Combs et al v. Praxair, Inc.
Plaintiff: Craig Combs, Gregory Capps, Sondra Hatton, Vincent Leger, Christine Fitch, Tammy Combs, Stevie Fitch, Robert Sosby, Etta Leger and David Hatton
Defendant: Praxair, Inc.
Intervenor Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00245
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: (1) this matter shall be consolidated w/Lexington civil actions 19-cv-08-KKC and 19-cv-254-KKC ; (2) Court designates case 19-cv-8-KKC as the "LEAD" case & cases 19-cv-245-KKC & 19-cv-254-KKC are "MEMBER CASES;" (3) all filings re this matter shall be filed & docketed in 19-cv-8-KKC. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 8/2/19.(KJR)cc: COR
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 Intervenor COMPLAINT, CROSSCLAIM against Praxair, Inc. Stevie Fitch, Gregory Capps, David Hatton, Craig Combs, Robert Sosby, Vincent Leger, filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to #14 Order. (STC)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: #11 Motion to Intervene is GRANTED. Clerk directed to file complaint and cross claim into record. The other parties to this action may answer or otherwise respond to Liberty Mutual's complaint and crossclaim as provided in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules of this Court. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 7/29/2019. (STC)cc: COR
July 24, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: re #11 MOTION to Intervene by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (STC)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Lexington civil actions 19-cv-08, 19-cv-245, and 19-cv-254 present common questions of law and fact, the Court intends to consolidate them absent good cause shown. At this point, the consolidation would be for pre-trial purposes only. The parties in this matter shall have up to and including 7/24/2019 to file objections. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 7/10/2019.(JJ)cc: COR
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Walker, Timothy)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Intervene by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Intervening Comp&Crossclaim, #2 Proposed Order)(Walker, Timothy)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Karen K. Caldwell for all further proceedings. Judge Claria Horn Boom no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 7/1/2019.(STC)cc: COR
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, Defendant Praxair's Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Praxair, Inc..(Shear, Steven)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: 1. #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice are GRANTED; 2. D. Patterson Gloor and Steven M. Shear are granted leave to appear pro hac vice for the defendant in this action. 3. If during the pendency of this action, D. Patterson Gloor or Steven M. Shear are disbarred, suspended from practice, are not in good standing with the Bar to which they are a member, or are subject to any other disciplinary action by any court, state, territory or the District of Columbia, they must immediately notify the Court and provide information necessary for the Court to evaluate whether continued admission in this case is appropriate. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 6/17/2019. (STC)cc: COR
June 17, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Boom for review: re #5 MOTION for D. Patterson Gloor to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Praxair, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4386136), #6 MOTION for Steven M. Shear to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Praxair, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4386145) (STC)
June 17, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to D. Patterson Gloor, Steven M. Shear re #5 MOTION for D. Patterson Gloor to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Praxair, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4386136), #6 MOTION for Steven M. Shear to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Praxair, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4386145). (STC)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Steven M. Shear to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Praxair, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4386145) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Sheffer, John)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for D. Patterson Gloor to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Praxair, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4386136) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Sheffer, John)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING by Praxair, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Amended Civil Cover Sheet)(Sheffer, John)
June 10, 2019 Conflict Check run. (SLH)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Praxair, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Linde PLC for Praxair, Inc... (SLH)
June 10, 2019 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christine Fitch, Tammy Combs, Etta Leger, Stevie Fitch, Gregory Capps, David Hatton, Sondra Hatton, Craig Combs, Robert Sosby, Vincent Leger via Certified Mail to Praxair, Inc. served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. FILED IN STATE COURT RECORD. SEE #1 (SLH) Modified on 6/10/2019 (SLH).
June 10, 2019 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christine Fitch, Tammy Combs, Etta Leger, Stevie Fitch, Gregory Capps, David Hatton, Sondra Hatton, Craig Combs, Robert Sosby, Vincent Leger via Certified Mail to Praxair, Inc. served on 5/15/2019, answer due 6/5/2019. FILED IN STATE COURT RECORD. SEE #1 (SLH)
June 10, 2019 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Praxair, Inc., filed by Christine Fitch, Tammy Combs, Etta Leger, Stevie Fitch, Gregory Capps, David Hatton, Sondra Hatton, Craig Combs, Robert Sosby, Vincent Leger. FILED IN STATE COURT RECORD. SEE #1 (SLH) Modified text on 6/10/2019 (SLH).
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fayette Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-1689. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4381600), filed by Praxair, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit B-Notice of Service, #4 Exhibit D-NOS (Amended Complaint))(SLH) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/10/2019: #5 Exhibit C-First Amended Complaint) (SLH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Combs et al v. Praxair, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Combs
Represented By: Shea W. Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Capps
Represented By: Shea W. Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sondra Hatton
Represented By: Shea W. Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Leger
Represented By: Shea W. Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Fitch
Represented By: Shea W. Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Combs
Represented By: Shea W. Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stevie Fitch
Represented By: Shea W. Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Sosby
Represented By: Shea W. Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Etta Leger
Represented By: Shea W. Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hatton
Represented By: Shea W. Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Praxair, Inc.
Represented By: John A. Sheffer
Represented By: D. Patterson Gloor
Represented By: Steven M. Shear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy J. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?