored Information ("ESI") in this case. Good cause appearing therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that an ESI order shall be entered in this case, with the following terms, conditions, and requirements. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 10/2/2018.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 172 STIPULATED ORDER REGARDING PRIVILEGE CLAIMS AND LOGS: The Parties have agreed to the following protocol (see Order) governing the assertion of attorney-client privilege and work product doctrine in connection with their production of documents responsive to discovery propounded in this litigation. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 10/2/2018.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 171 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER ( #169 in 19-md-2809, et al) re Confidential Discovery Documents: Plaintiffs and Defendants, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, and McKesson Corporation ("Defendants"), by counsel, have stipulated and agreed to entry of the following Protective Order in this case. This order implements procedures to establish coordinated discovery procedures between cases before this Court and the California state court cases coordinated in the Complex Proceeding Onglyza Product Cases, JCCP No. 4909. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 10/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Endorsement of Protective Order)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR
October 2, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Missouri Western, 5:18-cv-06140, Wilson v. Bristol Myers Squibb Co., Inc., et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00554-KKC pursuant to #170 Conditional Transfer Order 20 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
October 1, 2018 Filing 170 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. 20 from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Records requested from the transferor court(s) via email. cc: COR (CBD)
October 1, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: re JOINT MOTION For Entry Of Stipulated Case Management Orders (169 in 5:18-md-02809- KKC, et al) Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)
September 28, 2018 Filing 169 JOINT MOTION For Entry Of Stipulated Case Management Orders by Plaintiffs' David Taylor, et al (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Protective Order, #2 Exhibit 2-Direct Filing and Service, #3 Exhibit 3-Claims of Privilege and Privilege Logs, #4 Exhibit 4-ESI)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Moore, Jennifer) Modified on 10/1/2018 (CBD).
September 21, 2018 Filing 168 MOTION to Adopt Plaintiffs' Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs' David Taylor, et al (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Plaintiffs' Proposed Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit B-Transcript of Bifurcation of Discovery Discussion in Zofran, #3 Exhibit C-Transcript of TRT MDL Status Conference, #4 Exhibit D-Collection of Court Orders, #5 Exhibit E-sNDA Approval Letter)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Moore, Jennifer) Modified text on 9/24/2018 (CBD).
September 19, 2018 Filing 167 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/7/2018 before Judge Caldwell. Court Reporter: Linda Mullen, Telephone number (859) 469-7459. Transcript ordered by: CAROL BROWNING. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: In order to remove personal identifier data from the transcript, a party must follow the Court's policy regarding the Redaction Responsibility of Counsel and Parties. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov. #Read this policy carefully. Sample forms, i.e., a Notice of Intent to Redact, may be found on the court website by clicking on #Local Forms. If there are no redactions requested, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available via PACER 90 days from today's date. The Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Redaction Request due 10/15/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/25/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/21/2018. Modified on 9/24/2018 (CBD).
September 13, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: MOTION to Substitute Attorney Rebecca L. Phillips in place of Jerome Prather by David Taylor (filed as #165 in 5:18-md-2809, et al) Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)
September 12, 2018 Filing 166 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., McKesson Corporation for proceedings held on 09/17/18 before Judge Hon. Karen K. Caldwell.. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Browning, Carol)
September 12, 2018 Filing 165 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Rebecca L. Phillips in place of Jerome Prather by Plaintiffs' David Taylor, et al (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Phillips biography, #2 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Moore, Jennifer) Modified text on 9/13/2018 (CBD).
September 7, 2018 Set Deadlines (CBD)
September 7, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE set for 9/17/2019 at 03:00 PM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell. TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE set for 12/17/2019 at 03:00 PM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell. (CBD)
September 7, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE set for 3/19/2019 at 03:00 PM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell. TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE set for 6/18/2019 at 03:00 PM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell. (CBD)
September 7, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE set for 12/18/2018 at 03:00 PM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell. (CBD)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 164 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER: 1) Within 14 days of the entry date of this order, plaintiffs' co-lead counsel must submit a brief regarding the defendants' proposal to conduct discovery in two phases, with the first phase dedicated to general causation. Defendants may file a response within 14 days of service of the plaintiffs brief and plaintiffs may file a reply within 5 days of service of the response brief. All briefs are limited to 12 pages. 2) This matter is set for quarterly status conferences on the following dates at 3:00 p.m. ET: December 18, 2018, March 19, 2019, June 18, 2019, September 17, 2019, December 17, 2019. Unless the Court orders otherwise, these conferences will be conducted telephonically. Counsel shall access the call by (See Order). Either party may move the Court to order that a quarterly status conference be conducted in person. In addition, either party may move the Court to cancel or postpone a scheduled quarterly status conference or to conduct an additional conference. 3) The parties must file monthly joint status reports by the 15th (or first business day thereafter) of every month beginning the month of January 2019. If the parties are unable to develop a joint report, they may file separate reports. 4) Within 60 days from the entry date of this order, plaintiffs' co- lead counsel must submit a proposed order governing the payment of attorney's fees and expenses for plaintiffs' counsel. 5) Within 21 days of the entry date of this order, the parties must submit a proposed agreed protective order and agreed orders governing privileged documents, electronically stored information, direct filing, and waiver of service. If the parties are unable to agree on the proposed orders, they may submit separate orders. 6) All pending motions to dismiss in all cases are DENIED as moot, the parties having agreed that a master complaint will be filed in this matter in accordance with a subsequent scheduling order. 7) The contact in the undersigned's chambers for this matter is: Candace Clay 8) The contact in the Clerk of the Court's office for this matter is: Christy Dearborn . Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/7/2018.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR w/ 2809 ECF Reg. Form to non-registered counsel, Lex D. Modified text on 9/7/2018 (CBD).
September 7, 2018 Filing 163 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/7/2018 before Judge Karen K. Caldwell: The parties appeared for status conference as noted. A separate order shall be issued. Signed by Karen K. Caldwell. (Court Reporter: Linda Mullen) Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al. (CBD)cc: COR, 2809 ECF Reg. Form to in-registered counsel. Modified cc on 9/7/2018 (CBD).
September 6, 2018 Attorney Update. Attorney Timothy Michael Clark for plaintiffs added. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER APPOINTING PLAINITFFS' LEADERSHIP STRUCTURE: The Court hereby ORDERS that the unopposed motion (DE #160 , 5: 18-md-2809, et al.) for appointment to the following leadership positions ("Designated Counsel") is GRANTED as follows: The Designated Counsel are appointed to the following positions for the duration of the litigation or until such time as the Court determines that a change in the duration of service shall be made. The Court may decide from time-to-time to modify these appointments, depending upon the needs of the litigation. (A.) Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel The Court appoints the following counsel as plaintiffs' co-lead counsel: Timothy Clark of SANDERS PHILLIPS GROSSMAN, LLC and Jennifer A. Moore of GROSSMAN & MOORE, PLLC. Defendants' counsel may rely upon all agreements made with Plaintiffs' co-lead counsel and such agreements shall be binding on all Plaintiffs whose eases arc subject to the Court's jurisdiction. (For Duties of Plaintiffs' Co- Lead Counsel - See Order) (B.) Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel Laraclay Drake Parker of GOLDEN LAW OFFICE. (For Duties of Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel - See Order) (C.) Plaintiffs' Executive Committee In addition to Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel, the Plaintiffs' Executive Committee shall consist of: Daniel C. Burke of BERNSTEIN LIEBHARD, LLP, Fred Olinde of The Olinde Firm and Tim Porter of Porter Malouf. Plaintiffs' Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel regarding management of the litigation, mcluding assisting in organizing subcommittees and delegating tasks to subcommittees. Plaintiffs' Executive Committee will also assist in scheduling meetings for Plaintiffs' counsel, keeping minutes and/or records of Plaintiffs' counsel meetings, and any other administrative functions as necessary. (D.) Plaintiffs' Federal-State Court Liaison Counsel: Erin Copeland of FIBICH, LEEBRON, COPELAND & BRIGGS. (For Duties of Plaintiffs' Federal- State Court Liaison Counsel - See Order) (E.) Plaintiffs' Steering Committee: Raymond Boucher Boucher LLP, Frank M. Petosa MORGAN & MORGAN, Erin Copeland FIBICH, LEEBRON, COPELAND & BRIGGS, Jerome P. Prather GARMER & PRATHER, Yvonne M. Flaherty LOCKRIDGE GRINDAL NAUEN PLLP, Steven Tcppler ABBOTT LAW GROUP, Jennifer Lenze LENZE LAWYERS, Matthew L. White GRAY & WHITELAW, Kim Loutey KENNERLY LOCTEY. (F.) Privileged Communications Cooperation among counsel and the parties is essential for the orderly and expeditious resolution of the litigation. The communication, transmission, or dissemination of information among plaintiffs' counsel shall be subject to the joint attorney-client privilege and the protections afforded by the attorney work-product doctrine; provided, however, that the conditions necessary to create such a privilege or protection have been satisfied and the privilege or protection has not been waived. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/6/2018. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR
August 29, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Eastern District of Kentucky, 5:18-cv-510, Sexton v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al CONSOLIDATED pursuant to Consolidation Order #161 . cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 161 CONSOLIDATION ORDER: this action (5:18-cv-510 KKC) is consolidated with multi-district litigation transferred to the Court's Central Division at Lexington and captioned, In Re: Onglyza (Saxagliptin) and Kombiglyze XR (Saxagliptin and Metformin) Products Liability Litigation, Master File No. 5:18-md-2809-KKC (MDL Docket No. 2809), for purposes of discovery and other pre-trial proceedings pursuant to Rule 42 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The parties attention is directed to the Order Regarding Practice and Procedure (DE #3 in 5:18-md-2809) previously entered in the master file of the consolidated action. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 8/29/2018.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00510-KKC(CBD)cc: COR
August 27, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO J. Moore re #159 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Appointment of Designated Counsel by Jerald Adams, et al. Error 1: Attorney filed the document in the master case only. Pursuant to the Court's Practice & Procedure Order (Entry #3 in 5:18-md-2809) attorney should have filed the document in the master case and spread text to each related individual member case; Entry by Attorney; Correction: Clerk has re- filed the document in the master and spread to all related member cases. No further action required by counsel as to this error. Error 2: attachments were insufficiently described as "Exhibit A," "Exhibit B." Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachments. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel. Error 3: Exhibit uploaded as Exhibit E was incorrectly labeled on the pdf image; Error by attorney; Clerk verified that while the Exhibit E is incorrectly labeled Exhibit F on the pdf image it contains the the Biography of Mr. Olinde referred to in the Memorandum in Support as Exhibit E and noted same in the re-filed entry. (cc: COR) (CBD)
August 24, 2018 Filing 160 MOTION of Plaintiffs for Appointment of Designated Counsel by Jerald Adams, et al (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Biography of Timothy Clark, #2 Exhibit B Biography of Jennifer A. Moore, #3 Exhibit C Biography of Laraclay Parker, #4 Exhibit D Biography of Daniel C. Burke, #5 Exhibit E Biography of Fred Olinde, #6 Exhibit F Biography of Timothy Porter, #7 Exhibit G Biography of Raymond P. Boucher, #8 Exhibit H Biography of Erin Copeland, #9 Exhibit I - Biography of Yvonne M. Flaherty, #10 Exhibit J Biography of Jennifer Lenze, #11 Exhibit K Biography of Kim Loutey, #12 Exhibit L Biography of Frank M. Petosa, #13 Exhibit M Biography of Jay Prather, #14 Exhibit N Biography of Steven W. Teppler, #15 Exhibit O Biography of Matthew L. White, #16 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al. Filed per QC re DE [159 in 5:18-md-2809] NOTE: Clerk verified that while the Exhibit E is incorrectly labeled Exhibit F on the pdf image it contains the the Biography of Mr. Olinde referred to in the Memorandum in Support as Exhibit E.(CBD) Filed per QC re [DE 159 in 5:18-md-2809]. Modified on 8/29/2018 (CBD). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/6/2018: #17 Memorandum in Support) (CBD).
August 24, 2018 Filing 159 INCORRECTLY FILED - MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Appointment of Designated Counsel by Jerald Adams, Billy Alexander, John H. Anderson, Jr, Edwin Asencio, Allen Atkins, Sr., Shelia Austin, Diane Bakalyar, Francoisce Baker, Minnie Banks(5:18-cv-304 - on behalf of all wrongful death beneficiaries and as personal representative of the estate of the ), Minnie Banks(5:18-cv-304 - Individually), Wilma Barner, Kathy Barnes, Ruben Barrientes, Harvey Beeler, Susan Berry, Eddie Billington, Earl Binns, Susan Birk, Robert Bivins, Margie Black, Neva Boller, Teresa Booth (5:18-cv-235 - as Personal Representative of the ), Teresa Booth (5:18-cv-235 - Individually ), Jerry Brittain, Bobbie Brown, Jeffrey L. Brown(5:18-cv-390-Individually), Jeffrey L. Brown(5:18-cv-390-as Surviving Spouse), James Butler, David Caldwell, Cheryll Campbell, Tony Campbell, Charles Cannon, Donald Carpenter, Jr, Jennifer Carter, Nicky Carter, Roy Carter, Michael Caston, Wilda Chamberlain, Martha Chapman, Wrendell Chester, Sheryle Christensen, John Clark(5:18-cv-241-as Personal Representative of), John Clark(5:18-cv-241-Individually), Gilbert Corbello, Clarence Couisan, Donielle Cousins, Debbie Crear, Robert Curtis, Rosa Davila, Billy Davis, Mark Davis, Sr, Linda Day, Mary Delaney, Belinda Didericksen, William Dinger Sr., Wayne Driver, Helen Dunn, Roberta Dunn, Allen Ellis, Jay Epps, Robert Ervin, Bailey Erwin, Donnie Vernon Farrell, Donald Forgione, Deanna Fouse, Teresa Ann Freeman, Milagros Ganzalez-McAllister(5:18-cv-240 - Individually), Milagros Ganzalez-McAllister(5:18-cv-240 - as Personal Representative ), Walter Garcia, Lawana Garrette, Richard Garry, Milton George, Jay Gintz, Margie Goforth, Ray Gomez, Juan Gonzalez, Oswald Gooch, Harry Gordon, Audrey Gore(5:18-cv-56 - Individually), Audrey Gore(5:18-cv-56 - as Administrator of the), Susan Gosner, Ethel Green, H.B. Green, Harry Grimes, Carolyn Haley, Raymond Hardin, Angela Hardy, Barbara Harrell, Willie Harris, Sabir Hasan, Michael Havice, Alphonso Hayes, Donald Helire, Olivier Herbert, William Hightower, Christopher Hocker, Anita Rochelle Holland, Mattie Holmes, Bonnie Hopkins, John Howard, Jr, Addie Huff, Carl Hulbert, Cynthia Humphrey, John Wesley Hunt, Sr, Georgia Ishman, Donald Jackson, Sherman Jackson, Carl Jarman, Derrell Johnson, Maisha Johnson(5:18-cv-107 - as Administrator of the), Maisha Johnson(5:18-cv-107 - Individually), Norman Johnson, Wanda Johnson, Mark Jones, Milton Jones, Nancy Kee(5:18-cv-244 - Individually), Nancy Kee(5:18-cv-244 - as Personal Representative of the), John Key, Charles King, Vicki Lacy, Diana Lawrence(5:18-cv-170 as Personal Representative of), Diana Lawrence(5:18-cv-170 Individually ), Kevin LeBlanc, Elmer Leary, Ronald Letell, Catina Loggan, Linda Lucas, Lynda Lyles, Don Lynn, James Mann, Phyllis Marcum(5:18-cv-356 - on behalf of), Phyllis Marcum(5:18-cv-356 -Individually), Michael Martin, Terry Martin, Violet Martin, Jason Mask, Larry Matthews, Druella Maurras, Darryl McAfee, Randall McCall, Sharon McCay(5:18-cv-155 - Representative of), Sharon McCay(5:18-cv-155 - Individually), Cyndy McCugh, Roy McGhee, Marcia McKinley, Therese Medley, Richard Merritt, Kelley Miears, Michael Miller, Veryl Mills, Amy Mitchell(5:18-cv-82 - Proposed Personal Representative on behalf of the Estate of the), Amy Mitchell(5:18-cv-82 - Individually), Jean Mitchell, Michael Moody, David Lester Moore, Shirley Nail, Pixie Nance(5:18-cv-110 - Individually), Pixie Nance(5:18-cv-110 - as Representative of the ), Cathy Nelson, Patsy Nesselrodt, Katherine Orschel, Ceasar Ortega, Jeff Parks, Kimberly Payne, Lisa Arlene Peoples, John Proples, Hank Ray, Diann M. Reeves, Larry Reeves, Patricia Reid, Richard Rimkus, Robert Rosencranse, Gregory Ross, Natalie Ross, Allen Rouse, Hubert Allen Royal, Yvonne Sandoval, April Sechler, Michael Sechler, Susan Settle(5:18-cv-65 - Individually), Susan Settle(5:18-cv-65 - As representative of the estate of), Calvin Sheppard, Christy Dawn Sheppard, Janiet Sheppard, Tommy Lee Dustin Sheppard, Cleotha Silvers, Larry Slaton, Vannessa Slaughter, Gary Smith, Mary Smith, Johny Sosh, Mary Sparkman, Lester Speights, Alberta Spicer, Johann A. Sproule, Jimmy Stacy, Lori Stewart(5:18-cv-268 - on behalf of the Estate of the), Lori Stewart(5:18-cv-268 - Individually), Gail Talton, Bobby L. Taylor, David Taylor, Leatha Taylor, Raul Telles, Cathy Terrell, Chleo Trapp, Ernest Trapp, Cloyd Tucker, Cynthia Turner, Dennis Turner, Debra Underwood, Patrick Utterback, Steven Vallentine, Michael Veloria, James Walz, Charles David Ware, Linda Ware, Timothy Waterman, Alice Watts, Shirley Whiteside(5:18-cv-373 - Individually), Shirley Whiteside(5:18-cv-373 - as Administrator of the Estate of), Nichole Wilcox, Carolyn Williams, Rhudenia Williams, Robert Williams, Wiley Williams, Jr, William E. Williams, Audrie Winborne, Michael Winkle, Charles Wood, Barbara Woodruff, Catherine Woods, Patricia Word, Samuel Mwakamsha Yaa, Guadalupe Ybarra, Robbie York, Jacqueline Young, Randolph Young See DE #160 for CORRECTED entry of this pleading. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Proposed Order)(Moore, Jennifer) Modified text on 8/27/2018 (CBD).
August 24, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern, 1:18-cv-07054, Barrientes v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00505-KKC pursuant to #158 Conditional Transfer Order 19 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
August 24, 2018 Filing 158 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. 19 from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Records requested from the transferor court(s) via email. cc: COR (CBD)
August 16, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern District of Georgia, 3:18-cv-00082, Williams et al v. Bristol-Meyers Squibb Co., Inc. et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-496-KKC pursuant to #157 Conditional Transfer Order 18. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
August 16, 2018 Filing 157 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. 18 from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Records requested from the transferor court(s) via email. cc: COR (TDA)
August 7, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: Notice of of Withdrawal of Counsel, Ashley Crooks (16 in 5:18-cv-00394-KKC, 154 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC). Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00394-KKC(CBD)
August 7, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Patrick N. Haines re (18 in 5:18-cv-00394-KKC) Response to Order to Show Cause. Error: Attorney filed the document in the individual member case file only. Pursuant to the Court's Practice & Procedure Order (Entry #3 in 5:18-md-2809) attorney should have filed the document in the master case and spread text to each related individual member case; Entry by Attorney; Correction: Clerk has re-filed the document in the master and spread to the related member case. No further action required by counsel as to this error. Counsel is advised to contact the ECF Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349 when assistance is needed in filing in these related cases. cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00394-KKC(CBD)
August 6, 2018 Filing 156 RESPONSE to the Court's Show Cause Order (12 in 5:18-cv-00394-KKC, 149 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) filed by Alice Watts, Alice Watts. Filed pursuant o QC re #18 in Member Case 5:18-cv-394 Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00394-KKC(CBD)
August 6, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: (155 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 17 in 5:18-cv-00394-KKC) Mail Returned to Patrick N. Haines. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00394-KKC(CBD)
August 6, 2018 Filing 155 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Patrick N. Haines re Order (148 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 11 in 5:18-cv-00394-KKC). Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00394-KKC(CBD)
August 6, 2018 Filing 154 NOTICE by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. of Withdrawal of Counsel, Ashley Crooks Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00394-KKC(Ullman, Emily)
August 6, 2018 Filing 153 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc.. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00394-KKC(Schmidt, Paul)
August 6, 2018 Filing 152 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc.. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00394-KKC(Ullman, Emily)
August 6, 2018 Filing 151 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc.. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00394-KKC(Jones, Phyllis)
July 25, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Show Cause Response due by 8/10/2018. (CBD)
July 25, 2018 Filing 150 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Harry Grimes. AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP waiver sent on 7/19/2018, answer due 9/17/2018; Bristol-Myers Squibb Company waiver sent on 7/19/2018, answer due 9/17/2018. (5:18-md-2809, 5:18-cv-167) Modified text on 7/25/2018 (CBD).
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER: The following attorneys (Daniel Brent Graves Elaina Marie Osteen Rachael Elizabeth Gusman William Chadwick McClain Ashley Crooks Patrick Haines), who have failed to register with the CM-ECF system as required, SHALL RETURN to the Court an Electronic Filing Attorney Registration Form within 14 days from the entry date of this order. Failure to do so may result in sanctions being imposed by the Court, including termination of the right to practice before this Court. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 7/24/2018.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR w/ copy of 2809 ECF Form to non-registered attorneys
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER: This action is hereby scheduled for a PRELIMINARY STATUS CONFERENCE on 9/7/2018 at 10:00 AM in LEXINGTON, Ky. Any party who wishes to do so before the conference, may submit the pre-conference filings via email to (see order). All such submissions must be received by Friday, August 24, 2018. At the conference, counsel must be prepared to discuss the following: 1) Any matters requiring the Courts immediate attention; 2) The need for the appointment of lead counsel, liaison counsel, and an executive committee and/or a steering committee for each party with functions as generally described in the Manual for Complex Litigation, 10.221; 3) The nature and potential dimensions of the litigation; 4) The major procedural and substantive problems likely to be encountered; 5) Any general proposals for the organization and structure of the pre-trial phases of this litigation; and 6) Suggestions on the content and timing of a specific case management order including a proposed discovery plan and a suggested schedule for joinder of parties, amendment of pleadings, motions, status conferences with the Court, and trial. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 7/20/2018.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR w/ copy of 2809 ECF Form to non-registered filers, Lex Diary. Modified cc on 7/20/2018 (CBD).
July 20, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: PRELIMINARY STATUS CONFERENCE set for 9/7/2018 at 10:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell. (CBD)
July 20, 2018 NOTICE OF ACTION BY CLERK STRIKING A DOCUMENT FROM THE RECORD. Affidavit of Service filed as (133 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 14 in 5:18-cv-00247-KKC) contained an INCORRECT PDF document filed as main document; Attorney having re- filed the corrected Affidavit of Service no further action is required. *SCD* cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00247-KKC(CBD)
July 20, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Jonathan Sedgh Affidavit of Service filed as (115 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 13 in 5:18-cv-00255-KKC); Error: Incorrect service date for defendant Bristol-Myers Squibb Company entered; Entry by attorney; Correction: Clerk modified text to show service date of 6/29/2018; No further action required. cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00255-KKC(CBD)
July 20, 2018 Filing 147 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on Bristol-Myers Squibb Company on 6/28/2018, filed by Donald Forgione. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00247-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 146 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP on 6/28/2018, filed by Katherine Orschel. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00243-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 145 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on Bristol-Myers Squibb Company on 6/28/2018, filed by Katherine Orschel. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00243-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 144 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP on 6/28/2018, filed by Allen Rouse. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00250-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 143 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on AstraZeneca LP on 6/28/2018, filed by Allen Rouse. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00250-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 142 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on Bristol-Myers Squibb Company on 6/28/2018, filed by Allen Rouse. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00250-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 141 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP on 6/28/2018, filed by Violet Martin. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00370-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 140 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on AstraZeneca LP on 6/28/2018, filed by Violet Martin. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00370-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 139 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on Bristol-Myers Squibb Company on 6/28/2018, filed by Violet Martin. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00370-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 138 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on AstraZeneca LP on 6/28/2018, filed by Shirley Whiteside(Individually). Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00373-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 137 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP on 6/28/2018, filed by Shirley Whiteside(Individually). Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00373-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 136 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on Bristol-Myers Squibb Company on 6/28/2018, filed by Shirley Whiteside(Individually). Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00373-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 135 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP on 6/28/2018, filed by Donald Forgione. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00247-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 134 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on AstraZeneca LP on 6/28/2018, filed by Donald Forgione. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00247-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 133 STRICKEN FROM DOCKET: INCORRECT pdf image attached PURSUANT to Notice of Action Striking Document filed on 7/20/2018. Modified on 7/20/2018 (CBD).
July 19, 2018 Filing 132 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP on 6/29/2018, filed by Nicky Carter. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00245-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 131 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on AstraZeneca LP on 6/29/2018, filed by Nicky Carter. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00245-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 130 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on Bristol-Myers Squibb Company on 6/29/2018, filed by Nicky Carter. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00245-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 129 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP on 6/29/2018, filed by James Butler. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00375-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 128 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on AstraZeneca LP on 6/29/2018, filed by James Butler. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00375-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 127 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on Bristol-Myers Squibb Company on 6/29/2018, filed by James Butler. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00375-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 126 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on AstraZeneca LP on 6/29/2018, filed by Ernest Trapp. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00260-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 125 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP on 6/29/2018, filed by Ernest Trapp. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00260-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 124 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on Bristol-Myers Squibb Company on 6/29/2018, filed by Ernest Trapp. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00260-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 123 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP on 6/29/2018, filed by Timothy Waterman. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00254-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 122 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on AstraZeneca LP on 6/29/2018, filed by Timothy Waterman. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00254-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 121 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on Bristol-Myers Squibb Company on 6/29/2018, filed by Timothy Waterman. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00254-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 120 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP on 6/29/2018, filed by Michael Havice. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00253-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 119 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on AstraZeneca LP on 6/29/2018, filed by Michael Havice. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00253-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 118 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on Bristol-Myers Squibb Company on 6/29/2018, filed by Michael Havice. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00253-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 117 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on AstraZeneca LP on 6/29/2018, filed by Oswald Gooch. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00255-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 116 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP on 6/29/2018, filed by Oswald Gooch. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00255-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 115 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on Bristol-Myers Squibb Company on 6/29/2018, filed by Oswald Gooch. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00255-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan) Modified text on 7/20/2018 (CBD).
July 19, 2018 Filing 114 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on AstraZeneca LP on 6/28/2018, filed by Johann A. Sproule. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00368-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 113 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP on 6/28/2018, filed by Johann A. Sproule. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00368-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 112 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on Bristol-Myers Squibb Company on 6/28/2018, filed by Johann A. Sproule. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00368-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 111 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on AstraZeneca LP on 6/28/2018, filed by Susan Gosner. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00369-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 110 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP on 6/28/2018, filed by Susan Gosner. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00369-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 109 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on Bristol-Myers Squibb Company on 6/28/2018, filed by Susan Gosner. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00369-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 108 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on AstraZeneca LP on 6/28/2018, filed by Robert Ervin. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00372-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 107 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP on 6/28/2018, filed by Robert Ervin. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00372-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 106 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons served on Bristol-Meyers Squibb Company on 6/28/2018, filed by Robert Ervin. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00372-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 12, 2018 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Michael Sedgh on behalf of Johann A. Sproule Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00368-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 12, 2018 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Michael Sedgh on behalf of Susan Gosner Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00369-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 12, 2018 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Michael Sedgh on behalf of Robert Ervin Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00372-KKC(Sedgh, Jonathan)
July 11, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Southern District of New York, 1:18-cv-02893, McCugh v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-450-KKC pursuant to #97 Conditional Transfer Order 17. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
July 11, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Randi Kassan re (13 in 5:18-cv-00390-KKC) Notice of Appearance. Error: Document was filed in the member cases only. Pursuant to the court's Practice & Procedure Order (Entry #3 in 5:18-md-2809) attorney should have filed the document identified above in the master case and spread text to the related member case; Entry by Attorney; Correction: Clerk has added counsel of record referenced in the Notice to the party in the master case. No further action required by counsel as to this error. cc cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00390-KKC(CBD)
July 11, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern, 1:18-cv-02744, Miears v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00449-KKC pursuant to #97 Conditional Transfer Order 17 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
July 11, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern, 1:18-cv-02643, Nelson v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00448-KKC pursuant to #97 Conditional Transfer Order 17 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
July 6, 2018 Attorney Update. Attorney Daniel John Carr for Don Lynn, Daniel John Carr for Willie Harris, Daniel John Carr for Jerry Brittain, Daniel John Carr for Michael Veloria, Daniel John Carr for Jimmy Stacy, Daniel John Carr for Audrie Winborne, Daniel John Carr for Cheryll Campbell, Daniel John Carr for Jay Epps, Daniel John Carr for Mark Jones, Daniel John Carr for Dennis Turner, Daniel John Carr for Lori Stewart, Daniel John Carr for Lori Stewart, added. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)
July 6, 2018 Filing 102 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Davis, Sr via personal service to AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP served on 6/29/2018, answer due 7/20/2018. (Burke, Daniel)
July 6, 2018 Filing 101 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Davis, Sr via personal service to to Bristol-Myers Squibb Company served on 6/29/2018, answer due 7/20/2018. (Burke, Daniel) Modified text on 7/6/2018 (CBD).
July 6, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO LAUREL HARRIS re ( #94 , #95 , #96 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) Request for Waiver of Service; Entry by Attorney; Error: This is an Affidavit of Service AND a Request for Waiver of Service. The document was filed only as a request for waiver of service when the document should be filed as two separate entries; Clerk re-filed the document as an Affidavit of Service in the master and member cases. Counsel is advised to contact the ECF Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349 when assistance is needed in filing in these cases. No further steps required by counsel. cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00337-KKC, 5:18-cv-00341-KKC, 5:18-cv-00342-KKC (TDA)
July 6, 2018 Filing 97 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. 17 from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Records requested from the transferor court(s) via email. cc: COR (CBD)
July 5, 2018 Filing 100 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of summons and complaint, served on AstraZeneca LP on 7/3/2018, filed by Michael Moody. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00342-KKC. FILED pursuant to QC re #96 in 18-md-2809. (TDA)
July 5, 2018 Filing 99 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of summons and complaint, served on AstraZeneca LP on 7/3/2018, filed by Helen Dunn. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00341-KKC. FILED pursuant to QC re #95 in 18-md-2809(TDA)
July 5, 2018 Filing 98 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of summons and complaint, served AstraZeneca LP on 7/3/18, filed by Belinda Didericksen. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00337-KKC FILED pursuant to QC re #94 in 18-md-2809 (TDA)
July 5, 2018 Filing 96 REQUESTS FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Bristol-Meyers Squibb Company, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP on 6/27/2018 by plaintiffs. Waivers of Service due by 7/28/2018. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00342-KKC(Harris, Laurel) Modified text on 7/6/2018 (CBD).
July 5, 2018 Filing 95 REQUESTS FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Bristol-Meyers Squibb Company, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP on 6/27/2018 by plaintiffs. Waivers of Service due by 7/28/2018. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00341-KKC(Harris, Laurel) Modified text on 7/6/2018 (CBD).
July 5, 2018 Filing 94 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Bristol-Meyers Squibb Company, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP on 6/27/2018 by plaintiff. Waiver of Service due by 7/28/2018. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00337-KKC(Harris, Laurel) Modified text on 7/6/2018 (CBD).
July 5, 2018 Filing 93 REQUESTS FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Bristol-Meyers Squibb Company, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, McKesson Corporation on 6/27/2018 by plaintiffs. Waivers of Service due by 7/28/2018. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Harris, Laurel) Modified text on 7/6/2018 (CBD).
July 2, 2018 Filing 92 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oswald Gooch (5:18-cv-255) via personal to Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. served on 6/29/2018, answer due 7/20/2018. (Sedgh, Jonathan) Modified text on 7/3/2018 (CBD).
July 2, 2018 Filing 91 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicky Carter (5:18-cv-245) via Personal to Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. served on 6/29/2018, answer due 7/20/2018. (Sedgh, Jonathan) Modified text on 7/3/2018 (CBD).
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER: that the Show Cause Order (83 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, et al) entered June 13, 2018, is hereby DISCHARGED. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 6/28/2018.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR w/ 2809 ECF Form to non-registered filers. Modified cc on 6/28/2018 (CBD).
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: In accordance with the stipulation ( #24 in case 5:18-md-02809-KKC; #24 in case 5:18-cv-00133-KKC) filed by the parties, the Court hereby ORDERS that this matter is DISMISSED without prejudiced and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 6/21/2018. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00133-KKC(CBD)cc: COR Modified text on 6/21/2018 (CBD).
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: In accordance with the stipulation ( #39 in case 5:18-md-02809-KKC; #30 in case 5:18-cv-00144-KKC) filed by the parties, the Court hereby ORDERS that this matter is DISMISSED without prejudiced and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 6/21/2018. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00144-KKC(CBD)cc: COR
June 20, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO TIMOTHY CLARK re Notice of Change of Address filed as (87 in 5:18-md-2809-KKC et al); Entry by Attorney; Error #1: Attorney failed to file document in all member cases listed (5:18-cv-62; 5:18-cv-119; 5:18-cv-139; 5:18-cv-262); Clerk updated address in all member cases listed. Clerk further added counsel in (5:18-cv-62) due to being included on the case filing list. Error #2: Incorrectly filed document in a member case not listed. Clerk modified the docket text of (5:18-cv-120) to state "incorrectly filed." No further action required by counsel as to this error. cc: COR (TDA)
June 19, 2018 Attorney Update. Attorney Timothy Michael Clark for Cloyd Tucker, added per DE #87 in 18-2809. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00062-KKC(TDA)
June 19, 2018 Filing 87 NOTICE of Change of Address by Timothy Michael Clark Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Clark, Timothy)
June 19, 2018 Filing 86 NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert A. Mosier Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Mosier, Robert)
June 19, 2018 Filing 85 NOTICE of Change of Address by Lauren Aliz Welling Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Welling, Lauren)
June 13, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern District of Texas, 3:18-cv-1400, Watts v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-394-KKC pursuant to #84 Conditional Transfer Order 16. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
June 13, 2018 Filing 84 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. 16 from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Records requested from the transferor court(s) via email. cc: COR (TDA)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The Court hereby ORDERS that the above counsel (Jason Murphy) SHALL SHOW CAUSE in a writing filed by no later than June 26, 2018 as to why the Court should not impose sanctions on him or her, including suspension of the right to practice in the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky, for failure to comply with the Court's order.. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 6/13/2018.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR w/ 2809 Reg. Form to J. Murphy via US Mail
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER: the Show Cause Order (72 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, et al) entered May 21, 2018, is hereby DISCHARGED. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 6/13/2018.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR
June 12, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Oklahoma Northern, 4:18-cv-190, Brown v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-390-KKC pursuant to #81 Conditional Transfer Order 15 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
June 11, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern, 1:18-cv-02896, Davis v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00386-KKC pursuant to #81 Conditional Transfer Order 15 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
June 11, 2018 Filing 81 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. 15 from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Records requested from the transferor court(s) via email. cc: COR (CBD)
June 6, 2018 Attorney Update. Attorney Alfred A. Olinde, Jr for Wilma Barner,Alfred A. Olinde, Jr for Sheryle Christensen,Alfred A. Olinde, Jr for Wayne Driver,Alfred A. Olinde, Jr for Willie Harris,Alfred A. Olinde, Jr for Mark Jones,Alfred A. Olinde, Jr for Don Lynn,Alfred A. Olinde, Jr for Phyllis Marcum,Alfred A. Olinde, Jr for Phyllis Marcum,Alfred A. Olinde, Jr for Jimmy Stacy,Alfred A. Olinde, Jr for Michael Veloria,Alfred A. Olinde, Jr for Audrie Winborne,Alfred A. Olinde, Jr for Robbie York Alfred A. Olinde for Don Lynn, Alfred A. Olinde for Willie Harris, Alfred A. Olinde for Robbie York, Alfred A. Olinde for Sheryle Christensen, Alfred A. Olinde for Michael Veloria, Alfred A. Olinde for Phyllis Marcum, Alfred A. Olinde for Phyllis Marcum, Alfred A. Olinde for Jimmy Stacy, Alfred A. Olinde for Audrie Winborne, Alfred A. Olinde for Mark Jones, Alfred A. Olinde for Wayne Driver, Alfred A. Olinde for Wilma Barner, added. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)
June 6, 2018 Filing 80 NOTICE by Don Lynn, Robbie York, Sheryle Christensen, Michael Veloria, Phyllis Marcum(on behalf of), Jimmy Stacy, Audrie Winborne, Mark Jones, Wayne Driver, Wilma Barner, Willie Harris of Appearance of Alfred A. Olinde, Jr. as Co-Counsel of Record Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Carr, Daniel)
June 5, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO W. Berman re (12 in 5:18-cv-00167-KKC) Response to Order to Show Cause. Error: Document was filed in the member case only. Pursuant to the court's Practice & Procedure Order (Entry #3 in 5:18-md-2809) attorney should have filed the document in the master case and spread text to the related member case. Entry by Attorney. No further action required by counsel as to this error. cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00167-KKC(CBD)
June 4, 2018 Filing 79 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Patsy Nesselrodt filed by Patsy Nesselrodt. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00164-KKC(Kassan, Randi)
June 4, 2018 Filing 78 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Lawana Garrette, Catina Loggan, Barbara Harrell, Druella Maurras filed by Lawana Garrette, Catina Loggan, Barbara Harrell, Druella Maurras. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00246-KKC, 5:18-cv-00249-KKC, 5:18-cv-00252-KKC, 5:18-cv-00257-KKC(Kassan, Randi)
June 1, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern, 1:18-cv-02913, Butler v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00375-KKC pursuant to #77 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 14. cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
May 31, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: Error: Incorrect file date entered; Entry by Clerk; Correction: Clerk changed the file date from 5/31/18 to 5/30/18; No further steps to be taken by counsel cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00374-KKC(MRS)
May 31, 2018 Filing 77 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. 14 from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Records requested from the transferor court(s) via email. cc: COR (CBD)
May 30, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Oklahoma Eastern, 6:18-cv-92, Sheppard et al., v. Bristol Myers Squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-374-KKC pursuant to #74 Conditional Transfer Order 13 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS) Modified file date on 5/31/2018 (MRS).
May 30, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Southern District of West Virginia, 2:18-cv-500, Whiteside et al v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-373-KKC pursuant to #74 Conditional Transfer Order 13. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
May 30, 2018 Filing 76 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., Bristol-Myers Company, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc.. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Schmidt, Paul)
May 30, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Oklahoma Eastern, 6:18-cv-94, Ervin v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-372-KKC pursuant to #74 Conditional Transfer Order 13 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
May 30, 2018 Filing 75 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Bristol-Meyer Squibb Co., Inc., Bristol-Meyers Squibb Company, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., Brystol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corp, McKesson Corporation, McKesson Corporation, McKesson Corporation. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Schmidt, Paul)
May 29, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern District of West Virginia, 3:18-cv-00045, Martin v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-370-KKC pursuant to #74 Conditional Transfer Order 13. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
May 29, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Arizona, 4:18-cv-00169, Gosner v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00369-KKC pursuant to #74 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 13 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
May 29, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Arizona, 4:18-cv-00168, Sproule v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00368-KKC pursuant to #74 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 13 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
May 29, 2018 Filing 74 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. 13 from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Records requested from the transferor court(s) via email. cc: COR (CBD)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER: The following attorneys (Jonathan Michael Sedgh, Tina M. Bullock, Michael B. Lynch, Jason Murphy), who have failed to register with the CM- ECF system as required, SHALL RETURN to the Court an Electronic Filing Attorney Registration Form within 14 days from the entry date of this order. Failure to do so may result in sanctions being imposed by the Court, including termination of the right to practice before this Court. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/21/2018.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR w/ copy of 2809 ECF Reg. Form to non-registered filers Modified text on 5/21/2018 (CBD).
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The following attorneys have failed to comply with the Court's order: Jeffrey Alan and Travers W. Steven Berman The Court hereby ORDERS that each of the above counsel SHALL SHOW CAUSE in a writing filed by no later than June 4, 2018 as to why the Court should not impose sanctions on him or her, including suspension of the right to practice in the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky, for failure to comply with the Court's order. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/21/2018.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR, w/ copy of 2809 ECF Registration form to Travers and Berman
May 14, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Middle District of Tennessee, 3:18-cv-341, Hocker v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-357-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order 11. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
May 10, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Ohio Southern, 2:18-cv-407, Marcum v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-356-KKC pursuant to #71 Conditional Transfer Order 12 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
May 10, 2018 Filing 71 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. 12 from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Records requested from the transferor court(s) via email. cc: COR (MRS)
May 8, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Louisiana Eastern, 2:18-cv-3589, Rimkus vs. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-355-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
May 8, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Louisiana Eastern, 2:18-cv-3586, Couisan v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-354-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER: The Court having been advised that all counsel listed in the Order to Show Cause (DE 36 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) have registered to file pleadings electronically in the ECF system, responded in writing and/or withdrawn as counsel, IT IS ORDERED that the Show Cause entered April 18, 2018, is hereby DISCHARGED. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/8/2018.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR w/ copy of 2809 ECF Form to non-registered counsel via US Mail
May 7, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Ohio Northern, 18-cv-762, Black v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-352-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
May 7, 2018 Attorney Update. Attorney Laurel Li Harris for Shelia Austin,Laurel Li Harris for Gilbert Corbello,Laurel Li Harris for Kevin LeBlanc Laurel Li Harris for Olivier Herbert, added. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00300-KKC, 5:18-cv-00303-KKC, 5:18-cv-00305-KKC, 5:18-cv-00320-KKC(CBD)
May 7, 2018 Filing 69 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin LeBlanc. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00320-KKC(Harris, Laurel)
May 7, 2018 Filing 68 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Olivier Herbert. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00303-KKC(Harris, Laurel)
May 7, 2018 Filing 67 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gilbert Corbello. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00300-KKC(Harris, Laurel)
May 7, 2018 Filing 66 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shelia Austin. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00305-KKC(Harris, Laurel)
May 7, 2018 Filing 65 NOTICE OF FILING by Hubert Allen Royal, John Key, Hubert Allen Royal, John Key re (55 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) Response to Order to Show Cause, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00242-KKC, 5:18-cv-00256-KKC(Kassan, Randi)
May 7, 2018 Filing 64 NOTICE OF FILING by Nichole Wilcox, Nichole Wilcox re (54 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) Response to Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00061-KKC(Kassan, Randi)
May 7, 2018 Filing 63 NOTICE OF FILING by Therese Medley, Therese Medley re (53 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) Response to Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00126-KKC(Kassan, Randi)
May 7, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE OF FILING by Milagros Ganzalez-McAllister(Individually), Milagros Ganzalez-McAllister(as Personal Representative), Charles Wood, Milagros Ganzalez-McAllister(5:18-cv-240 - Individually), Milagros Ganzalez-McAllister(5:18-cv-240 - as Personal Representative ), Kimberly Payne, Charles Wood, Kimberly Payne re (52 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) Response to Order to Show Cause,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00233-KKC, 5:18-cv-00239-KKC, 5:18-cv-00240-KKC(Kassan, Randi)
May 4, 2018 Filing 61 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Harry Grimes, Diann M. Reeves, Larry Reeves, Allen Atkins, Sr., Maisha Johnson(Administrator to the), Maisha Johnson(Individually ), April Sechler, Michael Sechler, Georgia Ishman, Catherine Woods, H.B. Green, Edwin Asencio, Amy Mitchell(Individually), Amy Mitchell(Proposed Personal Representative on behalf of the), Darryl McAfee, Edwin Asencio, Allen Atkins, Sr., Earl Binns, Linda Day, Ethel Green, H.B. Green, Harry Grimes, Georgia Ishman, Maisha Johnson(5:18-cv-107 - as Administrator of the), Maisha Johnson(5:18-cv-107 - Individually), Amy Mitchell(5:18-cv-82 - Proposed Personal Representative on behalf of the Estate of the), Amy Mitchell(5:18-cv-82 - Individually), Diann M. Reeves, Larry Reeves, April Sechler, Michael Sechler, Gail Talton, Robert Williams, Catherine Woods, Earl Binns, Linda Day, Robert Williams, Gail Talton filed by Harry Grimes, Diann M. Reeves, Larry Reeves, Allen Atkins, Sr., Maisha Johnson(Administrator to the), Maisha Johnson(Individually ), April Sechler, Michael Sechler, Georgia Ishman, Catherine Woods, H.B. Green, Edwin Asencio, Amy Mitchell(Individually), Amy Mitchell(Proposed Personal Representative on behalf of the), Darryl McAfee, Edwin Asencio, Allen Atkins, Sr., Earl Binns, Linda Day, Ethel Green, H.B. Green, Harry Grimes, Georgia Ishman, Maisha Johnson(5:18-cv-107 - as Administrator of the), Maisha Johnson(5:18-cv-107 - Individually), Amy Mitchell(5:18-cv-82 - Proposed Personal Representative on behalf of the Estate of the), Amy Mitchell(5:18-cv-82 - Individually), Diann M. Reeves, Larry Reeves, April Sechler, Michael Sechler, Gail Talton, Robert Williams, Catherine Woods, Earl Binns, Linda Day, Robert Williams, Gail Talton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Sacks, Shayna)
May 4, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO RANDI KASSAN re ( #53 , #54 , #55 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, et al) Response to Order to Show Cause, attorney failed to submit a certificate of service with pleadings. Pursuant to the Court's Order Regarding Practice and Procedure (DE #3 in 5:18-md-2809) each pleading must have the modified certificate of service referred to therein. Entry by attorney. Within 7 calendar days, prepare a document entitled "Notice of Filing" (with a certificate of service). Using the event "Notice of Filing," attach the certificate of service, and create a link to the related docket entries. cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00061-KKC, 5:18-cv-00126-KKC, 5:18-cv-00242-KKC, 5:18-cv-00256-KKC(TDA)
May 4, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO RANDI KASSAN re ( #10 in 5:18-cv-00240-KKC, #10 in 5:18-cv-00239-KKC, #52 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, #10 in 5:18-cv-00233-KKC) Response to Order to Show Cause, attorney failed to submit a certificate of service with pleading. Pursuant to the Court's Order Regarding Practice and Procedure (DE #3 in 5:18-md-2809) each pleading must have the modified certificate of service referred to therein. Entry by attorney. Within 7 calendar days, prepare a document entitled "Notice of Filing" (with a certificate of service). Using the event "Notice of Filing," attach the certificate of service, and create a link to the related docket entry. cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00233-KKC, 5:18-cv-00239-KKC, 5:18-cv-00240-KKC(TDA)
May 3, 2018 Attorney Update. Added Attorney Paul W. Schmidt & Emily Ullman for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation; Terminated Attorney Robert Bruce Hurley, Jr. for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation. Associated Cases: re #60 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(TDA)
May 3, 2018 Attorney Update. Added Attorneys Paul W. Schmidt & Emily Ullman for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation; Terminated Attorney Stephen B. Devereaux for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation. Associated Cases: re #59 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00140-KKC(TDA)
May 3, 2018 Attorney Update. Added Attorneys Paul W. Schmidt & Emily Ullman for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation; Terminated Attorney Ursula Marie Henninger for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation. Associated Cases: re #58 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00070-KKC, 5:18-cv-00104-KKC, 5:18-cv-00113-KKC, 5:18-cv-00115-KKC(TDA)
May 3, 2018 Attorney Update. Added Attorney Paul W. Schmidt for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Terminated Attorney Robert K. Woo, Jr. for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Associated Cases: #57 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00108-KKC(TDA)
May 3, 2018 Attorney Update. Added Attorneys Paul W. Schmidt, William Edward Steimle, Emily S. Ullman for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation; Terminated Attorney Robert K. Woo, Jr. for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation. Associated Cases: (re #56 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al). (TDA)
May 3, 2018 Attorney Update. Attorney Cameron James Hoyler terminated. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00094-KKC, 5:18-cv-00095-KKC(TDA)
May 3, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation of Withdrawal of Counsel, Robert Bruce Hurley, Jr. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Steimle, William)
May 3, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation of Withdrawal of Counsel, Stephen B. Devereaux Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00140-KKC(Steimle, William)
May 3, 2018 Filing 58 NOTICE by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation of Withdrawal of Counsel, Ursula Henninger Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00070-KKC, 5:18-cv-00104-KKC, 5:18-cv-00113-KKC, 5:18-cv-00115-KKC(Steimle, William)
May 3, 2018 Filing 57 NOTICE by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company of Withdrawal of Counsel, Robert K. Woo, Jr. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00108-KKC(Steimle, William)
May 3, 2018 Filing 56 NOTICE by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation of Withdrawal of Counsel, Robert K. Woo, Jr. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Steimle, William)
May 3, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Oklahoma Northern, 4:18-cv-188, Berry v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-350-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS) Modified TEXT on 5/3/2018 (MRS).
May 3, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Oklahoma Northern, 4:18-cv-187, Dunn v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-349-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
May 3, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Oklahoma Northern, 4:18-cv-186, Nail v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-348-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
May 3, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Oklahoma Northern, 4:18-cv-185, Haley v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-347-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
May 3, 2018 Filing 55 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Hubert Allen Royal, John Key, Hubert Allen Royal, John Key (36 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 7 in 5:18-cv-00242-KKC) filed by Hubert Allen Royal, John Key, Hubert Allen Royal, John Key. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00242-KKC, 5:18-cv-00256-KKC(Kassan, Randi)
May 3, 2018 Filing 54 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Nichole Wilcox, Nichole Wilcox (36 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 94 in 5:18-cv-00061-KKC) filed by Nichole Wilcox, Nichole Wilcox. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00061-KKC(Kassan, Randi)
May 3, 2018 Filing 53 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Therese Medley, Therese Medley (36 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 39 in 5:18-cv-00126-KKC) filed by Therese Medley, Therese Medley. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00126-KKC(Kassan, Randi)
May 3, 2018 Filing 52 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Milagros Ganzalez-McAllister(Individually), Milagros Ganzalez-McAllister(as Personal Representative), Charles Wood, Milagros Ganzalez-McAllister(5:18-cv-240 - Individually), Milagros Ganzalez-McAllister(5:18-cv-240 - as Personal Representative ), Kimberly Payne, Charles Wood, Kimberly Payne (36 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 7 in 5:18-cv-00239-KKC, 7 in 5:18-cv-00233-KKC, 7 in 5:18-cv-00240-KKC) filed by Milagros Ganzalez-McAllister(Individually), Milagros Ganzalez-McAllister(as Personal Representative), Charles Wood, Milagros Ganzalez-McAllister(5:18-cv-240 - Individually), Milagros Ganzalez-McAllister(5:18-cv-240 - as Personal Representative ), Kimberly Payne, Charles Wood, Kimberly Payne. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00233-KKC, 5:18-cv-00239-KKC, 5:18-cv-00240-KKC(Kassan, Randi)
May 3, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company of Withdrawal of Counsel, Cameron James Hoyler Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00094-KKC, 5:18-cv-00095-KKC(Steimle, William)
May 3, 2018 Clerk's Note re (36 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 94 in 5:18-cv-00061-KKC) Show Cause Order: Counsel Rocklan King's office called the HelpDesk this date to verify address shown on record and confirm he is taking steps to become ECF registered. Clerk confirmed address had an error. Address was corrected and initial packet/orders were mailed via US Mail this date to counsel. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00061-KKC(CBD)
May 3, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Illinois Southern, 3:18-cv-00751, Caston v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00338-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
May 3, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern District of Texas, 4:18-cv-257, Delaney et al v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-344-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order 11. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
May 3, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Eastern District of Texas, 6:18-cv-160, Billington v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-343-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order 11. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
May 2, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern, 1:18-cv-3019, Moody v. Bristol Myers Squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-342-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
May 2, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Eastern District of Texas, 6:18-cv-00159, Hightower v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-340-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order 11. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
May 2, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern, 1:18-cv-3013, Dunn v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-341-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
May 2, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern, 1:18-cv-3009, Sheppard v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-339-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
May 2, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Georgia Middle, 1:18-cv-00075, HUMPHREY v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-334 pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
May 2, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern, 1:18-cv-3008, Didericksen v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-337-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
May 2, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: New Jersey, 1:18-cv-5409, Leary v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-336-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
May 2, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Illinois Northern, 1:18-cv-02416, Carter v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-333 KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
May 2, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Eastern District of Tennessee, 3:18-cv-144, Underwood v. Bristol - Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-332-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order 11. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
May 2, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Georgia Middle, 5:18-cv-00114, MCGHEE v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00331-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
May 2, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Georgia Middle, 5:18-cv-00113, LUCAS v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00330-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
May 2, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Illinois Northern, 3:18-cv-50117, Johnson v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00329-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
May 2, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Southern, 2:18-cv-00161, Young v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00328-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
May 2, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Southern, 2:18-cv-00160, Williams v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00326-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
May 2, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Southern, 1:18-cv-00159, Howard v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00325-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
May 2, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Southern District of Texas, 4:18-cv-1070, Matthews v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-324-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order 11. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
May 2, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Southern District of Texas, 4:18-cv-1068, Bakalyar v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-323-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order 11. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
May 2, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Southern District of Texas, 1:18-cv-55, Gomez v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-322-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order 11. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
May 1, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Western District of Texas, 1:18-cv-00286, Gonzalez v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-321-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order 11. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
May 1, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Louisiana Middle, 3:18-cv-375, LeBlanc v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-320 pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
May 1, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Western District of Texas, 1:18-cv-284, Baker v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-319-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order 11. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
May 1, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Illinois Northern, 1:18-cv-02414, Hopkins v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00318-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
May 1, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Indiana Southern, 4:18-cv-58, Birk v. Bristol Myers Squibb Company et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-316 pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
May 1, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern, 7:18-cv-00536, Smith v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00317-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
May 1, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Illinois Northern, 1:18-cv-02415, Ortega v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00315-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
May 1, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Ohio Southern, 2:18-cv-300, Chapman v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-314-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
May 1, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Georgia Northern, 1:18-cv-01448, King v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00313-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
May 1, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern District of Texas, 5:18-cv-00094, Ybarra v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-312-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order 11. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
May 1, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Western District of Oklahoma, 5:18-cv-302, Ware v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-311-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order 11. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
May 1, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern, 3:18-cv-00541, Mann v. Bristol Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00310-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
May 1, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Georgia Northern, 1:18-cv-01447, Terrell v. Bristol-Meyers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00309-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
May 1, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Western District of Tennessee, 1:18-cv-2225, Ferrell v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-308-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order 11. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
May 1, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Middle, 3:18-cv-00394, Alexander v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00307-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
May 1, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Louisiana Middle, 3:18-cv-374, Austin v. Bristol Myers Squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-305-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
May 1, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Middle, 2:18-cv-00397, Banks v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00304-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
May 1, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Louisiana Western, 2:18-cv-462, Herbert v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-303-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
May 1, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Western District of Tennessee, 2:18-cv-2223, Cannon v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-301-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order 11. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
May 1, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Arizona, 2:18-cv-01039, McKinley v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00302-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
May 1, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Arizona, 2:18-cv-01036, Huff v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00299-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
May 1, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Louisiana Western, 2:18-cv-461, Corbello v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-300-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
May 1, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Louisiana Western, 2:18-cv-460, Garry v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-298-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
May 1, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Indiana Northern, 1:18-cv-81, Helire v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-297-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
May 1, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Kentucky Western, 3:18-cv-207, Martin v. Bristol Myers Squibb Company, et al, Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-295-KKC pursuant to #50 Conditional Transfer Order 11 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
May 1, 2018 Filing 50 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. 11 from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Records requested from the transferor court(s) via email. cc: COR (CBD)
April 30, 2018 Filing 49 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP (36 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 51 in 5:18-cv-00066-KKC) filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00066-KKC(Watkins, Elijah)
April 30, 2018 Filing 48 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by David Lester Moore filed by David Lester Moore. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00147-KKC(Kemp, Christopher)
April 30, 2018 Filing 47 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Sheryle Christensen, Carolyn Williams, Michael Martin, Kathy Barnes (36 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 111 in 5:18-cv-00094-KKC, 51 in 5:18-cv-00066-KKC, 78 in 5:18-cv-00054-KKC, 68 in 5:18-cv-00095-KKC) filed by Sheryle Christensen, Carolyn Williams, Michael Martin, Kathy Barnes. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00054-KKC, 5:18-cv-00066-KKC, 5:18-cv-00094-KKC, 5:18-cv-00095-KKC(Mosier, Robert)
April 30, 2018 Filing 46 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Don Lynn (36 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 12 in 5:18-cv-00120-KKC) filed by Don Lynn. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00120-KKC(Linville, Hunter)
April 27, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Western District of Oklahoma, 5:18-cv-283, Brittain v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-287-KKC pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order 9. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
April 24, 2018 Filing 45 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Willie Harris, Robbie York (22 in 5:18-cv-00108-KKC) filed by Willie Harris, Robbie York. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00079-KKC, 5:18-cv-00108-KKC(Harvey, William)
April 24, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Eastern District of Wisconsin, 2:18-cv-511, Jarman v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-286-KKC pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order 9. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
April 24, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Eastern District of Washington, 1:18-cv-3049, Smith v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-285-KKC pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order 9. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
April 23, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Pennsylvania Middle, 3:18-cv-00733, Mitchell v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00281-KKC pursuant to #44 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 10 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
April 23, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Pennsylvania Middle, 3:18-cv-00752, Anderson v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00279-KKC pursuant to #44 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 10 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
April 23, 2018 Clerk's Note: Clerk contacted counsel's office re (40 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, et al) Response to Order to Show Cause. Counsel's office advised that 2809 ECF Registration Forms for all counsel listed will be mailed to Clerk. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)
April 23, 2018 Filing 44 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. 10 from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Records requested from the transferor court(s) via email. cc: COR (CBD)
April 20, 2018 Filing 43 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Teresa Ann Freeman (10 in 5:18-cv-00162-KKC) Joel Robert Rhine filed by Teresa Ann Freeman. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00162-KKC(Geisler, Ephraim)
April 20, 2018 Filing 42 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Anita Rochelle Holland (65 in 5:18-cv-00070-KKC) for Joel R. Rhine filed by Anita Rochelle Holland. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00070-KKC(Geisler, Ephraim)
April 20, 2018 Filing 41 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Steven Vallentine (42 in 5:18-cv-00057-KKC) for Mathew Bernard Richardson filed by Steven Vallentine. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00057-KKC(Aylstock, Bryan)
April 20, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern District of Texas, 7:18-cv-45, Hasan v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-272-KKC pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order 9. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
April 20, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Indiana Southern, 4:18-cv-00055, Hardin v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00270-KKC pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 9 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
April 20, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: California Eastern, 2:18-cv-00680, Stewart v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00268-KKC pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 9 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
April 20, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Southern District of Texas, 2:18-cv-92, Gordon v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-271-KKC pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order 9. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
April 20, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Indiana Southern, 1:18-cv-00984, Woodruff v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00269-KKC pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 9 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
April 20, 2018 Filing 40 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation, McKesson Corporation, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Bristol-Myers Company (18 in 5:18-cv-00154-KKC) filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation, McKesson Corporation, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Bristol-Myers Company. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Browning, Carol)
April 20, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: re (30 in 5:18-cv-00144-KKC, 39 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation of Dismissal. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00144-KKC(CBD)
April 20, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Randi Kassan re (29 in 5:18-cv-00144-KKC) Stipulation of Dismissal. Error: Attorney filed the document in the individual member case file only. Pursuant to the Court's Practice & Procedure Order (Entry #3 in 5:18-md-2809) attorney should have filed the document in the master case and spread text to the related individual member case(s); Entry by Attorney. Correction: Clerk has re-filed the document using the event "Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation" in the master and member case files as #39 in 5:18-md-2809, #30 in 5:18-cv-144 in order for pleading to show on judge's motions report. No further action required by counsel as to this error. cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00144-KKC(CBD) Modified typo on 4/20/2018 (CBD).
April 20, 2018 Attorney Update. Attorney Kenneth L. Pedersen terminated per Notice of Substitution ( #53 in 5:18-cv-66; #38 in 5:18-md-2809). Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00066-KKC(CBD)cc: Compliance Clerk
April 19, 2018 Filing 39 Proposed Agreed Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice by AstraZeneca LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Richard Merritt. Filed per QC re #29 in 5:18-cv-144. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00144-KKC(CBD)
April 19, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern District of Texas, 3:18-cv-826, Crear v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-267-KKC pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order 9. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
April 19, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern District of Texas, 3:18-cv-827, Sheppard v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-266-KKC pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order 9. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
April 19, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern District of Texas, 3:18-cv-825, Fouse v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-265 pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order 9. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
April 19, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern District of Texas, 3:18-cv-828, Bivins v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-263-KKC pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order 9. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
April 19, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern District of Texas, 3:18-cv-824, Erwin v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-262 pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order 9. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
April 19, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Southern District of Texas, 4:18-cv-971, Sparkman v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-259-KKC pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order 9. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
April 19, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern, 18-cv-02955, Trapp et al v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-260-KKC pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order 9 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
April 19, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Southern District of Texas, 4:18-cv-969, Jones v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-258-KKC pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order 9. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
April 19, 2018 Clerk's Note re Order ( #36 in 5:18-md-2809 and #12 in 5:18-cv-115): Counsel's office called to advise PAWD court had incorrect address as to COR, Derek Braslow. Clerk verified address as given by phone matched PAWD Complaint (DE #1 in 5:18-cv-00155-KKC). Address was updated. Caller advised a 2809 CM/ECF Registration Form was being mailed in this date. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00155-KKC(CBD)
April 19, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Mississippi Southern, 3:18-cv-00214, Garrette v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00257-KKC pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 9 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
April 19, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: North Carolina Eastern, 7:18-cv-00052, Royal v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-256-KKC pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order 9 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
April 19, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Mississippi Souther, 3:18-cv-00201, Maurras v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00252-KKC pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 9 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
April 19, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern, 18-cv-2917, Gooch v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-255-KKC pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order 9 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
April 19, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern, 18-cv-2915, Waterman v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-254-KKC pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order 9 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
April 19, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern, 18-cv-02914, Havice v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-253-KKC pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order 9 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
April 19, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE by Sheryle Christensen Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel for Plaintiff Kenneth Pederson. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00066-KKC(Whitehead, Jarom) Modified text on 4/20/2018 (CBD).
April 19, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern, 18-cv-02866, Rouse v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-250-KKC pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order 9 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
April 19, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Mississippi Northern, 1:18-cv-00061, Loggan v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00249-KKC pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 9 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
April 19, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Illinois Northern, 3:18-cv-50110, Mills v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00248-KKC pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 9 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
April 19, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Mississippi Southerm, 3:18-cv-00202, Harrell v. Bristol Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00246-KKC pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 9 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
April 19, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern, 18-cv-2863, Forgione v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-247-KKC pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order 9 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
April 19, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern, 18-cv-2862, Carter v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-245-KKC pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order 9 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
April 19, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Kentucky Western, 5:18-cv-00049, Kee v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00244-KKC pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 9 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
April 19, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern, 1:18-cv-02860, Orschel v. Astrazeneca LP et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-243-KKC pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order 9 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
April 19, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Georgia Northern, 1:18-cv-01292, Walz v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-238 KKC pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 9 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER REGARDING MANDATORY CM/ECF REGISTRATION FOR COUNSEL OF RECORD: The following attorneys( Jeffrey Alan Travers Paul Lesko W. Steven Berman Rayna Elizabeth Kessler Christopher Coffin), who have failed to register with the CM-ECF system as required, SHALL RETURN to the Court an Electronic Filing Attorney Registration Form within 14 days from the entry date of this order. Failure to do so may result in sanctions being imposed by the Court, including termination of the right to practice before this Court. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 4/18/2018.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR w/ 2809 ECF Registration Form
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The Court hereby ORDERS that each of the above counsel (Mathew Bernard Richardson Mary Roxana Rudolph Robert Charles Bigelow Rocklan W. King, III Dawn L. Dauphine David B. Rosenbaum William B. Monk Elijah Martin Watkins Kenneth L. Pedersen Robert A. Mosier Joel Robert Rhine Ursula Marie Henninger Amy Sherry Fischer Diana Cole Surprenant E. Paige Sensenbrenner Jessica Ann Perez Lawton Cole Callihan Nicholas R. Rockforte Craig Laurence Dashiell Gavin J. Rooney Shayna E. Sacks Kathleen Thompson Deanda Stephen Donald Polito F. Laurens Brock Cameron James Hoyler Stephanie McGee Rippee Jeffrey Jerome Hines Adam Patrick O'Brien Amber Davis Gregory Lawrence Halperin Hunter Vance Linville Samuel K. Allen Mary Alice Wells Steven W. Quattlebaum Nancy A. Mismash Bart C. Sullivan Phyllis Norman Lauren E.H. DiFrancesco John E. McElligott William Todd Harvey Stephen B. Devereaux Christopher R. Kemp Derek T. Braslow) SHALL SHOW CAUSE in a writing filed by May 4, 2018 as to why the Court should not impose sanctions on him or her, including suspension of the right to practice in the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky, for failure to comply with the Court's order. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 4/18/2018.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR w/ 2809 ECF Registration Form. Modified file date on 4/19/2018 (CBD).
April 18, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: North Carolina Middle District, 18-cv -265, Key v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-242-KKC pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order 9 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
April 18, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Ohio Northern, 3:18-cv-00715, Clark et al v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-241-KKC pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order 9 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
April 18, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Missouri Western, 18-cv-00260, Ganzalez-McAllister v. Bristol Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-240-KKC pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order 9 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
April 18, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Missouri Western, 18-cv-00259, Payne v. Bristol Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-239 pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order 9 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
April 18, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Georgia Southern, 1:18-cv-00060, Slaton v. Bristol-Meyers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00237-KKC pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 9 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
April 18, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Illinois Southern, 3:18-cv-00632, Gintz v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00236-KKC pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 9 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
April 18, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Arkansas Eastern, 4:18-cv-00231, Booth v. Bristol Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00235-KKC pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 9 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
April 18, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Missouri Western, 4:18-cv-00258, Wood v. Bristol Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-233 pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order 9 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
April 18, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Arizona, 4:18-cv-00172, Peoples v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-00234-KKC pursuant to #35 Conditional Transfer Order CTO 9 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD) Modified text on 4/18/2018 (CBD).
April 18, 2018 Filing 35 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. 9 from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Records requested from the transferor court(s) via email. cc: COR (CBD)
April 13, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Iowa Southern, 3:18-cv-31, Parks v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-223-KKC pursuant to #34 Conditional Transfer Order 8. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
April 12, 2018 Filing 34 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. 8 from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Records requested from the transferor court(s) via email. cc: COR (TDA)
April 11, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc.. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Zimmer, Donald)
April 11, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., Brystol-Myers Squibb Company, Bristol-Meyer Squibb Co., Inc., McKesson Corp, Bristol-Meyers Squibb Company, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., McKesson Corporation. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Zimmer, Donald)
April 11, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc.. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Steimle, William)
April 11, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca PLC, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Meyer Squibb Co., Inc., Bristol-Meyers Squibb Company, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., Brystol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corp, McKesson Corporation, McKesson Corporation. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Steimle, William)
April 10, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Bristol-Meyer Squibb Co., Inc., Bristol-Meyers Squibb Company, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., Brystol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corp, McKesson Corporation, McKesson Corporation, McKesson Corporation. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Jones, Phyllis)
April 10, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., Bristol-Myers Company, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc.. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Jones, Phyllis)
April 10, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Bristol-Meyer Squibb Co., Inc., Bristol-Meyers Squibb Company, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., Brystol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corp, McKesson Corporation, McKesson Corporation, McKesson Corporation. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Ullman, Emily)
April 10, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., Bristol-Myers Company, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc.. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Ullman, Emily)
April 10, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: re (24 in 5:18-cv-00133-KKC, 24 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00133-KKC(CBD)
April 10, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., Brystol-Myers Squibb Company, Bristol-Meyers Squibb Company, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., McKesson Corporation. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Browning, Carol)
April 10, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Carol Dan Browning on behalf of AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., Bristol-Myers Company, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Browning, Carol)
April 9, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: EDKY, 5:18-cv-213, Spicer v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-219 KKC pursuant to Consolidation Order cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
April 9, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: USDC EDKY, 5:18-cv-205 KKC, Utterback v. Bristol- Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-218 KKC pursuant to Order of Consolidation. cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD) Modified text on 4/9/2018 (CBD).
April 9, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: USDC EDKY, 5:18-cv-204 KKC, Curtis v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-217 KKC pursuant to Order of Consolidation. cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
March 30, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Taylor, Leatha Taylor, David Taylor, Leatha Taylor. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00053-KKC(Parker, Laraclay)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re (3 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC): Attorneys who have failed to register with CM-ECF system as required, SHALL RETURN to Court an Electronic Filing Attorney Registration Form w/in 14 days from entry date of this order. Failure to do so may result in sanctions being imposed by the Court, including termination of the right to practice before this Court. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 3/29/2018. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al. (TDA) cc: COR
March 23, 2018 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation filed by Audrey Gore (Individually and as Administrator of the Estate of Ophelia Dubose.Filed per Order #19 in 5:18-md-2226, #81 in 5:18-cv-56)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00056-KKC(CBD)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AGREED ORDER - STIPULATION TO AMEND COMPLAINT: The undersigned counsel consent ( #16 Proposed Agreed Order in case 5:18-md-02809-KKC; #79 Proposed Agreed Order in case 5:18-cv-00056-KKC) to the filing of an Amended Complaint, without the need for motion practice, for the sole purpose of allowing plaintiff to add Plaintiff Audrey Gore, individually and as administrator of the estate of Ophelia Dubose, deceased, to the complaint. Sanders Phillips Grossman, LLC, counsel for Plaintiff Ophelia Dubose, was informed by Ms. Duboses next of kin, Audrey Gore, that Ms. Dubose passed away on June 23, 2017. As such plaintiff must amend her complaint to reflect this change in circumstance. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 3/23/208. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00056-KKC(CBD)cc: COR Modified text on 3/23/2018 (CBD).
March 22, 2018 Filing 24 PROPOSED AGREED STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Yvonne Sandoval, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Yvonne Sandoval. Re-filed per QC/Technical Issue re DE #23 in 5:18-cv-133 Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00133-KKC(CBD) Modified text on 4/19/2018 (CBD).
March 22, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re MDL Member Case; Error: Incorrect member case number inserted in docket text; Entry by docket clerk; Correction: text corrected to reflect that Ishman v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Comapny et al in Kentucky Eastern District was assigned 5:18-cv-87 pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order. cc: COR, JPML (TDA)
March 14, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Texas Western, 3:18-cv-00070, Telles v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-180 KKC pursuant to #18 Conditional Transfer Order 7 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
March 14, 2018 Filing 18 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. 7 from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Records requested from the transferor court(s) via email. cc: COR (CBD)
March 12, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: re (16 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 79 in 5:18-cv-00056-KKC) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation to Amend Complaint Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00056-KKC(CBD)
March 12, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Randi Kassan; Error 1: re Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation (16 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 79 in 5:18-cv-00056-KKC); the incorrect event "Stipulation" was selected. Entry by Attorney; Clerk re-defined the pleading as a "Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation." No further action required by counsel. Error 2: re Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation (16 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 79 in 5:18-cv-00056-KKC); attachment was insufficiently described as "Exhibit." Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachment. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel. Error 3: re Amended Complaint (80 in 5:18-cv-00056-KKC, 17 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC) An electronically submitted document requiring leave of Court shall be filed as an attachment to the motion and not as a separate entry. Correction: the clerk tendered the Amended Complaint. No further action required by counsel. cc cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00056-KKC(CBD)
March 9, 2018 Filing 17 TENDERED AMENDED COMPLAINT against AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation, filed by Ophelia Dubose.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00056-KKC(Kassan, Randi) Modified text on 3/12/2018 (CBD).
March 9, 2018 Filing 16 PROPOSED AGREED ORDER/STIPULATION to Amend Complaint by Ophelia Dubose. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Amended Complaint)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00056-KKC(Kassan, Randi) Modified text on 3/12/2018 (CBD).
March 9, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Randi Kassan re (26 in 5:18-cv-00123- KKC) Notice of Appearance, (7 in 5:18-cv-00170-KKC) Notice of Appearance. Error: Documents were filed in the member cases only. Pursuant to the court's Practice & Procedure Order ( #3 in 5:28-md-2809) attorney should have filed each of the documents identified above in the master case and spread text to each related member case; Entries by Attorney; Correction: Clerk has ensured counsel of record referenced in the Notices were added to the master and member cases. No further action required by counsel as to this error. cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00123-KKC, 5:18-cv-00170-KKC(CBD)
March 8, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Southern District of Ohio, 2:18-cv-00165, Lawrence et al v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-170 pursuant to #15 Conditional Transfer Order 6. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
March 8, 2018 Filing 15 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. 6 from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Records requested from the transferor court(s) via email. cc: COR (TDA)
March 6, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Pennsylvania Eastern, 2:18-cv-00263, Grimes v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-167 KKC pursuant to #12 Conditional Transfer Order 4 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
March 6, 2018 Filing 14 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Rayne Elizabeth Kessler re (8 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 8 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC Order, 9 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC Amended Order, 40 in 5:18-cv-00076-KKC Order, 41 in 5:18-cv-00076-KKC Amended Order). NOTE: Firm address updated to address shown at NJD entry 27 in 5:18-cv-76 and documents re-mailed this date. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00076-KKC(CBD)
March 6, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Western District of Virginia, 3:18-cv-12, Nesselrodt vs. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-164-KKC pursuant to #13 Conditional Transfer Order 5 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
March 5, 2018 Filing 13 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. 5 from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Records requested from the transferor court(s) via email. cc: COR (CBD)
March 2, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: North Carolina Middle, 1:18-cv-00046, Freeman v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-162 KKC pursuant to #12 Conditional Transfer Order 4 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
March 2, 2018 Filing 12 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. 4 from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Records requested from the transferor court(s) via email. cc: COR (CBD)
February 28, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: (67 in 5:18-cv-00056-KKC) Suggestion of Death of Ophelia Dubose. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00056-KKC(CBD)
February 26, 2018 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Michael K. Johnson re #39 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Ohio Southern. Case number 1:17-cv-00262. and Remark - MDL 2809 (Public) NOTE: Firm address corrected re DE #1 from OHSD and documents re-mailed this date. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00060-KKC(CBD)
February 23, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Western District of Pennsylvania, 3:18-cv-00021, McCay v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-155 pursuant to #7 Conditional Transfer Order 3. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
February 23, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Eastern District of Louisiana, 17-cv-12986, Jones v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-154-KKC pursuant to #4 Conditional Transfer Order 1 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
February 23, 2018 Clerk's Note re Tendered Summons (8 in 5:18-cv-00132-KKC, 10 in 5:18-md-02809-KKC): Clerk is unable to issue summons presented - improper format. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00132-KKC(CBD)
February 22, 2018 Party Natalie Ross added per LAED entry 22 Amended Complaint in 5:18-cv-150. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00150-KKC(CBD)
February 22, 2018 Filing 10 TENDERED Summons by Milton George, Milton George re DE 1 in 5:18-cv-132 KKC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC, 5:18-cv-00132-KKC(CBD)
February 22, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: KYED, 0:17-cv-131 KKC, Taylor v. Bristol-Meyer Squibb Co., Inc. et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-151 KKC. cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED ORDER STAYING ALL PROCEEDINGS IN ALL MEMBER CASES: In order to clarify the stipulated order to stay proceedings tendered by the parties and entered by the Court ( #8 in 5:18-md-2809, et al), the Court hereby ORDERS that the joint motion to stay deadlines ( #6 in 5:18-md-2809, et al) filed by the parties is GRANTED and all deadlines in all pending member cases, other than the deadlines set forth in the Court's Order Regarding Practice and Procedure ( #3 in 5:18-md-2809), are stayed pending further orders of the Court. All deadlines set forth in the Order Regarding Practice and Procedure ( #3 in 5:18-md-2809) remain in effect. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 2/22/2018.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR
February 22, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Louisiana Eastern, 2:17-cv-00443, Ross v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-150 KKC pursuant to #1 Transfer Order cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATED ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS: Plaintiffs and Defendants in this case have stipulated (DE #6 18-md-2809, et al) and agreed to entry of the following order staying proceedings in all pending cases. Good cause appearing therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that proceedings in all pending cases are hereby stayed pending further orders of the Court. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 2/22/2018.Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)cc: COR
February 21, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Louisiana Eastern, 2:17-cv-07884, Lester Speights v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-148 KKC pursuant to #1 Transfer Order cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
February 20, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Georgia Northern, 3:17-cv-00157, Hayes v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-145 KKC pursuant to #7 Conditional Transfer Order 3 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
February 20, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Georgia Northern, 3:17-cv-156, Merritt v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-144 KKC pursuant to #7 Conditional Transfer Order 3 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
February 20, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Southern District of Iowa, 17-cv-36, Moore v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-147-KKC pursuant to #7 Conditional Transfer Order 3 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
February 20, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Southern District of Texas, 4:17-cv-03321, Slaughter v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-146 pursuant to #4 Conditional Transfer Order 1. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
February 20, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Indiana Southern, 1:17-cv-04745, Yaa v. Bristol-Meyers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-141 KKC pursuant to #7 Conditional Transfer Order 3 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
February 20, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Georgia Middle, 5:17-cv-00419, Hunt v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-140 KKC pursuant to #7 Conditional Transfer Order 3 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
February 20, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Western District of Louisiana, 18-cv-120, Johnson vs. Bristol-Myers Squibb Co et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-139-KKC pursuant to #7 Conditional Transfer Order 3 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
February 20, 2018 Filing 7 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. 3 from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Records requested from the transferor court(s) via email. cc: COR (CBD)
February 16, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Middle District, 2:18-cv-00058, George v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-132 pursuant to #5 Conditional Transfer Order 2. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
February 16, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Georgia Northern, 1:17-cv-04934, Harris v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-108 KKC pursuant to #4 Conditional Transfer Order 1 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
February 16, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Eastern District of Oklahoma, 17-cv-409, McCall vs. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-137 pursuant to #4 Conditional Transfer Order 1 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
February 16, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern District of Ohio, 18-cv-190, Caldwell vs. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-136 pursuant to #4 Conditional Transfer Order 1 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
February 16, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern District of Ohio, 17-cv-2573, Campbell vs. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-135 pursuant to #4 Conditional Transfer Order 1 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
February 16, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern District of Ohio, 17-2333, Dinger Sr., vs. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-134 pursuant to #4 Conditional Transfer Order 1 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
February 16, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Western District of Louisiana, 17-cv-1501, Sandoval vs. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-133- pursuant to #4 Conditional Transfer Order 1 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
February 16, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Georgia Northern, :17-cv-04342, Green v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-131 KKC pursuant to #4 Conditional Transfer Order 1 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
February 16, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Illinois Central, 1:18-cv-01015, Adams v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-CV-130 kkc pursuant to #4 Conditional Transfer Order 1 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
February 16, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Western District of Louisiana, 17-cv-1535, Winborne vs. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-129 pursuant to #4 Conditional Transfer Order 1 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
February 16, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Eastern District of Missouri, 17-2867, Turner vs. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-128-KKC pursuant to #4 Conditional Transfer Order 1 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
February 16, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: District of Utah, 1:17-cv-00179, Medley v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-126 pursuant to #4 Conditional Transfer Order 1. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
February 16, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Florida Middle, 6:17-cv-02095, Garcia v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-115 KKC pursuant to #4 Conditional Transfer Order 1 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
February 16, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Florida Southern, 1:17-cv-24379, Holmes v. Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-113 KKC pursuant to #4 Conditional Transfer Order 1 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
February 16, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Western District of Missouri, 18-cv-4001, Lyles v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-127 pursuant to #4 Conditional Transfer Order 1 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
February 16, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern, 2:17-cv-02024, Hardy v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-112 pursuant to #1 Conditional Transfer Order 1 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
February 16, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Georgia Northern, 3:17-cv-00155, Nance v. Brystol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-110 KKC pursuant to #4 Conditional Transfer Order 1 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
February 16, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Indiana Southern, 4:17-cv-00207, Beeler v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-109 pursuant to #4 Conditional Transfer Order 1 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
February 16, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Arkansas Eastern,4:17-cv-00736, Goforth v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-105 KKC pursuant to #4 Conditional Transfer Order 1 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
February 15, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: South Carolina District, 4:17-03297, Epps v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-124 pursuant to #4 Conditional Transfer Order 1. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
February 15, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: DE 6 in (All Cases) 5:18-md-02809-KKC - MOTION to Stay Additional Deadlines in All Cases Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)
February 15, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: South Carolina District, 2:17-03167, Winkle v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-123 pursuant to #4 Conditional Transfer Order 1. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
February 15, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern District of Texas, 4:17-cv-00888, Davis v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-122 pursuant to #4 Conditional Transfer Order 1. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
February 15, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern District of Texas, 5:17-00253, Rosencranse v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-121 pursuant to #4 Conditional Transfer Order 1. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
February 15, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern District of Texas, 5:17-cv-00278, Lynn v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-120 pursuant to #4 Conditional Transfer Order 1. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
February 15, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Western District of Tennessee, 2:17-cv-02812, Word v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-118 pursuant to #4 Conditional Transfer Order 1. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
February 15, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Western District of Tennessee, 2:17-cv-02810, Silvers v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-117 pursuant to #4 Conditional Transfer Order 1. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
February 15, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Western District of Tennessee, 2:17-cv-02808, Jackson v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-116 pursuant to #4 Conditional Transfer Order 1. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
February 15, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: District of Maryland, 17-2974, Ellis vs. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al., Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-114-KKC pursuant to #4 Conditional Transfer Order 1 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
February 15, 2018 Attorney Update. Attorney Timothy J. Becker for Bobbie Brown,Timothy J. Becker for Donald Carpenter, Jr,Timothy J. Becker for Ronald Letell,Timothy J. Becker for Michael Martin Timothy J. Becker for Randolph Young, added. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)
February 15, 2018 Attorney Update. Attorney Phyllis Jones for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Phyllis Jones for Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Phyllis Jones for McKesson Corporation, Paul W. Schmidt for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Paul W. Schmidt for Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Paul W. Schmidt for McKesson Corporation, Emily S. Ullman for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Emily S. Ullman for Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Emily S. Ullman for McKesson Corporation, added. Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(CBD)
February 15, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: FLND, 3:17-cv-860, Mask v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:17-cv-860 pursuant to #4 Conditional Transfer Order 1 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
February 15, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern District of Mississippi, 17-cv-207, Stacy vs. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-111-KKC pursuant to #4 Conditional Transfer Order 1 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
February 15, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: ARWD, 3:17-cv-03110, Veloria v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-101 pursuant to #4 Conditional Transfer Order 1 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
February 15, 2018 Filing 6 JOINT MOTION to Stay Additional Deadlines in All Cases by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., McKesson Corporation Additional Deadlines in All Pending Cases (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:18-md-02809-KKC et al.(Browning, Carol) Modified text on 2/15/2018 (CBD).
February 15, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: COD, 1:17-cv-02798, Driver v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-100 pursuant to #4 Conditional Transfer Order 1 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
February 15, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: District of New Jersey, 17-4533, Johnson v. Bristol-Meyers Squibb Company, et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-107-KKC pursuant to #4 Conditional Transfer Order 1 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
February 15, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: District of New Jersey, 17-cv-3031, Williams vs. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-106 pursuant to #4 Conditional Transfer Order 1 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
February 15, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Distrcit of New Jersey, 17-cv-3027, Woods v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-102-KKC pursuant to #4 Conditional Transfer Order 1 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
February 15, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: ALND, 7:17-cv-2056, Lacy v. Bristol-Meyers Squibb Company et a Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-99 KKC pursuant to #4 Conditional Transfer Order 1 cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
February 15, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Western District of Kentucky, 17-cv-180, Barner v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-98-KKC pursuant to #4 Conditional Transfer Order 1 cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
February 15, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re MDL Member Case entered. Error: Incorrect text "LAMD, 3:17-cv-79" entered; Entry by clerk; Correction: Text corrected to reflect "LAMD, 3:17-cv-39." No further action required. cc: COR, JPML (CBD)
February 15, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: LAWD, 2:17-cv-553, Letell v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Co, et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-73 KKC pursuant to #1 Transfer Order cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
February 14, 2018 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. 2 from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Records requested from the transferor court(s) via email. cc: COR (CBD)
February 14, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern District of California, 3:17-cv-661, Martin vs. Bristol-Myers Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-95-KKC pursuant to #1 Transfer Order cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
February 14, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern District of California, 3:16-7152, Williams et al. vs. AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-94-KKC pursuant to #1 Transfer Order cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
February 14, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: District of New Jersey, 3:17-cv-03037, Sechler et al v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-92 pursuant to #1 Transfer Order. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
February 14, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: TNED, 1:17-cv-219, Campbell v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-90 KKC pursuant to #1 Transfer Order cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
February 14, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: District of New Jersey, 3:17-cv-03036, Asencio v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-91 pursuant to #1 Transfer Order. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
February 14, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: District of New Jersey, 3:17-cv-03035, Day v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-89 pursuant to #1 Transfer Order. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
February 14, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: District of New Jersey, 3:17-cv-03034, Atkins, Sr. v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-88 pursuant to #1 Transfer Order. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
February 13, 2018 Filing 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. 1 from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Records requested from the transferor court(s) via email. cc: COR (CBD)
February 13, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: District of New Jersey, 3:17-cv-03033, Ishman v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-87 pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA) Modified text on 3/22/2018 (TDA).
February 13, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: District of New Jersey, 3:17-cv-03032, Green v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-86 pursuant to #1 Transfer Order. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
February 13, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: District of New Jersey, 3:17-cv-03030, McAfee v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-85 pursuant to #1 Transfer Order. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
February 13, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: District of New Jersey, 3:17-cv-03029, Talton v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-84 pursuant to #1 Transfer Order. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
February 13, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: District of New Jersey, 3:17-cv-03028, Binns v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-83 pursuant to #1 Transfer Order. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
February 13, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: District of New Jersey, 3:17-cv-03026, Mitchell v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-82 pursuant to #1 Transfer Order. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
February 13, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: District of New Jersey, 3:17-cv-03024, Reeves et al v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-80 pursuant to #1 Transfer Order. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
February 13, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern District of Georgia, 1:17-cv-2916, Johnson v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-81-KKC pursuant to #1 Transfer Order cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
February 13, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: TXND, 4:17-cv-50, Boller v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-72 KKC pursuant to #1 Transfer Order cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
February 13, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern District of Georgia, 1:17-cv-2915, York vs. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-79-KKC pursuant to #1 Transfer Order cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
February 13, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: District of New Jersey, 3:17-cv-00347, Young v. Bristol Myers Squibb Company, et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-76 pursuant to #1 Transfer Order. cc: COR, JPMDL (TDA)
February 13, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern District of Georgia, 1:17-cv-2782, Turner vs. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-78-KKC pursuant to #1 Transfer Order cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
February 13, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: LAMD, 3:17-cv-39, Brown v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-71 KKA pursuant to #1 Transfer Order cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD) Modified text on 2/15/2018 (CBD).
February 13, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern District of Georgia, 1:17-cv-1503, Reid vs. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-77-KKC pursuant to #1 Transfer Order cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
February 13, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: NCMD, 5:17-cv-710, Holland V. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-70 KKC pursuant to #1 Transfer Order cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
February 13, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: OKED, 6:17-cv-327, Hulbert v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-69 KKC pursuant to #1 Transfer Order. cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
February 13, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re MDL Member Case ; Error: Incorrect text "TXSD Case No. 2:17-cv-245" entered; Entry by Clerk; Correction: Text modified to reflect "TXSD 2:17-cv-145."; No further action required. cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
February 13, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: TXSD, 2:17-cv-145, Davila v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-68 KKC pursuant to #1 Transfer Order. cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD) Modified text on 2/13/2018 (CBD).
February 13, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: TXED, 1:17-cv-111, Ware v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-67 KKC pursuant to #1 Transfer Order. cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
February 13, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Southern District of Indiana, 1:17-cv-2607, Cousins vs. Bristol Myers squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-74-KKC pursuant to #1 Transfer Order cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
February 13, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: District of Idaho, 1:17-cv-321, Christensen v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-66-KKC pursuant to #1 Transfer Order cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
February 12, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: District of Arizona, 2:17-cv-1269, Settle v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-65-KKC pursuant to #1 Conditional Transfer Order cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
February 12, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: TXSD, 4:17-cv-316, Chester v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-64 pursuant to #1 Conditional Transfer Order. cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
February 12, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern District of Indiana, 1:17-cv-330, Miller vs. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-63-KKC pursuant to #1 Transfer Order cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
February 12, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: TNMD, 3:17-cv-01202, Wilcox v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-61 KKC pursuant to #1 Transfer Order. cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
February 12, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Western District of Kentucky, 3:17-cv-268, Tucker v. Bristol Myers Squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-CV-62 pursuant to #1 Transfer Order cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
February 12, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: OHSD, 1:17-cv-262, Carpenter v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-60 pursuant to #1 Transfer Order. cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
February 12, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Middle District of Alabama, 3:17-00265, Vallentine v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al. Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-CV-57-KKC pursuant to #1 Transfer Order cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
February 12, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: SCD, 4:17-cv-1695, Dubose v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-56 KKC pursuant to #1 JPML Transfer Order. cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
February 12, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: EDKY, 2:17-cv-124, Barnes v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-54 KKC pursuant to #1 Transfer Order. cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
February 12, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern District of Alabama, 5:17-CV-00101, Peoples v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-55 pursuant to #1 JPML Transfer Order cc: COR, JPMDL (MRS)
February 12, 2018 MEMBER CASE OPENED: EDKY, 5:16-cv-260, Taylor, et al v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc. et al Opened in Kentucky Eastern District as 5:18-cv-53 KKC pursuant to #1 JPML Transfer Order. cc: COR, JPMDL (CBD)
February 12, 2018 Party David Taylor, Leatha Taylor, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, IPR Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and McKesson Corporation added. (CBD)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE UPON TRANSFER: (1) The actions are consolidated for all pre-trial purposes. (2) Any document filed in these actions shall bear the identification "MDL Docket No. 2809," and shall indicate to which of these actions it applies. Counsel must use the caption as it appears above. When the filing relates to all of these consolidated actions, the MDL docket number shall be followed only by the notation "ALL CASES." If the filing does not relate to all of these actions, the individual docket numbers assigned by the Clerk of this Court (as updated on the Courts web site) to those actions to which the filing relates shall also be listed. (3) Any document which is to be filed in any of these actions shall be filed with the Clerk of this Court and not with the transferor district court. (4) Counsel who appeared in the transferor district court prior to the transfer need not enter a separate appearance before this Court. Nonresident attorneys in any of these actions will not be required to apply for permission to appear or obtain local counsel in this district, and the requirements of Local Rules 83.1 and 83.2 of this Court are waived as to any attorney appearing in these actions who is duly admitted to practice before any United States District Court. (5) All attorneys must be registered with this Courts Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system no later than 21 days from the date of entry of this Order or from the date a particular action is transferred to this court, absent application to the Court for relief from this requirement, and all filings in these actions must be made electronically via the CM/ECF system. (6) All filings shall be served electronically on each of the attorneys on the attorney service list that is continually updated in the CM/ECF Master File. A distribution list should not be included on documents filed in this Court; rather, a certificate of service stating that all attorneys appearing on the attorney service list were served is sufficient. (7) Any document filed in any of these actions which is substantially identical to any other document filed in another of these actions shall be sufficient if it incorporates by reference the document to which it is substantially identical. Where counsel for multiple parties plan to file substantially identical documents, they shall join in the submission of such documents and shall file only one document on behalf of all the parties so joined. (8) The Court will be guided by the Manual for Complex Litigation, Fourth, approved by the Judicial Conference of the United States. (9) Hearings shall not be held on any motions filed except by order of the Court and upon such notice as the Court may direct. (10) Any orders, including protective orders, previously entered by any transferor district court shall remain in full force and effect unless modified by this Court upon application. (11) All discovery proceedings in these actions, other than discovery previously scheduled by agreement of counsel, are stayed until further order of this Court, and the time requirements to perform any acts or file any papers pursuant to Rules 26 through 37 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure are tolled until a discovery schedule is established in this consolidated action. (12) The Clerk is directed to serve this Order to counsel of record in the above cases and counsel in any additional case that may be filed, removed, or transferred to the Court in this matter. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 2/9/2018.(CBD)cc: COR (Main Document 3 replaced on 2/14/2018) (CBD).
February 2, 2018 Filing 1 TRANSFER ORDER re JPML No. 2809 from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Records requested from the transferor court(s) via email. cc: COR, JPML (CBD) Modified cc on 2/11/2018 (CBD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Onglyza (Saxagliptin) and Kombiglyze (Saxagliptin and Metformin) Products Liability Litigation MDL 2809
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onglyza (Saxagliptin) and Kombiglyze (Saxagliton and Metformin) Products Liability Litigation MDL 2809
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Lawton Cole Callihan
Represented By: Chelsea R. Kurth
Represented By: Carol Dan Browning
Represented By: Tenley Armstrong
Represented By: Ursula Marie Henninger
Represented By: F Laurens Brock
Represented By: Robert Bruce Hurley, Jr
Represented By: David B Rosenbaum
Represented By: Emily S. Ullman
Represented By: Stephen Donald Polito
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Joseph P. Thomas
Represented By: Dawn L Dauphine
Represented By: Ericka Downie
Represented By: Joshua A. Klarfeld
Represented By: Katherine D. Althoff
Represented By: Elijah Martin Watkins
Represented By: E. Paige Sensenbrenner
Represented By: Sara Sofia Svedberg
Represented By: Gregory Lawrence Halperin
Represented By: Bart Clohesey Sullivan
Represented By: Diana Cole Surprenant
Represented By: Donald Frederick Zimmer, Jr.
Represented By: Cannon F. Allen
Represented By: Andrew T. Bayman
Represented By: Jeffrey Jerome Hines
Represented By: Marguerite S. Willis
Represented By: Amy K. Fisher
Represented By: Chelsea R. Hanner Kurth
Represented By: Robert K. Woo, Jr.
Represented By: Lauren E.H. DiFrancesco
Represented By: Cameron James Hoyler
Represented By: Kimberly Lewis Beck
Represented By: Paul J. Cosgrove
Represented By: John E McElligott, Jr
Represented By: William B. Monk
Represented By: Amy Sherry Fischer
Represented By: Gavin J. Rooney
Represented By: Kathleen Thompson Deanda
Represented By: Meredith B. Redwine
Represented By: William Edward Steimle
Represented By: Paul W. Schmidt
Represented By: F. Laurens Brock
Represented By: John E. McElligott, Jr
Represented By: Stephen B. Devereaux
Represented By: Phyllis Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Inc.
Represented By: Lawton Cole Callihan
Represented By: Chelsea R. Kurth
Represented By: Carol Dan Browning
Represented By: Tenley Armstrong
Represented By: Ursula Marie Henninger
Represented By: F Laurens Brock
Represented By: Robert Bruce Hurley, Jr
Represented By: Clarence A. Wilbon
Represented By: David B Rosenbaum
Represented By: Emily S. Ullman
Represented By: Craig Laurence Dashiell
Represented By: Stephen Donald Polito
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Joseph P. Thomas
Represented By: Dawn L Dauphine
Represented By: Mary Roxana Rudolph
Represented By: Ericka Downie
Represented By: Joshua A. Klarfeld
Represented By: Katherine D. Althoff
Represented By: Elijah Martin Watkins
Represented By: E. Paige Sensenbrenner
Represented By: Sara Sofia Svedberg
Represented By: Gregory Lawrence Halperin
Represented By: Bart Clohesey Sullivan
Represented By: Diana Cole Surprenant
Represented By: Amber Davis
Represented By: Adam Patrick O'Brien
Represented By: Donald Frederick Zimmer, Jr.
Represented By: Cannon F. Allen
Represented By: Andrew T. Bayman
Represented By: Rocklan W. King, III
Represented By: Jeffrey Jerome Hines
Represented By: Marguerite S. Willis
Represented By: Amy K. Fisher
Represented By: Chelsea R. Hanner Kurth
Represented By: Steven W. Quattlebaum
Represented By: Robert K. Woo, Jr.
Represented By: Lauren E.H. DiFrancesco
Represented By: Cameron James Hoyler
Represented By: Mary Alice Wells
Represented By: Kimberly Lewis Beck
Represented By: Paul J. Cosgrove
Represented By: Timothy Michael Clark
Represented By: John E McElligott, Jr
Represented By: William B. Monk
Represented By: Amy Sherry Fischer
Represented By: Gavin J. Rooney
Represented By: Kathleen Thompson Deanda
Represented By: Meredith B. Redwine
Represented By: William Edward Steimle
Represented By: Ashley Crooks
Represented By: Paul W. Schmidt
Represented By: F. Laurens Brock
Represented By: Stephanie McGee Rippee
Represented By: John E. McElligott, Jr
Represented By: Stephen B. Devereaux
Represented By: Phyllis Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP
Represented By: Lawton Cole Callihan
Represented By: Chelsea R. Kurth
Represented By: Carol Dan Browning
Represented By: Tenley Armstrong
Represented By: Ursula Marie Henninger
Represented By: F Laurens Brock
Represented By: Robert Bruce Hurley, Jr
Represented By: Clarence A. Wilbon
Represented By: David B Rosenbaum
Represented By: Emily S. Ullman
Represented By: Craig Laurence Dashiell
Represented By: Stephen Donald Polito
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Joseph P. Thomas
Represented By: Dawn L Dauphine
Represented By: Mary Roxana Rudolph
Represented By: Ericka Downie
Represented By: Joshua A. Klarfeld
Represented By: Katherine D. Althoff
Represented By: Elijah Martin Watkins
Represented By: E. Paige Sensenbrenner
Represented By: Sara Sofia Svedberg
Represented By: Gregory Lawrence Halperin
Represented By: Bart Clohesey Sullivan
Represented By: Diana Cole Surprenant
Represented By: Amber Davis
Represented By: Adam Patrick O'Brien
Represented By: Donald Frederick Zimmer, Jr.
Represented By: Cannon F. Allen
Represented By: Andrew T. Bayman
Represented By: Rocklan W. King, III
Represented By: Jeffrey Jerome Hines
Represented By: Marguerite S. Willis
Represented By: Amy K. Fisher
Represented By: Chelsea R. Hanner Kurth
Represented By: Steven W. Quattlebaum
Represented By: Robert K. Woo, Jr.
Represented By: Lauren E.H. DiFrancesco
Represented By: Cameron James Hoyler
Represented By: Mary Alice Wells
Represented By: Kimberly Lewis Beck
Represented By: Paul J. Cosgrove
Represented By: John E McElligott, Jr
Represented By: William B. Monk
Represented By: Amy Sherry Fischer
Represented By: Gavin J. Rooney
Represented By: Kathleen Thompson Deanda
Represented By: Meredith B. Redwine
Represented By: William Edward Steimle
Represented By: Ashley Crooks
Represented By: Paul W. Schmidt
Represented By: F. Laurens Brock
Represented By: Stephanie McGee Rippee
Represented By: John E. McElligott, Jr
Represented By: Stephen B. Devereaux
Represented By: Phyllis Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IPR Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca LP
Represented By: Emily S. Ullman
Represented By: Phyllis Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Settle
Represented By: Douglas H. Sanders
Represented By: Randi Alyson Kassan
Represented By: Timothy Michael Clark
Represented By: Laraclay Drake Parker
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles David Ware
Represented By: Randi Alyson Kassan
Represented By: Timothy Michael Clark
Represented By: Laraclay Drake Parker
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Dinger Sr.
Represented By: Douglas H. Sanders
Represented By: Randi Alyson Kassan
Represented By: Timothy Michael Clark
Represented By: Laraclay Drake Parker
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Caldwell
Represented By: Randi Alyson Kassan
Represented By: Timothy Michael Clark
Represented By: Laraclay Drake Parker
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mattie Holmes
Represented By: Bryan F. Aylstock
Represented By: Randi Alyson Kassan
Represented By: Timothy Michael Clark
Represented By: Laraclay Drake Parker
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Vallentine
Represented By: Bryan F. Aylstock
Represented By: Randi Alyson Kassan
Represented By: Timothy Michael Clark
Represented By: Mathew Bernard Richardson
Represented By: Laraclay Drake Parker
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrie Winborne
Represented By: Laurin M. Jacobsen
Represented By: Daniel John Carr
Represented By: Timothy Michael Clark
Represented By: Laraclay Drake Parker
Represented By: Alfred A. Olinde, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Driver
Represented By: Daniel John Carr
Represented By: Jasper Duduley Ward, IV
Represented By: Timothy Michael Clark
Represented By: Laraclay Drake Parker
Represented By: Alfred A. Olinde, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Davila
Represented By: Randi Alyson Kassan
Represented By: Timothy Michael Clark
Represented By: Laraclay Drake Parker
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Rochelle Holland
Represented By: Bryan F. Aylstock
Represented By: Lauren Aliz Welling
Represented By: Ephraim Samuel Geisler
Represented By: Neil D. Overholtz
Represented By: Joel Robert Rhine
Represented By: Timothy Michael Clark
Represented By: Laraclay Drake Parker
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Campbell
Represented By: Lauren Aliz Welling
Represented By: Daniel John Carr
Represented By: Timothy Michael Clark
Represented By: Laraclay Drake Parker
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Sandoval
Represented By: Randi Alyson Kassan
Represented By: Christopher L. Coffin
Represented By: Timothy Michael Clark
Represented By: Laraclay Drake Parker
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Taylor
Represented By: Alex C. Davis
Represented By: Jasper Duduley Ward, IV
Represented By: Timothy Michael Clark
Represented By: Sean A. McCarty
Represented By: Laraclay Drake Parker
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Word
Represented By: Randi Alyson Kassan
Represented By: Timothy Michael Clark
Represented By: Laraclay Drake Parker
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Turner
Represented By: Brandon Michael Wise
Represented By: Daniel John Carr
Represented By: Timothy Michael Clark
Represented By: Paul Lesko
Represented By: Laraclay Drake Parker
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Woods
Represented By: Shayna E. Sacks
Represented By: Timothy Michael Clark
Represented By: Laraclay Drake Parker
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall McCall
Represented By: Randi Alyson Kassan
Represented By: Timothy Michael Clark
Represented By: Laraclay Drake Parker
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Atkins, Sr.
Represented By: Shayna E. Sacks
Represented By: Timothy Michael Clark
Represented By: Laraclay Drake Parker
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Reid
Represented By: Douglas H. Sanders
Represented By: Randi Alyson Kassan
Represented By: Michael Brandon Smith
Represented By: Timothy Michael Clark
Represented By: Laraclay Drake Parker
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Lynn
Represented By: Daniel John Carr
Represented By: Hunter Vance Linville
Represented By: Timothy Michael Clark
Represented By: Laraclay Drake Parker
Represented By: Alfred A. Olinde, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donielle Cousins
Represented By: Lauren Aliz Welling
Represented By: Randi Alyson Kassan
Represented By: Timothy Michael Clark
Represented By: Laraclay Drake Parker
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleotha Silvers
Represented By: Randi Alyson Kassan
Represented By: Timothy Michael Clark
Represented By: Laraclay Drake Parker
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethel Green
Represented By: Douglas H. Sanders
Represented By: Randi Alyson Kassan
Represented By: Timothy Michael Clark
Repres