Fox v. Team Goliath, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brian Fox
Defendant: Team Goliath, Inc., Christian Reisch and Jason Dascher
Case Number: 5:2019cv00195
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #27 Joint Motion to Stay: 1. Case stayed for 120 days; 2. Defendants agree to produce summary data of the miles driven and reimbursements paid; 3. parties to engage in good-faith negotiations; 4. Dfts pay all costs associated w/ mediator's services; 5. In event settlement not reached, case conditionally certified as collective action; 6. Notice of Collective Action Lawsuit and Consent Form sent to all current and former delivery drivers; 7. statute of limitations tolled; 8. If settlement not reached w/in 120 days, dfts shall have 14 days to answer; 9. All other stipulations and agreements between parties are approved and shall be binding on parties; 10. Court stays proceedings. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 6/24/2019. (STC)cc: COR
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: #26 Motion for Andrew Biller to Appear Pro Hac Vice for plt is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 6/24/2019. (STC)cc: COR w/ ECF Registration form to A. Biller
June 24, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re #27 JOINT MOTION to Stay (STC)
June 21, 2019 Filing 27 JOINT MOTION to Stay by Team Goliath, Inc., Brian Fox (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice and Consent Form, #2 Exhibit 2 - Email Cover Letter, #3 Proposed Order)(Logsdon, Todd) Modified filers on 6/24/2019 (STC).
June 17, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re #26 MOTION for Andrew Biller to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Fox ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4386452) (STC)
June 17, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Andrew Biller re #26 MOTION for Andrew Biller to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Fox ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4386452). (STC)
June 14, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Andrew Biller to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Fox ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4386452) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Application of Andrew Biller for Pro Hac Vice admission, #2 Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Abell, Robert)
June 13, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: #25 Response to Order to Show Cause (STC)
June 12, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Brian Fox filed by Brian Fox. (Krzeski, Philip)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: that counsel for plaintiff Andrew biller shall SHOW CAUSE as follows: (1) why he failed to complete the application for admission to the bar of this court &/or failed to move for admission PHV pursuant to the clerk's 5/9/19 directive; (2) why he should not be stricken as counsel of record; (3) why any pleadings signed & filed by him should not be stricken from the record; counsel shall file a response within 21 days; clerk shall provide a copy of this order to Mr. Biller via-mail or fax. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 6/11/19.(KJR)cc: COR, Biller (US Mail & fax) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2019: #1 fax receipt) (KJR).
June 10, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: #4 Notice to Attorney Andrew Biller - PHV Motion not filed. (STC)
June 3, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE by Brian Fox of Filing of Declarations with Hand-Written Signatures (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declarations with Hand-Written Signatures)(Krzeski, Philip)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AGREED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Defendants Team Goliath, Inc., Christian Reisch, and Jason Dascher, shall be granted an extension of time, up to and including 6/21/19, in which to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 5/28/2019. (JJ)cc: COR
May 24, 2019 Filing 21 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Team Goliath, Inc.. (Logsdon, Todd)
May 24, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Todd Logsdon. #19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, #18 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Jason Dascher, Christian Reisch, Team Goliath, Inc. has been filed by Team Goliath, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (GLD)
May 24, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: re #18 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Jason Dascher, Christian Reisch, Team Goliath, Inc. (GLD)
May 23, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Dascher, Christian Reisch, Team Goliath, Inc.. (Logsdon, Todd)
May 23, 2019 Filing 18 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Brian Fox, Jason Dascher, Christian Reisch, Team Goliath, Inc.. (Logsdon, Todd) Modified to add all filers on 5/24/2019 (GLD).
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: (1) Plaintiff Fox's #15 Emergency Motion is DENIED; and (2) Plaintiff Fox has 14 days from the entry of this Order to file a Notice of Filing, submitting the Declarations along with original, hand-written signatures in accordance with the Clerk's Notice of Deficiency. The so-called "wet" signatures may be copies and faxed or e:mailed. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 5/21/2019. (STC)cc: COR
May 17, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re #11 MOTION Leave to Send Notice to Similarly Situated Employees by Brian Fox , #12 MOTION to Expedite by Brian Fox , #15 EMERGENCY MOTION To Accept Declarations With Electronic Signatures by Brian Fox (STC)
May 16, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF FILING by Brian Fox Service of Summons & Complaint on Jason Dascher (Attachments: #1 Summons & Certified Mail Receipt for Jason Dascher)(Abell, Robert)
May 16, 2019 Filing 15 EMERGENCY MOTION To Accept Declarations With Electronic Signatures by Brian Fox (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Abell, Robert)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: #10 Motion to of Philip Krzeski Appear Pro Hac Vice for plaintiff. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 5/10/2019. (STC)cc: COR w/ ECF Registration Form to P. Krzeski
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: granting #9 Motion of Andrew Kimble to Appear Pro Hac Vice for plaintiff. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 5/10/2019. (STC)cc: COR w/ ECF Registration Form to A. Kimble
May 10, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re #12 MOTION to Expedite by Brian Fox , #9 MOTION for Andrew Kimble to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Fox ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4356835), #10 MOTION for Philip J. Krzeski to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Fox ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4356836) (STC)
May 10, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO Robert Abell re #11 MOTION Leave to Send Notice to Similarly Situated Employees by Brian Fox. Error: a scanned copy of the original signature for the declarants must be filed. Entry by attorney; within 7 calendar days, prepare a document entitled "Notice of Filing," file the Notice using the event "Notice of Filing," attach a scanned copy of the Declarations with the original signature of the declarant. cc: COR (STC)
May 10, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Philip Krzeski, Andrew Kimble re #9 MOTION for Andrew Kimble to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Fox ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4356835), #10 MOTION for Philip J. Krzeski to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Fox ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4356836). (STC)
May 9, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Expedite by Brian Fox (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abell, Robert)
May 9, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION Leave to Send Notice to Similarly Situated Employees by Brian Fox (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Brian Fox, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Justin Kinney, #4 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Michael Miller, #5 Exhibit 4 - Proposed Notice, #6 Exhibit 5 - Email Notice, #7 Proposed Order)(Abell, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/4/2019: #8 Declarations with hand-written signatures) (STC).
May 9, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Philip J. Krzeski to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Fox ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4356836) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Statement of Philip J. Krzeski, #2 Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Abell, Robert)
May 9, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Andrew Kimble to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Fox ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4356835) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Declaration of Andrew Kimble, #2 Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Abell, Robert)
May 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Brian Fox Service of Summons & Complaint on Christian Reisch (Attachments: #1 Summons & Certified Mail Receipt for Christian Reisch)(Abell, Robert)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Brian Fox Service of Summons & Complaint on Team Goliath Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons & Certified Mail Receipt for Team Goliath)(Abell, Robert)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Philip Krzeski by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 Admission Check)(KM)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Andrew Kimble by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 Admission Check)(KM)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Andrew Biller by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 Admission Check)(KM)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jason Dascher, Christian Reisch, Team Goliath, Inc.; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (KM)
May 2, 2019 Conflict Check run. (KM)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4350028), filed by Brian Fox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Consent Forms for Fox, Kinney, Miller, Pippin, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Team Goliath, #4 Summons Christian Reisch, #5 Summons Jason Daschner)(KM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fox v. Team Goliath, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Fox
Represented By: Andrew Biller
Represented By: Andrew Kimble
Represented By: Philip Krzeski
Represented By: Robert L. Abell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Team Goliath, Inc.
Represented By: Todd B. Logsdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Reisch
Represented By: Todd B. Logsdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Dascher
Represented By: Todd B. Logsdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?