Brumback v. Wurth Baer Supply Company

Plaintiff: Steven D. Brumback
Defendant: Wurth Baer Supply Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00010
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
0 Judge: Joseph M Hood
1 Judge: Matthew A Stinnett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: It is ORDERED as follows: 1. All discovery disputes are REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge (Stinnett); 2. The Court encourages early and economic case resolution. Parties may mediate at any time through a private mediator. If parties request a settlement conference, they shall file a joint motion; 3. Motion to Amend Pleadings & Join Additional parties due by 3/31/2019; 4. All written discovery completed by 2/21/2019; 5. Fact discovery due by 5/31/2019, Opinion discovery due by 7/15/2019; 6. Identity & reports from expert or opinion witnesses due by Plaintiff 6/1/2019, Defendant 7/1/2019; 7. Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2019; 8. Motions in limine, including daubert motions filed NLT 10/1/2019; 9. Motion practice shall be governed by Local Rule 7.1; 10. At least 1 week before final PTC, counsel shall file: a. exhibit lists, b. Premark & display exhibits intended for trial, c. witness lists, d. pretrial memorandum, e. agreed proposed jury instruction; 11. FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 10/21/2019 at 11:30 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Joseph M. Hood; 12. JURY TRIAL set for 11/19/2019 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Joseph M. Hood.Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 2/4/2019.(KM)cc: COR,D,JC
February 4, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: #14 Status Report (KJR)
February 1, 2019 Filing 14 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Wurth Baer Supply Company, Steven D. Brumback. (Lawrence, Walker) Modified text on 2/4/2019 (KJR).
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AMENDED ORDER re #12 Order on Motion for Default Judgment: DENYING AS MOOT pla's #5 Notice of Filing w/ Motion for Default Judgment attached, which was initially filed in state court. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 2/1/19.(KJR)cc: COR
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: DENYING pla's #5 Notice of Filing w/ Motion for Default Judgment attached, which was initially filed in state court. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 2/1/19. (KJR)cc: COR Modified text on 2/1/2019 (KJR).
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #8 Motion for Mitchell S. Chaban to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #9 Motion for Walker R. Lawrence to Appear Pro Hac Vice, & #10 Motion for Howard L. Teplinsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Wurth Baer Supply Company. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 1/16/2019. (JJ)cc: COR, Mitchell S. Chaban, Walker R. Lawrence, & Howard L. Teplinsky ECF Registration Form
January 16, 2019 Attorney Update. Attorney Howard L. Teplinsky,Walker R. Lawrence,Mitchell S. Chaban for Wurth Baer Supply Company added. (JLM)
January 16, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re #8 MOTION for Mitchell S. Chaban to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Wurth Baer Supply Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4261490), #9 MOTION for Walker R. Lawrence to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Wurth Baer Supply Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4261497), #10 MOTION for Howard L. Teplinsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Wurth Baer Supply Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4261505) (JLM)
January 16, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed re #9 MOTION for Walker R. Lawrence to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Wurth Baer Supply Company, #8 MOTION for Mitchell S. Chaban to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Wurth Baer Supply Company #10 MOTION for Howard L. Teplinsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Wurth Baer Supply Company . (JLM)
January 15, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Howard L. Teplinsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Wurth Baer Supply Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4261505) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Compliance)(Moorman, Keith)
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Walker R. Lawrence to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Wurth Baer Supply Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4261497) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Compliance)(Moorman, Keith)
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Mitchell S. Chaban to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Wurth Baer Supply Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4261490) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Compliance)(Moorman, Keith)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED as follows: 1. that within 21 days from date of service of this Order, the parties shall meet to discuss the nature and basis of theirclaims and defenses and the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case, to make or arrange for the disclosures, and to develop a proposed discovery plan; 2. Within 10 days after the meeting the parties shall file a joint status report. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 1/15/2019.(KM)cc: COR
January 15, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: #4 Answer to Complaint (KJR)
January 15, 2019 MOTION for Default Judgment filed in State Court at DE #5 Notice of Filing. (KJR)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #5 Notice of Filing & #6 Motion for Default filed by Wurth Baer Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant's Answer to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Motion for Default)(Moorman, Keith) Modified text on 1/15/2019 (KJR).
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING by Wurth Baer Supply Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Motion for Default)(Moorman, Keith)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Wurth Baer Supply Company.(Moorman, Keith)
January 11, 2019 Conflict Check run. (STC)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wurth Baer Supply Company identifying Corporate Parent Wurth Wood-Division Holding LLC for Wurth Baer Supply Company. (STC)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Woodford Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-00348. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4258737), filed by Wurth Baer Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(STC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brumback v. Wurth Baer Supply Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wurth Baer Supply Company
Represented By: Janine Lisa Tate
Represented By: Keith Moorman
Represented By: Howard L. Teplinsky
Represented By: Mitchell S. Chaban
Represented By: Walker R. Lawrence
Represented By: Janine Tate Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven D. Brumback
Represented By: James N. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?