Jackson v. Capital One Bank (USA), National Association et al
Plaintiff: Darlene Jackson
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and Capital One Bank (USA), National Association
Case Number: 5:2019cv00314
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 11 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Capital One Bank (USA), National Association identifying Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corporation for Capital One Bank (USA), National Association.. (Manley, Reid)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Reid Manley. #9 Answer to Complaint has been filed by Capital One Bank (USA) without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (KJR)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Capital One Bank (USA), National Association.(Manley, Reid)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Darlene Jackson as to Capital One Bank; summons served on 8/9/19; Answer due 8/30/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons)(Kurtz, Sheilah) Modified text on 9/13/2019 (KJR).
September 9, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO Sheilah Kurtz re #7 Affidavit of Service; a non-issued summons was attached as the Main Document. Within 7 calendar days, file the summons issued by the Clerk with the declaration of service completed which states the method of service, as an electronic attachment to a document entitled Notice of Filing. cc: COR (JJ)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on Equifax on 08/08/2019, filed by Darlene Jackson. (Kurtz, Sheilah)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Capital One on 08/09/2019, filed by Darlene Jackson. (Kurtz, Sheilah)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, it is ORDERED that Deft Capital One Bank (USA),N.A. shall have through and including 09/20/2019, to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 09/03/2019. (MDC) cc: COR
September 3, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Capital One Bank (USA), National Association (Unopposed) (KJR)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Capital One Bank (USA), National Association (Unopposed) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Exhibit A, Proposed Order)(Manley, Reid)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants ; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons Equifax Information Services, LLC) (MDC)
August 6, 2019 Conflict Check run. (MDC)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4431347), filed by Darlene Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- Settlement Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Credit Report, #4 Exhibit C - Redacted Letter and Mail Receipts, #5 Exhibit D - July 2019 Credit Report, #6 Summons Capital One Bank (USA), National Association, #7 Summons Equifax Information Services, LLC). (MDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Capital One Bank (USA), National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), National Association
Represented By: Reid Stephens Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Jackson
Represented By: Sheilah Galvez Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?