Washington v. Adams et al

Plaintiff: Carroll Washington
Defendant: Dr. Terre Adams and USA
Case Number: 5:2019cv00073
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed via Personal Service to Terre Adams served on 4/11/2019; USA served on 4/11/2019. Service to U.S. Attorney executed via Certified Mail on 4/11/2019; Service to U.S. Attorney General executed via Certified Mail on 4/11/2019. (KM)
April 9, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Terre Adams, USA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summons issued and service packets delivered to U.S. Marshal for service. (KM)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: 1. Washington's #8 Application to Proceed in District court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs is GRANTED; 2. A Deputy Clerk shall prepare 3 "Service Packets" for service upon the USA & Dr. Terre Adams; 3. The Deputy clerk shall send the Service Packets to the USM in Lexington & shall note date of deliver in the docket; 4. The USM shall serve the USA by sending packets certified mail or registered mail to both the EDKY U.S. Attorney and Office of the Attorney General of the U.S. in Washington, D.C.; 5. The USM shall personally serve Dr. Terre Adams at FMC Lexington; 6. Washington must immediately advise the Clerk's office of any change in his current mailing address; 7. If Washington wishes to seek relief from the Court, he must do so by filing a formal motion with the clerk's office. Motions must include a written certificate of service. The Court may disregard letters sent directly to chambers or motions lacking a certificate of service. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 4/9/2019.(KM)cc: COR, Pltf via U.S. mail
April 8, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: re #8 Applicaiton fo Proceed in District court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Carroll Washington; ***FILE SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: #7 Complaint (KM)
April 8, 2019 Filing 8 Application for Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees of Costs by Carroll Washington, pro se. Motions referred to PSO. (envelope is listed at DE #7 ). (KM) Modified text on 4/8/2019 by (KM).
April 8, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED), filed by Carroll Washington, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope dated 4/5/2019)(KM)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER re: Disclosure of Contact Information: 1. pro se litigants must provide current telephone number, residential address, & if different, mailing address. 2. pro se litigants must provide written notice of change of residential address, & if different, mailing address. 3. Clerk file copy of Order in all non-prisoner pro se actions. Failure to provide required information or change of address may result in appropriate sanctions.. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/6/2016.(JJ)cc: Pro Se Plaintiff via US Mail
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: (1) clerk is DIRECTED to send pla a civil rights complaint form & an application to proceed w/payment of fees or costs; (2) w/in 30 days, pla must complete & file the complaint; (3) DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE pla's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; pla must either pay ff or submit the completed application; (4) pla is advised that failure to comply w/order w/in 30 days may result in dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 3/5/19. (KJR)cc: COR, Washington (US Mail)
February 27, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carroll Washington, pro se (JJ)
February 27, 2019 Conflict Check run. (JJ)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(JJ)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carroll Washington, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (JJ)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED)., filed by Carroll Washington, pro se. (Attachments: #1 BOP Correspondence, #2 Tort Claim, #3 BOP Clinical Encounters, #4 Mailing Envelope - Post marked 2/26/2019)(JJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Adams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carroll Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Terre Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?