USA v. Nugent
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Ronald Nugent
Case Number: 5:2019cv00066
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Cause of Action: 20:1080
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Ronald Nugent. USM unable to locate the individual at residence. (JJ)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #4 MOTION for Order by USA for Process of Service by USMS filed by USA is GRANTED and the USMS SHALL SERVE Defendant Ronald Nugent personally with Complaint and Summons. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 2/26/2019.(GLD)cc: COR,USMS (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/26/2019: #1 USMS receipt) (GLD). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/26/2019: #2 USM 285) (GLD).
February 26, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re #4 MOTION for Order by USA for Process of Service by USMS (GLD)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Order by USA for Process of Service by USMS (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Datta, Rajbir)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ronald Nugent; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (KM)
February 22, 2019 Conflict Check run. (KM)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Indebtedness, #2 Promissory Notes, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(KM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Nugent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Nugent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Rajbir Datta, AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?