Lorentz II v. Prather et al
Plaintiff: John Lorentz II
Defendant: LM General Insurance Company and Lori C. Prather
Case Number: 5:2019cv00011
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Referring Judge: Matthew A Stinnett
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #9 Status Report filed by LM General Insurance Company. 1. The deadlines contained in the Scheduling Order [Record No. 7] are SUSPENDED, pending further orders. 2. Within thirty days, the parties are directed to tender a proposed Agreed Order of Dismissal, with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 3/5/19.(JLM)cc: COR
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT by LM General Insurance Company. (Johnson, Christopher)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) exchange Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by 2/25/19; (2) plt disclose experts by 6/13/2019; dft by 7/12/2019; (3) supplementation due w/in 30 days of discovery of new info but NLT 30 days prior to close of discovery; (4) Discovery due by 9/13/2019; (5) discovery disputes referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge (Stinnett); (6) All motions for extension of time referred to undersigned for disposition; (7) parties may not, by agreement, extend deadlines set forth in this Scheduling Order; (8) motions to amend pleadings, join parties due from plt by 8/26/2019; from dft by 9/26/2019. (9) Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 11/11/2019; (10) by 2/18/2020, witness list, exhibit list, pretrial memo due; (11) by 2/18/2020, pre-mark exhibits and provide to opposing counsel; (12) Agreed Proposed Jury Instructions due by 2/24/2020; (13) obj to use of depos or admissibility of exhibits due by 2/24/2020; (14) pretrial filings submitted by Chambers by email. No ex parte communications w/ Court; (15) submit copy of exhibits to Chambers by 3/02/2020; (16) JURY TRIAL set for 3/9/2020 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Danny C. Reeves; counsel present at 8:30 AM; 5 days for trial; (17) JOINT Status Report due first Monday of each month; (18) use services of private mediator if seek to mediate dispute. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 2/15/19.(JLM)cc: COR,JC,D
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Felsen, Liam)
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Liam Ethan Felsen on behalf of LM General Insurance Company (Felsen, Liam)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: It is ORDERED as follows: 1. NLT 30 days from the date of entry of this order, parties shall conduct meeting of parties to discuss the possibilities of prompt settlement or resolution of the case and to develop a proposed discovery plan; 2. At the meeting, counsel for the parties shall exchange the disclosures and, in the future, make supplemental disclosures when required; 3. NLT 10 days after meeting, the parties shall file a joint written report outlining the proposed discovery plan. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 1/15/19. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form)(JLM)cc: COR
January 11, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by LM General Insurance Company. (Filed in State Court, see doc. #1 ) (JLM)
January 11, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Lori C. Prather. (Filed in State Court, see doc. #1 ) (JLM)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LM General Insurance Company. (JLM)
January 11, 2019 Conflict Check run. (JLM)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fayette Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-1538. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4258581), filed by LM General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLM) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/15/2019) (STC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lorentz II v. Prather et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LM General Insurance Company
Represented By: Douglas W. Langdon
Represented By: Nolan Miller Jackson
Represented By: Christopher G. Johnson
Represented By: Liam Ethan Felsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori C. Prather
Represented By: David G. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lorentz II
Represented By: Shea W. Conley
Represented By: Jonathan A. Rabinowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?