Lotz v. Steak N Shake, Inc.
Plaintiff: Pamela Lotz and Eric Lotz
Defendant: Steak n Shake, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00277
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Referring Judge: Matthew A Stinnett
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) NLT 9/6/2019, parties shall exchange information required by Rule 26(A)(1). 2. NLT 11/29/19, plaintiff shall disclose expert witness (w/ respect to liability). NLT 12/27/2019, defendants shall disclose expert witness (w/ respect to liability). NLT 2/28/2020, plaintiff shall disclose expert witness(w/ respect to damages). NLT 3/27/2020, defendants shall disclose expert witness (w/ respect to damages). (3) Supplementation due within 30 days of the new information, but NLT 30 days prior to the close of discovery. (4) NLT 5/29/2020, parties shall complete all discovery. (5) All discovery disputes are referred to the United States Magistrate selected by random draw (Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett). (6) All motions for extensions of time shall be referred to the undersigned for disposition. The parties are advised in advance that such motions are not favored and must be accompanied by a memorandum and affidavit of counsel outlining sufficient grounds for granting the relief sought. (7) Parties may not, by agreement, extend any of the deadlines set forth in this Scheduling Order. (8) Motion to amend and/or join additional parties due 11/29/2019. (9) NLT 7/1/2020, parties shall file all dispositive motions and daubert motions. (10) Pretrial filings due on or before 9/8/2020. (11) On or before 9/8/2020, counsel shall pre-mark and number all exhibits. (12) On or before 9/8/2020, counsel shall file Agreed Proposed Jury Instruction. (13) On or before 9/15/2020, counsel shall file any objections to the use of depositions. (14) Pretrial filings may be submitted to reeves_chambers@kyed.uscourts.gov. (15) NLT 9/22/2020, parties shall submit to chambers a copy of each exhibits. (16) JURY TRIAL set for 9/29/2020 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Danny C. Reeves, with counsel to be present 8:30 a.m.(3 days). (17) The parties are directed to file a joint status report the first Monday of each month. Failure to timely comply with this requirement shall result in the matter being set for a status conference, requiring the attendance of counsel and the parties. (18) Parties are directed to the use the services of a private mediator in the event they seek to mediate their dispute. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 9/3/2019.(JJ)cc: COR,D,JC
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR STATUS CONFERENCE held on 08/30/2019 before Judge Danny C. Reeves: Counsel for the parties appeared for scheduling conference as noted. A separate Scheduling Order shall be issued. (Court Reporter Elaine Haberer) (MDC) cc: COR
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Re #8 It is hereby ORDERED that a SCHEDULING CONFERENCE is set for 8/30/2019 at 02:15 PM in LEXINGTON before Judge Danny C. Reeves. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 08/22/2019. (MDC) cc: COR, D
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Canupp, Brian)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING by Eric Lotz, Pamela Lotz (Canupp, Brian)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Steak n Shake, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rule 26 Disclosure)(Williams, Aaron)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. NLT 30 days, parties shall conduct Rule 26(f) meeting. 2. At the meeting, parties shall exchange the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). 3. NLT 10 days after the meeting, parties shall file a joint written report. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 7/12/2019.(JJ)cc: COR (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2019: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge Form) (JJ).
July 11, 2019 Conflict Check run. (MDC)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Steak n Shake, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Biglari Holdings, Inc. for Steak n Shake, Inc... (MDC)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by William B. Orberson, Aaron Michael Williams on behalf of Steak n Shake, Inc. (MDC)
July 11, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Steak n Shake, Inc.. FILED IN STATE COURT RECORD. SEE #1 (MDC)
July 11, 2019 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric Lotz, Pamela Lotz via Certified Mail to Steak n Shake, Inc. served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. FILED IN STATE COURT RECORD. SEE #1 (MDC)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fayette Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-1882. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4407911), filed by Steak n Shake, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint with Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Exhibit B- Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories, Request for Admissions, and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 State Court Record)(MDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lotz v. Steak N Shake, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steak n Shake, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron Michael Williams
Represented By: William B. Orberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Lotz
Represented By: Brian T. Canupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Lotz
Represented By: Brian T. Canupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?