Adams v. S&M Automotive, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Cathy Adams
Defendant: S&M Automotive, LLC and Nissan North America, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00027
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Referring Judge: Matthew A Stinnett
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Cathy Adams of Service of Answers to written discovery (Sampson, Jeffrey)
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Cathy Adams.(Sampson, Jeffrey)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) NLT 3/8/2019, parties shall exchange information required by Rule 26(a)(1). These disclosures need not be filed in the record. (2) Fact discovery shall be completed NLT 5/31/2019. (3) NLT 6/14/2019, plaintiff shall disclose the identity of expert witness. NLT 8/30/2019, the defendant shall disclose the identity of expert witnesses. (4) Supplementation shall be due within 30 days of discovery of new information, but by no later than 30 days prior to the close of discovery. (5) NLT 10/1/2019, parties shall complete all discovery. (6) All discovery disputes are referred to the United States Magistrate Judge selected by random draw (Magistrate Judge Mathew A. Stinnett). (7) All motions for extensions of time shall be referred to the undersigned for dispositions. The parties are advised that such motions are not favored and must be accompanied by a memorandum and affidavit of counsel outlining sufficient grounds for granting the relief sought. (8) Parties may not, by agreement, extend any of the deadlines set forth in this Scheduling Order. Extensions regarding these matters require approval of the Court. (9) NLT 4/1/2019, plaintiff shall file motions to amend pleadings and/or joint additional parties. NLT 4/30/2019, defendants shall file any motions to amend pleadings and/or join additional parties. (10) NLT 11/1/2019, parties shall file al dispositive motions and Daubert motions. (11) On or before 2/18/2020, counsel shall submit pretrial filings to the Court's chambers. (12) On or before 2/24/2020, counsel shall pre-mark and number all exhibits. (13) On or before 3/2/2020, counsel shall file with the Clerk and submit to the Court, Agreed Proposed Jury Instructions with supporting authorities. (14) On or before 3/2/2020, counsel shall file with the Clerk and submit to the Court, any objections. (15) The above listed pretrial filings may be submitted to the undersigned at reeves_chambers@kyed.uscourts.gov. (16) NLT 3/9/2020, parties shall submit a copy of each exhibit to the Court's chambers. (17) JURY TRIAL set for 3/16/2020 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Danny C. Reeves, with counsel to be present at 8:30 a.m. Trial is anticipated for 5 days. (18) The parties are directed to file a joint status report the first Monday of each month. Failure to timely comply with this requirement shall result in the matter being set for a status conference, requiring the attendance of counsel and the parties. (19) Parties are directed to use the service of a private mediator in the event they seek to mediate their dispute. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 2/27/2019.(JJ)cc: COR,D,JC
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Jackson, Christopher)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 VIRTUAL ORDER: GRANTING John Randolph Bibb, Jr.'s #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Nissan North America, Inc. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 2/25/19. (KJR)cc: COR
February 25, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to John Randolph Bibb, Jr re #5 MOTION for John Randolph Bibb, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nissan North America, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4294090). (KJR)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for John Randolph Bibb, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nissan North America, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4294090) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Jackson, Christopher)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. NLT 30 days, counsel conduct Rule 26(f) meeting to discuss possibilities for prompt resolution and to develop proposed discovery plan; 2. At time of meeting, parties exchange Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures; 3. NLT 10 days after meeting, file written joint report re discovery plan. Consent forms attached. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 1/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 AO 85)(STC)cc: COR
January 29, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Reeves for review: Answer to Complaint, #1 Notice of Removal, (STC)
January 29, 2019 Conflict Check run. (STC)
January 28, 2019 AGREED ORDER OF VOLUNTARY PARTIAL DISMISSAL: Claims of plaintiff against S&M Automotive, LLC dismissed with prejudice. (Filed in state court and attached herein at #1 ). (STC)cc: COR
January 28, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Nissan North America, Inc. (Filed in state court and attached herein at #1 ).(STC)
January 28, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by S&M Automotive, LLC. (Filed in state court and attached herein at #1 ).(STC)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nissan North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. for Nissan North America, Inc. (STC)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Woodford Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-00220. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4271282), filed by Nissan North America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Agreed Order of Partial Dismissal, #3 Exhibit C Conley Affidavit, #4 Exhibit D State Court Record, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(STC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. S&M Automotive, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S&M Automotive, LLC
Represented By: John Michael S. Carter
Represented By: Luke Alan Wingfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Lyle Jackson
Represented By: John Randolph Bibb, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Adams
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Sampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?