Ware et al v. CKF Enterprises, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Julia Ware and Ralph Edwards
Defendant: CKF Enterprises, Inc. and Crinda Francke
Case Number: 5:2019cv00183
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: re #37 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation to Stay Litigation For ADR and Tolling Agreement by Ralph Edwards, Julia Ware (KM)
July 2, 2019 Filing 37 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation to Stay Litigation For ADR and Tolling Agreement by Ralph Edwards, Julia Ware, CKF Enterprises, Inc., Crinda Francke. (Blanchard, David) Modified to add filers on 7/3/2019 (KM).
June 11, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF FILING by Ralph Edwards, Julia Ware Opt In Consent Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Opt In Form)(Lichten, Harold)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER:It is ORDERED that the #34 renewed motion for Olena Savytska to appear pro hac vice for plaintiffs Julia Ware and Ralph Edwards is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 6/4/2019. (KM)cc: COR, Registration form to Attorney Savytska Modified ext on 6/4/2019 (KM).
June 4, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: re #34 Renewed Motion for Olena Savytska to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ralph Edwards, Julia Ware (KM)
June 4, 2019 Filing 34 RENEWED MOTION FOR OLVENA SAVYTSKA TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Ralph Edwards, Julia Ware (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing; ECF Training, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Cover Letter)(KM) Modified text on 6/4/2019 (KM).
June 3, 2019 Filing 33 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CKF Enterprises, Inc.. (Effinger, Cynthia)
June 3, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Cynthia Effinger. #30 Answer to Complaint has been filed by CKF Enterprises, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (KM)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: It is ORDERED as follows: 1. NLT 30 days from date of of this order, counsel shall conduct meeting of parties; 2. At meeting, parties shall exchange disclosures; 3. NLT 10 days after meriting, counsel shall file a joint written report outlining the proposed discovery plan. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 6/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form)(KM)cc: COR, Attorneys Savytska & Carson via U.S. mail. Modified text on 6/4/2019 (KM).
June 3, 2019 Filing 30 FIRST ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by CKF Enterprises, Inc., Crinda Francke.(Effinger, Cynthia)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: It is ORDERED that the #28 Amended Motion for Shanon J. Carson to appear pro hac vice is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 5/30/2019. (KM)cc: COR, ECF Registration for to Attorney Carson
May 29, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Reeves for review: re #28 AMENDED MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (JLM)
May 29, 2019 Filing 28 AMENDED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shanon J. Carson (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(JLM)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER:It is ORDERED that the renewed #26 Motion for Harold L. Lichten to appear pro hac vice is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 5/29/2019. (KM)cc: COR
May 28, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Order by Ralph Edwards, Julia Ware Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice and Waiving Additional Admission Fee (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, ECF Training Confirmation, #2 Proposed Order)(Lichten, Harold)
May 28, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ralph Edwards, Julia Ware via in person to Crinda Francke served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (Blanchard, David)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: DENYING Atty Shanon J. Caron's #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for plaintiff. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 5/24/19. (KJR)cc: COR, Carson, Savytska (US Mail)
May 23, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: re #23 MOTION for Shanon J. Carson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ralph Edwards, Julia Ware (KM)
May 23, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Shanon J. Carson re #23 MOTION for Shanon J. Carson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ralph Edwards, Julia Ware. (KM)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: It is ORDERED that the motions for Harold L. Lichten and Olena Savytska to appear pro hac vice [Record Nos. #19 , #20 ] are DENIED, without prejudice to being renewed if appropriate clarifying information is supplied. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 5/22/2019. (KM)cc: COR, Atty Savytska via U.S. mail
May 21, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Shanon J. Carson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ralph Edwards, Julia Ware (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Receipt # 5027652)(KM)
May 21, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF FILING by Ralph Edwards, Julia Ware re #19 MOTION for Harold L. Lichten to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ralph Edwards, Julia Ware, #20 MOTION for Olena Savystska to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ralph Edwards, Julia Ware (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to admit Harold Lichten pro hac vice, #2 Proposed Order to admit Olena Savytska pro hac vice)(Lichten, Harold)
May 21, 2019 NOTICE OF MANDATORY ECF DIRECTED TO Harold L. Lichten: Court records indicate you are a registered ECF Filing User and filed a paper document, which is in violation of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The document has been filed and entered on the docket. The referenced document is: #19 MOTION for Harold L. Lichten to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ralph Edwards, Julia Ware. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. Failure to comply may result in this matter being submitted to the Chief Judge. cc: Harold L. Lichten (KM)
May 21, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Harold L. Lichten and Olena Savytska re #19 MOTION for Harold L. Lichten to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ralph Edwards, Julia Ware, #20 MOTION for Olena Savystska to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ralph Edwards, Julia Ware. (KM)
May 21, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Olena Savystska to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ralph Edwards, Julia Ware (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Massachusetts, #2 Receipt #5027651)(KM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/22/2019: #3 Proposed Order) (KM).
May 21, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Harold L. Lichten to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ralph Edwards, Julia Ware (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Massachusetts, #2 Receipt #5027651)(KM)
May 20, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Ralph Edwards, Julia Ware - Notice of Filing Consents to Joint Collective Action (Attachments: #1 Affidavit A - Consent Forms)(Blanchard, David)
May 20, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Olena Savytska by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (JLM)
May 20, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Harold Lichten by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (JLM)
May 20, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Shan J. Carson by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (JLM)
May 14, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ralph Edwards, Julia Ware via In Person to CKF Enterprises, Inc. served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (Blanchard, David)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Plaintiff's renewed #12 Motion for Frances J. Hollander to appear pro hac vice by Julia Ware, Ralph Edwards is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 5/14/2019. (JJ)cc: COR, Hollander w/ECF Registration Form via US Mail
May 14, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: re #12 RENEWED MOTION FOR FRANCES J. HOLLANDER TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Ralph Edwards, Julia Ware (KM)
May 14, 2019 Filing 12 RENEWED MOTION FOR FRANCES J. HOLLANDER TO APPEAR PRO HACE VICE by Ralph Edwards, Julia Ware re #9 Order, #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, ECF Training, #2 Cover Letter dated 5/10/2019)(KM) Modified text on 5/14/2019 (KM).
May 7, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to CKF Enterprises, Inc., Crinda Francke; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (KM)
May 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Ralph Edwards, Julia Ware re #1 Complaint, - Request for Issuance of Summons to Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons - Defendant CKF Enterprises, Inc. et al, #2 Summons - Defendant Francke)(Blanchard, David)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Plaintiff's #7 Motion for Frances J. Hollander to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Julia Ware and Ralph Edwards is DENIED, without prejudice to being renewed after appropriate, clarifying information is supplied. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 5/7/2019. (JJ)cc: COR, Hollander via US Mail Modified text on 5/7/2019 (JJ).
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiff's #5 Motion for Sarah Schalman-Bergen to Appear Pro Hac Vice & #6 Motion for Alexandra K. Piazza to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ralph Edwards, Julia Ware are GRANTED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 5/7/2019. (JJ)cc: COR, Schalman-Bergen & Piazza ECF Registration Form via US Mail
May 7, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: re #7 MOTION for Frances J. Hollander to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ralph Edwards, Julia Ware (JJ)
May 7, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Frances J. Hollander re #7 MOTION for Frances J. Hollander to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ralph Edwards, Julia Ware. (JJ)
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Frances J. Hollander to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ralph Edwards, Julia Ware (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - MI, #2 Receipt)(JJ)
May 7, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: re #6 MOTION for Alexandra K. Piazza to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ralph Edwards, Julia Ware, #5 MOTION for Sarah Schalman-Bergen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ralph Edwards, Julia Ware (JJ)
May 7, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Sarah R. Schalman-Bergen, Alexandra K. Piazza re #6 MOTION for Alexandra K. Piazza to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ralph Edwards, Julia Ware, #5 MOTION for Sarah Schalman-Bergen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ralph Edwards, Julia Ware. (JJ)
May 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Alexandra K. Piazza to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ralph Edwards, Julia Ware (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - NJ, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - PA, #3 Receipt)(JJ)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Sarah Schalman-Bergen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ralph Edwards, Julia Ware (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - PA, #2 Receipt)(JJ)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #2 MOTION for David M. Blanchard to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ralph Edwards, Julia Ware. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/25/2019. (KM)cc: COR, Registration form to David M. Blanchard Modified text on 4/26/2019 (KM).
April 25, 2019 Conflict Check run. (JLM)
April 25, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Reeves for review: re #2 MOTION for David M. Blanchard to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ralph Edwards, Julia Ware (JLM)
April 25, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to David M. Blanchard. (JLM)
April 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for David M. Blanchard to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ralph Edwards, Julia Ware (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Receipt)(JLM) (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/25/2019) (STC).
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 5027496), filed by Ralph Edwards, Julia Ware. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join, #2 Exhibit B-Consent and Authorization, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Receipt)(JLM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/25/2019: #5 Summons) (JLM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ware et al v. CKF Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CKF Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Jaron P. Blandford
Represented By: Jon A. Woodall
Represented By: Cynthia L. Effinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crinda Francke
Represented By: Jaron P. Blandford
Represented By: Jon A. Woodall
Represented By: Cynthia L. Effinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Ware
Represented By: David M. Blanchard
Represented By: Harold L. Lichten
Represented By: Sarah R. Schalman-Bergen
Represented By: Shanon J. Carson
Represented By: Alexandra K. Piazza
Represented By: Olena Savytska
Represented By: Frances J. Hollander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Edwards
Represented By: David M. Blanchard
Represented By: Harold L. Lichten
Represented By: Sarah R. Schalman-Bergen
Represented By: Shanon J. Carson
Represented By: Alexandra K. Piazza
Represented By: Olena Savytska
Represented By: Frances J. Hollander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?