Weaver v. SSA
Plaintiff: Kristina E. Weaver
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Case Number: 5:2019cv00266
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of SSA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summons issued and delivered to U.S. Marshal for service. Note: due to error the summons were delivered to USM this date. (GLD)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Court GRANTS #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and WAIVES payment of filing and administrative fees. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 7/16/2019. (GLD)cc: COR
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Hon. David F. Chermol as counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 7/16/2019. (GLD)cc: COR
July 16, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO David F. Chermol re #7 FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct #5 FIRST MOTION for David F. Chermol to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kristina E. Weaver: Error: the incorrect event (motion to amend/correct) was selected. Entry by Attorney; Clerk re-defined the document as a Notice of Filing Affidavit. No action required by counsel. cc: COR (GLD)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Filing Affidavit re #5 FIRST MOTION for David F. Chermol to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kristina E. Weaver ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4410341) by Kristina E. Weaver (Chermol, David) Modified on 7/16/2019 (GLD).
July 15, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Robert E. Wier for review: re #5 FIRST MOTION for David F. Chermol to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kristina E. Weaver ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4410341) (GLD)
July 15, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to David Chermol re #5 FIRST MOTION for David F. Chermol to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kristina E. Weaver ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4410341). (GLD)
July 13, 2019 Filing 6 Certificates of Good Standing by Kristina E. Weaver. Amendment to #5 FIRST MOTION for David F. Chermol to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kristina E. Weaver ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4410341) . (Chermol, David) Modified text on 7/15/2019 (GLD).
July 13, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST MOTION for David F. Chermol to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kristina E. Weaver ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4410341) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chermol, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/15/2019: #2 Certificates of Good Standing) (GLD). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2019: #3 Affidavit of David F. Chermol) (GLD).
July 2, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Wier for review: re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kristina E. Weaver (STC)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING by Kristina E. Weaver re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kristina E. Weaver (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chermol, David)
July 1, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO David Chermol re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; attorney failed to submit a [proposed order] as an electronic attachment to the motion. Entry by attorney; within 7 calendar days, prepare a document entitled "Notice of Filing", file the Notice using the event "Notice of Filing", attach the proposed order, and create a link to the related docket entry. cc: COR (MDC)
July 1, 2019 Conflict Check run. (MDC)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kristina E. Weaver (MDC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2019: #1 Proposed Order) (STC).
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Kristina E. Weaver. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons General Counsel, #3 Summons US Attorney General, #4 Summons US Attorney's Office)(MDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weaver v. SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina E. Weaver
Represented By: David Chermol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?