Stover v. Amazon.Com,LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas Stover
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc., AMZN WACS LLC and Amazon.Com,LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00054
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Referring Judge: Matthew A Stinnett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101et
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: 1) All discovery disputes are hereby REFERRED to a magistrate judge, to be assigned by random draw (Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett), for appropriate resolution. 2) The Court encourages early and economic case resolution. 3) Parties shall make initial disclosures on or before 4/13/2019. 4) All motions to amend the pleadings and join additional parties must be made on or before 6/24/2019. 5) All discovery must be completed on or before 9/6/2019. 6) Plaintiff's expert witness disclosures on or before 6/14/2019, and Defendant's expert witness disclosures due on or before 7/16/2019. Plaintiff's rebuttal, if necessary, due on or before 8/16/2019. 7) All dispositive motions due on or before 10/7/2019. 8) All motion in limine due on or before 11/7/2019. 9) Motion practice shall be governed by Local Rule 7.1 except as otherwise provided in this order. 10) Pretrial filings due at least one week before the final pretrial conference. 11) FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 2/3/2020 at 11:30 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Joseph M. Hood. 12) JURY TRIAL set for 3/10/2020 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Joseph M. Hood(4 Days). Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 4/5/2019.(JJ)cc: COR,D,JC
April 1, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: #11 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (STC)
March 29, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Laren, Sarah)
March 22, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER from Secretary of State, Legal Division re #3 Summons Issued. SOS unable to process summons for following reason: Filing fee not included. Summons returned to counsel via U.S. Mail this date for service via Secretary of State. (STC)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: 1) w/in 21 days, parties meet to discuss nature and basis of claims and defenses and possibilities for prompt resolution of case, make FRCP 26(a)(1) disclosures, and develop proposed discovery plan; 2) w/in 10 days after meeting, file joint status report. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 3/12/2019.(STC)cc: COR
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by AMZN WACS LLC, Amazon.Com,LLC, Amazon.com, Inc.. (Inman, J.)
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AMZN WACS LLC, Amazon.Com,LLC, Amazon.com, Inc.. (Laren, Sarah)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by AMZN WACS LLC, Amazon.Com,LLC, Amazon.com, Inc..(Laren, Sarah)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT to Secretary of State re #3 Summons Issued. (KM)
February 19, 2019 Conflict Check run. (STC)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AMZN WACS LLC, Amazon.Com,LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel by U.S. Mail for service by KY Secretary of State. (STC)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Amazon.com, Inc.; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically for service. (STC)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4287837), filed by Nicholas Stover. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 EEOC Notice of Right to Sue, #2 Exhibit 2 Accommodation Request March, #3 Exhibit 3 Accommodation Request April, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Tendered, Amazon.com, LLC, #6 Summons Tendered AMZN, #7 Summons Tendered, Amazon.com, Inc.)(STC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stover v. Amazon.Com,LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Elisabeth Laren
Represented By: J. Andrew Inman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMZN WACS LLC
Represented By: Sarah Elisabeth Laren
Represented By: J. Andrew Inman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com,LLC
Represented By: Sarah Elisabeth Laren
Represented By: J. Andrew Inman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Stover
Represented By: Bart L. Greenwald
Represented By: James Lee Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?