Willoughby v. Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Haley Willoughby
Defendant: Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00041
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 OPINION & ORDER: Willoughby's #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court is GRANTED, and this matter is REMANDED to the Powell Circuit Court. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 4/5/2019.(JJ)cc: COR, Powell Co. Circuit via US Mail
April 2, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: #8 Notice to Attorney (No response) (JLM)
March 18, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Haley Willoughby (JLM)
February 27, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Haley Willoughby filed by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Barfield, Mindy)
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Megan Hughes Richmond by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 Admission Packet, #2 Routing Form)(JLM)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Haley Willoughby (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum to Support Remand, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Affidavit Stipulation of Damages, #3 Proposed Order Order Remanding to State Court)(Richardson, Paula)
February 13, 2019 Attorney Update. Attorney Shadette Page Johnson for Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company added. Attorney Shaye Johnson terminated. (JLM)
February 13, 2019 Clerk's Note: re #5 Notice to Attorney. Attorney called and advised her first name is actually Shadette and not Shaye, which was on the pleading. She is admitted here and the docket sheet will be updated accordingly. (JLM)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: (1) w/in 21 days, parties meet to discuss nature and basis of claims and defenses and possibilities for prompt resolution, make FRCP Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures and develop proposed discovery plan; (2) w/in 10 days after meeting, file joint status report, Form 52. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 2/13/19.(JLM)cc: COR,Atty Johnson via US Mail. Modified text on 2/13/2019 (JLM).
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Shaye Johnson by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 Application)(JLM)Mailed via U.S. mail.
February 13, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: #1 Notice of Removal (JLM)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE: All parties and counsel are hereby notified that the undersigned's stepson, Lloyd R. Cress, Jr., is employed as a non-equity member of Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP. (JLM)
February 8, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (See doc. #1 ) (JLM)
February 8, 2019 Conflict Check run. (JLM)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate Allstate Corporation, Other Affiliate Allstate Holdings, LLC for Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (JLM)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Powell Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-00004. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4280589), filed by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Exhibit A, #2 State Court Record Exhibit B Correspondence and Claim Diary Notes, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willoughby v. Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haley Willoughby
Represented By: Megan Hughes Richmond
Represented By: Paula Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Jamie Wilhite Dittert
Represented By: Shaye Johnson
Represented By: Mindy G. Barfield
Represented By: Ernest H. Jones, II
Represented By: Shadette Page Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?