The Cincinnati Insurance Company v. FedEx et al
Plaintiff: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Defendant: FedEx, Robert D. Lovely and FedEx Freight, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00322
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: 1. All discovery disputes are REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge (Stinnett) assigned to this matter for appropriate resolution; No motions to compel or any motions relating to a discovery dispute shall be filed without permission as directed herein; 2. Court encourages early and economic case resolution. Matter referred to Magistrate Judge (Stinnett) for settlement; 3. Initial disclosures due NLT 10/15/19; 4. Motion to amend pleadings and to join additional parties due by 12/2/2019; 5. All Discovery due by 4/15/2020; 6. Expert witness reports disclosed for Plaintiff by 12/2/2019, for Defendants by 1/15/2020; 7. Dispositive Motions due by 4/30/2020; 8. Motions for ext of time or to modify scheduling order shall be referred to undersigned for disposition; 9. The scope of discovery and the parties obligations indiscovery are governed by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, relevant rules highlighted in order; 10. Motion practice shall be governed by Local Rule 7.1 except otherwise as listed herein this order; 11. Pretrial Filings due 10 days before FPTC; 12. FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 6/29/2020 at 11:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Joseph M. Hood; 13. JURY TRIAL set for 7/28/2020 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Joseph M. Hood (3 days). Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 9/19/2019.(JLM)cc: COR,JC,D
September 18, 2019 Filing 17 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Davis, Michael)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by George J. Matz. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 9/11/19. (JLM)cc: COR,Matz via U.S. mail w/ecf reg. form.
September 10, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re #15 MOTION for George J. Matz to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Cincinnati Insurance Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4460702) (JLM)
September 10, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to George J. Matz. (JLM)
September 10, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for George J. Matz to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Cincinnati Insurance Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4460702) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David B. Sloan, #2 Affidavit of George J. Matz, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, Pennsylvania, #4 Proposed Order)(Sloan, David)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: 1) w/in 21 days, parties meet to discuss nature and basis of claims and defenses and possibilities for prompt resolution of case, make FRCP 26(a)(1) disclosures and develop proposed discovery plan; 2) w/in 10 days after meeting, file joint status report as outlined in Order. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 9/6/19.(JLM)cc: COR
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Robert D. Lovely.(Davis, Michael)
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FedEx Freight, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent FedEx Corporation for FedEx Freight, Inc... (Davis, Michael)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by FedEx Freight, Inc..(Davis, Michael)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FedEx. (Davis, Michael)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by FedEx.(Davis, Michael)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY George J. Matz by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (JLM)
August 23, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO David Sloan re #6 Affidavit of Service, #7 Affidavit of Service; ERROR: the executed summonses were incorrectly filed using the event Affidavit of Service. The correct event is Summons Returned Executed, which sets the 21-day answer due deadline. Entry by attorney; Correction: Clerk modified the docket text of #6 and #7 to reflect the date served and updated answer due deadline. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (JLM)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company via Certified Mail to FedEx served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certified Mail Return Receipt Card)(Sloan, David) Modified text on 8/23/2019 (JLM).
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company via Certified Mail to FedEx served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certified Mail Return Receipt Card)(Sloan, David) Modified text on 8/23/2019 (JLM).
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Cincinnati Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Cincinnati Financial Corporation for The Cincinnati Insurance Company.. (Sloan, David)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, David Brian Sloan and George J. Matz, has been filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (JLM)
August 12, 2019 Conflict Check run. (JLM)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to FedEx, FedEx Freight, Inc., Robert D. Lovely; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(JLM)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4434750), filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons FedEx, #3 Summons FedEx Freight, Inc., #4 Summons Robert D. Lovely)(JLM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Cincinnati Insurance Company v. FedEx et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx
Represented By: Michael Todd Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D. Lovely
Represented By: Michael Todd Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Freight, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Todd Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: George J. Matz
Represented By: David Brian Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?