Sereika v. USA

Petitioner: Michael Sereika
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 5:2019cv00106
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DEFICIENCY ORDER: (1) clerk shall send petitioner a petition for writ of habeas corpus form (521), IFP application (240) & certificate of inmate acct (523); (2) w/in 30 days petitioner must complete & file the petition form; (3) w/in 30 days petitioner must either pay the $5.00 ff or complete & file the certificate & IFP forms; (4) court will deny the petition w/out prejudice if petitioner does not take these steps w/in 30 days. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 3/18/19.(KJR)cc: COR, Petitioner w/forms (US Mail)
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(KM)
March 18, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #2 Transfer Order, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (CBD)
March 18, 2019 Conflict Check run. (CBD)
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New York Southern. Case number 1:19-cv-02138. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc: Petitioner by US Mail w/ copy of the docket sheet
March 11, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of Kentucky (mro) [Transferred from nysd on 3/18/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Mailed a copy of #2 Order, to Michael Sereika 43464-054 Federal Medical Center/HCU P.O. Box 14500 Lexington, KY 40512-4500. (aea) [Transferred from nysd on 3/18/2019.]
March 11, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (mro) [Transferred from nysd on 3/18/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Petitioner, and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky. Whether Petitioner should be permitted to proceed further without payment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/11/2019) (mro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from nysd on 3/18/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (rdz) [Transferred from nysd on 3/18/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Document filed by Michael Sereika.(rdz) [Transferred from nysd on 3/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sereika v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Sereika
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?