Hutsell v. Hawkins et al
Plaintiff: Charles Edward Hutsell
Defendant: Hydee Hawkins, Bret Kirkland and Rick Putman
Case Number: 5:2019cv00187
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Lexington Office
Presiding Judge: P SO
Referring Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 JUDGMENT: 1. The Court DISMISSES the Complaint in it entirety, without prejudice, and STRIKES this matter from its active docket; 2. This is a final & appealable Judgment & there is no just cause for delay. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 6/17/2019.(KM)cc: COR, Pltf via U.S. mail
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Court DISMISSES the Complaint #1 without prejudice. A corresponding Judgment follows. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 6/17/2019.(KM)cc: COR, Pltf via U.S. mail
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: 1. The Court GRANTS Hutsell's #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and WAIVES the $50.00 administrative fee. Hutsell must pay the $350.00 filing fee. 2. Within 30 days, Hutsell must pay $8.63 to the Clerk as an initial partial filing fee. 3. The Clerk shall open an account in Hutsell's name. The Clerk shall complete a Notice of Payment Form with Hutsell's name, inmate registration number, and this case unmber. The Clerk shall send a copy of this Order and the Notice of Payment Form to the Warden of the institution in which Hutsell is currently confined. 4. Hutsell's custodian shall send the Clerk a payment in an amount equal to 20% of his income for the preceding month out of his inmate trust fund account, but only if the amount in the account exceeds $10.00. The custodian shall continue such monthly payments until the entire $350.00 filing fee is paid. 5. Thsi matter now stand submitted for initial screening. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 5/15/2019. (JJ)cc: F, Pro Se Pltf, Warden w/Notice of Payment Form Modified text on 5/15/2019 (JJ).
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Charles Edward Hutsell, pro se. (JJ)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles Edward Hutsell, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs, #2 Mailing Envelope - Post marked 5/9/2019)(JJ)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: (1) clerk shall send Hutsell blank forms: afdt of assets/IFP application & cert of inmate acct; (2) w/in 30 days, Hutsell shall either pay ff or complete & return forms; (3) if Hutsell fails to either move for IFP or pay ff the court will dismiss his case for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 4/29/19.(KJR)cc: COR, Hutsell w/forms (US Mail)
April 26, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: #1 Complaint - No filing fee received (JJ)
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(JJ)
April 26, 2019 Conflict Check run. (JJ)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED)., filed by Charles Edward Hutsell, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Maling Envelope - post marked 4/15/2019)(JJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutsell v. Hawkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hydee Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bret Kirkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Putman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Edward Hutsell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?